Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2486464

EP2486464 - METHOD FOR OPERATING A FIELD BUS INTERFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.07.2014
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.12.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
06.12.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Endress+Hauser Process Solutions AG
Christoph-Merian-Ring 12
4153 Reinach / CH
[2016/42]
Former [2012/33]For all designated states
Endress + Hauser Process Solutions AG
Christoph-Merian-Ring 23
4153 Reinach / CH
Inventor(s)01 / KÖLBLIN, Robert
Haagener Straße 36
79539 Lörrach / DE
02 / MANEVAL, Michael
Hans-Vetter-Str.64
79650 Schopfheim / DE
03 / REINKENSMEIER, Jörg
Sägemattstrasse 24
79585 Steinen / DE
04 / PÖSCHMANN, Axel
Florastrasse 11
CH-4057 Basel / CH
 [2012/33]
Representative(s)Andres, Angelika Maria
Endress+Hauser (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG
PatServe
Colmarer Strasse 6
79576 Weil am Rhein / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/33]Andres, Angelika Maria
Endress+Hauser (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG PatServe Colmarer Strasse 6
79576 Weil am Rhein / DE
Application number, filing date10751607.230.08.2010
WO2010EP62611
Priority number, dateDE2009104538606.10.2009         Original published format: DE102009045386
[2012/33]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2011042257
Date:14.04.2011
Language:DE
[2011/15]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2486464
Date:15.08.2012
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2011
[2012/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.06.2011
ClassificationInternational:G05B19/418, H04L12/26
[2012/33]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/33]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES FELDBUS-INTERFACE[2012/33]
English:METHOD FOR OPERATING A FIELD BUS INTERFACE[2012/33]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER UNE INTERFACE DE BUS DE TERRAIN[2012/33]
Entry into regional phase23.03.2012National basic fee paid 
23.03.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
23.03.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.03.2012Examination requested  [2012/33]
11.01.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.03.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.07.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.02.2016Date of oral proceedings
04.03.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
08.03.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination09.05.2016Appeal received No.  T1489/16
30.05.2016Statement of grounds filed
23.06.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.03.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
23.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
25.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
20.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
22.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
22.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
28.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
26.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201203   M06   Fee paid on   23.10.2012
Cited inInternational search[XI]EP1919132  (SOFTING AG [DE]) [X] 1,3-12,14,15 * the whole document * [I] 2,13;
 [XI]WO2007074105  (ENDRESS & HAUSER PROCESS SOLUT [CH], et al) [X] 1,3-12,14,15 * the whole document * [I] 2,13;
 [XI]DE102007043328  (ENDRESS & HAUSER PROCESS SOLUT [CH]) [X] 1,3-12,14,15 * the whole document * [I] 2,13;
 [XPI]DE102008019053  (ENDRESS & HAUSER PROCESS SOLUT [CH]) [XP] 1,3-12,14,15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0009] - [0012] - [0021] , [0022] , [0027] , [0043] - [0045] * [I] 2,13;
 [E]WO2011032796  (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [E] 1-15 * abstract * * page 3, line 30 - page 5, line 22 * * page 6, lines 17-25 * * page 7, lines 3-10 *;
 [A]DE10358270  (ENDRESS & HAUSER PROCESS SOLUT [CH]) [A] 2,13 * abstract *
 [XI]  - WOLLSCHLAEGER M ET AL, "Integration of fieldbus systems into on-line asset management solutions based on fieldbus profile descriptions", FACTORY COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS, 2002. 4TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP O N AUG 28 - 30, 2002, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20020828), ISBN 978-0-7803-7586-4, pages 89 - 96, XP010623297 [X] 1,3-12,14,15 * the whole document * [I] 2,13
 [XI]  - THEURICH S ET AL, "Web-based Asset Management for heterogeneous industrial networks", FACTORY COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS, 2008. WFCS 2008. IEEE INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080521), ISBN 978-1-4244-2349-1, pages 267 - 270, XP031344938 [X] 1,3-12,14,15 * the whole document * [I] 2,13
by applicantWO2007074105