Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2312978

EP2312978 - DEVICE FOR PREPARING A DRINK EXTRACTED FROM A CAPSULE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  14.07.2017
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ethical Coffee Company SA
Rue de Faucigny 5
1700 Fribourg / CH
[2011/17]
Inventor(s)01 / MARILLER, Alain
Chemin de l'Hôtel du Parc 3
1801 Le Mont-Pèlerin / CH
 [2013/23]
Former [2011/17]01 / MARILLER, Alain
chemin de l'Hôtel du Parc 3
CH-1801 Le Mont-Pèlerin / CH
Representative(s)August Debouzy
6-8, avenue de Messine
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/23]August & Debouzy avocats
6-8, avenue de Messine
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2013/31]Grosfillier, Philippe
ANDRE ROLAND SA
Chemin des Charmettes 9
P.O. Box 5107
1002 Lausanne / CH
Former [2011/17]Grosfillier, Philippe
Andre Roland S.A. Avenue Tissot 15 P.O. Box 1255
1001 Lausanne / CH
Application number, filing date10752395.316.07.2010
[2011/17]
WO2010IB53256
Priority number, dateWO2009IB5320523.07.2009         Original published format: PCT/IB2009/053205
[2011/17]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011010262
Date:27.01.2011
Language:FR
[2011/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2312978
Date:27.04.2011
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2011
[2011/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2312978
Date:31.07.2013
Language:FR
[2013/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.01.2011
ClassificationInternational:A47J31/36
[2011/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES AUS EINER KAPSEL EXTRAHIERTEN GETRÄNKS[2011/17]
English:DEVICE FOR PREPARING A DRINK EXTRACTED FROM A CAPSULE[2011/17]
French:DISPOSITIF POUR LA PRÉPARATION D'UNE BOISSON EXTRAITE À PARTIR D'UNE CAPSULE[2013/23]
Former [2011/17]DISPOSITIF POUR LA PREPARATION D'UNE BOISSON EXTRAITE A PARTIR D'UNE CAPSULE
Entry into regional phase26.01.2011National basic fee paid 
26.01.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
26.01.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.01.2011Examination requested  [2011/17]
18.05.2011Observations by third parties
05.12.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.12.2011Observations by third parties
09.08.2012Observations by third parties
24.04.2013Observations by third parties
10.05.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.06.2013Fee for grant paid
06.06.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP13170004.9  / EP2638834
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.05.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  01.08.2013  08.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
NESTEC S.A./NESPRESSO FRANCE
Avenue Nestlé 55/1 Boulevard Pasteur
1800 Vevey, Vaud/75015 Paris FR / CH
Opponent's representative
Rupp, Christian, et al
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstraße 33
80331 München / DE
 [2016/35]
Former [2013/37]
Opponent(s)01  01.08.2013   
NESTEC S.A./NESPRESSO FRANCE
Avenue Nestlé 55/1 Boulevard Pasteur
1800 Vevey, Vaud/75015 Paris FR / CH
Opponent's representative
Santarelli, et al
14 Avenue de la Grande Armée B.P. 237
75822 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
05.06.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
12.12.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
28.01.2016Date of oral proceedings
15.03.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
15.03.2016Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
30.05.2017Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2017/33]
Appeal following opposition17.02.2016Appeal received No.  T0696/16
25.07.2016Statement of grounds filed
30.05.2017Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
30.05.2017Date of oral proceedings
02.06.2017Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
17.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU16.07.2010
AL31.07.2013
BG31.07.2013
CY31.07.2013
CZ31.07.2013
DK31.07.2013
EE31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
HR31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
MC31.07.2013
MK31.07.2013
MT31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
RO31.07.2013
SI31.07.2013
SK31.07.2013
SM31.07.2013
TR31.07.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
IE16.07.2014
LU16.07.2014
[2018/46]
Former [2018/30]HU16.07.2010
BG31.07.2013
CY31.07.2013
CZ31.07.2013
DK31.07.2013
EE31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
HR31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
MC31.07.2013
MK31.07.2013
MT31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
RO31.07.2013
SI31.07.2013
SK31.07.2013
SM31.07.2013
TR31.07.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
IE16.07.2014
LU16.07.2014
Former [2016/33]HU16.07.2010
BG31.07.2013
CY31.07.2013
CZ31.07.2013
DK31.07.2013
EE31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
HR31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
MC31.07.2013
MT31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
RO31.07.2013
SI31.07.2013
SK31.07.2013
SM31.07.2013
TR31.07.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
IE16.07.2014
LU16.07.2014
Former [2016/32]HU16.07.2010
BG31.07.2013
CY31.07.2013
CZ31.07.2013
DK31.07.2013
EE31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
HR31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
MC31.07.2013
MT31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
RO31.07.2013
SI31.07.2013
SK31.07.2013
SM31.07.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
IE16.07.2014
LU16.07.2014
Former [2016/28]BG31.07.2013
CY31.07.2013
CZ31.07.2013
DK31.07.2013
EE31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
HR31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
MC31.07.2013
MT31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
RO31.07.2013
SI31.07.2013
SK31.07.2013
SM31.07.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
IE16.07.2014
LU16.07.2014
Former [2016/22]CY31.07.2013
CZ31.07.2013
DK31.07.2013
EE31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
HR31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
MC31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
RO31.07.2013
SI31.07.2013
SK31.07.2013
SM31.07.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
IE16.07.2014
LU16.07.2014
Former [2016/21]CY31.07.2013
CZ31.07.2013
DK31.07.2013
EE31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
HR31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
MC31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
RO31.07.2013
SI31.07.2013
SK31.07.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
IE16.07.2014
LU16.07.2014
Former [2015/37]CY31.07.2013
CZ31.07.2013
DK31.07.2013
EE31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
HR31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
RO31.07.2013
SI31.07.2013
SK31.07.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
IE16.07.2014
LU16.07.2014
Former [2015/13]CY31.07.2013
CZ31.07.2013
DK31.07.2013
EE31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
HR31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
RO31.07.2013
SI31.07.2013
SK31.07.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
LU16.07.2014
Former [2014/23]CY31.07.2013
CZ31.07.2013
DK31.07.2013
EE31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
HR31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
RO31.07.2013
SI31.07.2013
SK31.07.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
Former [2014/22]CY31.07.2013
DK31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
HR31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
RO31.07.2013
SI31.07.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
Former [2014/21]CY31.07.2013
DK31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
HR31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
SI31.07.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
Former [2014/18]CY31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
HR31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
SI31.07.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
Former [2014/12]CY17.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
HR31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
SI31.07.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
Former [2014/11]CY17.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
HR31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
IS30.11.2013
Former [2014/10]CY17.07.2013
HR31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
IS30.11.2013
Former [2014/09]HR31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
Former [2014/08]LT31.07.2013
Cited inInternational search[XP]WO2009090201  (NESTEC SA [CH], et al) [XP] 1 * page 14, line 24 - line 35; figure 10 *;
 [A]EP1500357  (MONODOR SA [CH]) [A] 1-8 * figure 4 *;
 [A]US2003056661  (HU RUGUO [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * figures 4-12 *;
 [A]EP1295554  (SGL ITALIA SRL [IT]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *
by applicantUS2899886
 US2968560
 US3403617
 US3607297
 CH605293
 EP0242556
 EP0468079
 EP0806373
 EP0554469