Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2473350

EP2473350 - POLYOLEFIN PRE-STRETCHED PACKAGING FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.03.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2019Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Megaplast S.A. Packaging Materials Industry
38 Vassileos Konstantinou Avenue
194 00 Koropi, Attica / GR
[2012/28]
Inventor(s)01 / APOSTOLAKIS, Michalis V.
13 Trikalon Street
Heraklion
Crete / GR
02 / GATOS, Konstantinos G.
22 Chatzigianni Mexi Street
Kanithos
GR-34100 Chalkida Evia / GR
03 / KARANDINOS, Anthony G.
5 Nisous Street
Glyfada 166 75 Attica / GR
 [2012/33]
Former [2012/28]01 / APOSTOLAKIS, Michalis V.
13 Trikalon Street
Heraklion
Crete / GR
02 / GATOS, Konstantinos G.
22 Chatzigianni Mexi Street
Kanithos
GR-34100 Chalkida Evia / GR
03 / KARANDINOS, Anthony G.
1 Ekavis Street
Amnissos
Heraklion
Crete / GR
Representative(s)Gill Jennings & Every LLP
The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/28]Clarke, Lionel Paul
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
Application number, filing date10751659.303.09.2010
WO2010EP62990
Priority number, dateGB2009001542004.09.2009         Original published format: GB 0915420
[2012/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011026955
Date:10.03.2011
Language:EN
[2011/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2473350
Date:11.07.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2011
[2012/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2473350
Date:17.04.2013
Language:EN
[2013/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.03.2011
ClassificationInternational:B32B27/32, C08J5/18
[2012/28]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/28]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORGEDEHNTE VERPACKUNGSFOLIE AUS POLYOLEFIN[2012/28]
English:POLYOLEFIN PRE-STRETCHED PACKAGING FILM[2012/28]
French:FILM D'EMBALLAGE POLYOLÉFINIQUE PRÉÉTIRÉ[2012/28]
Entry into regional phase22.03.2012National basic fee paid 
22.03.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
22.03.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.03.2012Examination requested  [2012/28]
08.08.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.02.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.03.2013Fee for grant paid
01.03.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.02.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  16.01.2014   
Silvalac, S.A.
C/Illes Balears, 19-23
08730 Monjos del Penedés Barcelona / ES
Opponent's representative
de Rooij, Mathieu Julien
Bardehle Pagenberg S.L.
Avenida Diagonal 420, 1° 1ª
08037 Barcelona / ES
 [2019/35]
Former [2016/06]
Opponent(s)01  16.01.2014   
Silvalac, S.A.
C/Illes Balears, 19-23
08730 Monjos del Penedés Barcelona / ES
Opponent's representative
ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen
Plaza Catalunya, 1
08002 Barcelona / ES
Former [2014/09]
Opponent(s)01  16.01.2014   
Silvalac, S.A.
C/Illes Balears, 19-23
08730 Monjos del Penedés Barcelona / ES
Opponent's representative
Canela Giménez, Teresa
Canela Patentes y Marcas Girona 148, 1-2
08037 Barcelona / ES
22.01.2014No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
04.02.2014No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
21.02.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
28.08.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
28.01.2016Date of oral proceedings
23.02.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
23.02.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition22.04.2016Appeal received No.  T0994/16
04.07.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU03.09.2010
AL17.04.2013
CY17.04.2013
CZ17.04.2013
EE17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
HR17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
MC17.04.2013
MK17.04.2013
MT17.04.2013
RO17.04.2013
SE17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
SK17.04.2013
SM17.04.2013
TR17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
NO17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
LU03.09.2013
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
[2018/46]
Former [2015/34]HU03.09.2010
CY17.04.2013
CZ17.04.2013
EE17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
HR17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
MC17.04.2013
MK17.04.2013
MT17.04.2013
RO17.04.2013
SE17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
SK17.04.2013
SM17.04.2013
TR17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
NO17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
LU03.09.2013
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
Former [2015/33]CY17.04.2013
CZ17.04.2013
EE17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
HR17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
MC17.04.2013
MK17.04.2013
MT17.04.2013
RO17.04.2013
SE17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
SK17.04.2013
SM17.04.2013
TR17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
NO17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
Former [2015/32]CY17.04.2013
CZ17.04.2013
EE17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
HR17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
MC17.04.2013
MK17.04.2013
MT17.04.2013
RO17.04.2013
SE17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
SK17.04.2013
SM17.04.2013
TR17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
NO17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
Former [2015/24]CY17.04.2013
CZ17.04.2013
EE17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
HR17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
MC17.04.2013
RO17.04.2013
SE17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
SK17.04.2013
SM17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
NO17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
Former [2014/20]CY17.04.2013
CZ17.04.2013
EE17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
HR17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
MC17.04.2013
RO17.04.2013
SE17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
SK17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
NO17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
Former [2014/11]CY17.04.2013
CZ17.04.2013
EE17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
HR17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
RO17.04.2013
SE17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
SK17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
NO17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
Former [2014/10]CY17.04.2013
CZ17.04.2013
EE17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
HR17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
SE17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
SK17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
NO17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
Former [2013/52]CY17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
HR17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
SE17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
NO17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
Former [2013/51]FI17.04.2013
HR17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
SE17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
NO17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
Former [2013/50]FI17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
SE17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
NO17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
Former [2013/49]FI17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
SE17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
NO17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
Former [2013/48]LT17.04.2013
NO17.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
Former [2013/47]LT17.04.2013
NO17.07.2013
Cited inInternational search[I]EP0145499  (ETHYL CORP [US]) [I] 1,18,20 * figure 6 *;
 [I]EP0820856  (KAVVADIAS HARILAOS [GR]) [I] 1,18,20 * figure 1 *;
 [I]WO9816177  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [I] 1,18,20 * figure 9 *;
 [I]DE29519905U  (DOERKEN EWALD AG [DE]) [I] 1,18,20 * figure 4 *;
 [I]WO03059750  (MEGA PLAST S A [GR], et al) [I] 1-23 * page 3, lines 1-5; figure 4 *
by applicantUS5093188
 US5935681
 EP1255681
 EP0820856
 EP0820856
 US2009104424
OppositionUS4189420
 US2005096613
    - Anonymous, "Instron 3360 series specifications brochure", Instron, pages 1 - 3, URL: http://instron-romania.com/media/POD_3300TableTop_Rev4_0311_hi_res.pdf, XP055289152