Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2456689

EP2456689 - DEVICE FOR PREPARING A BEVERAGE EXTRACTED FROM A CAPSULE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.03.2013
Database last updated on 22.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.06.2019Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 10.07.2019  [2019/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ethical Coffee Company SA
Rue de Faucigny 5
1700 Fribourg / CH
[2012/22]
Inventor(s)01 / MARILLER, Alain
Chemin de l'Hôtel du Parc 3
1801 Le Mont-Pèlerin / CH
 [2013/05]
Former [2012/22]01 / MARILLER, Alain
chemin de l'Hôtel du Parc 3
CH-1801 Le Mont-Pèlerin / CH
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[N/P]
Former [2013/16]Grosfillier, Philippe
ANDRE ROLAND SA
Chemin des Charmettes 9
P.O. Box 5107
1002 Lausanne / CH
Former [2012/22]Grosfillier, Philippe
Andre Roland S.A.
P.O Box 5107
1002 Lausanne / CH
Application number, filing date10752396.116.07.2010
WO2010IB53257
Priority number, dateWO2009IB5322024.07.2009         Original published format: PCT/IB2009/053220
[2012/22]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011010263
Date:27.01.2011
Language:FR
[2011/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2456689
Date:30.05.2012
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2011
[2012/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2456689
Date:17.04.2013
Language:FR
[2013/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.01.2011
ClassificationInternational:B65D85/804, A47J31/36
[2012/22]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/22]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES AUS EINER KAPSEL EXTRAHIERTEN GETRÄNKS[2012/22]
English:DEVICE FOR PREPARING A BEVERAGE EXTRACTED FROM A CAPSULE[2012/22]
French:DISPOSITIF POUR LA PRÉPARATION D'UNE BOISSON EXTRAITE À PARTIR D'UNE CAPSULE[2013/05]
Former [2012/22]DISPOSITIF POUR LA PREPARATION D'UNE BOISSON EXTRAITE A PARTIR D'UNE CAPSULE
Entry into regional phase24.02.2012National basic fee paid 
24.02.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
24.02.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.02.2012Examination requested  [2012/22]
24.09.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.01.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.02.2013Fee for grant paid
28.02.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.01.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  17.01.2014  28.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Société des Produits Nestlé S.A.
Entre-deux-Villes
1800 Vevey / CH
Opponent's representative
Rupp, Christian, et al
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstraße 33
80331 München / DE
 [2019/28]
Former [2014/09]
Opponent(s)01  17.01.2014   
Nestec S.A.
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Opponent's representative
Rupp, Christian, et al
Mitscherlich & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstraße 33
80331 München / DE
21.02.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
19.06.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
12.10.2015Date of oral proceedings
20.01.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
20.01.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition10.03.2016Appeal received No.  T0603/16
30.05.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
Stay/Interruption12.11.2018Interruption of proceedings, reason: legal prevention of applicant[2019/26]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU16.07.2010
AL17.04.2013
CY17.04.2013
CZ17.04.2013
DK17.04.2013
EE17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
HR17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
MC17.04.2013
MK17.04.2013
MT17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
RO17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
SK17.04.2013
SM17.04.2013
TR17.04.2013
IE16.07.2013
LU16.07.2013
BG17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
[2018/46]
Former [2015/34]HU16.07.2010
CY17.04.2013
CZ17.04.2013
DK17.04.2013
EE17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
HR17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
MC17.04.2013
MK17.04.2013
MT17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
RO17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
SK17.04.2013
SM17.04.2013
TR17.04.2013
IE16.07.2013
LU16.07.2013
BG17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
Former [2015/32]CY17.04.2013
CZ17.04.2013
DK17.04.2013
EE17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
HR17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
MC17.04.2013
MK17.04.2013
MT17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
RO17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
SK17.04.2013
SM17.04.2013
TR17.04.2013
IE16.07.2013
BG17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
Former [2015/24]CY17.04.2013
CZ17.04.2013
DK17.04.2013
EE17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
HR17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
MC17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
RO17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
SK17.04.2013
SM17.04.2013
IE16.07.2013
BG17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
Former [2014/33]CY17.04.2013
CZ17.04.2013
DK17.04.2013
EE17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
HR17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
MC17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
RO17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
SK17.04.2013
IE16.07.2013
BG17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
Former [2014/14]CY17.04.2013
CZ17.04.2013
DK17.04.2013
EE17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
HR17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
MC17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
RO17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
SK17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
Former [2014/11]CY17.04.2013
CZ17.04.2013
DK17.04.2013
EE17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
HR17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
RO17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
SK17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
Former [2014/10]CY17.04.2013
CZ17.04.2013
DK17.04.2013
EE17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
HR17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
SK17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
Former [2014/09]CY17.04.2013
DK17.04.2013
EE17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
HR17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
Former [2013/52]CY17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
HR17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
Former [2013/51]FI17.04.2013
HR17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
Former [2013/50]FI17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
Former [2013/49]FI17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
GR18.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
Former [2013/48]LT17.04.2013
IS17.08.2013
Former [2013/47]LT17.04.2013
Cited inInternational search[XA]EP1654966  (NESTEC SA [CH]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0033] - [0073]; figure 6 * [A] 2,5;
 [XA]WO2009090201  (NESTEC SA [CH], et al) [X] 1 * page 11, paragraph 2 - page 21, paragraph 2; figures 1-3 * [A] 2,5;
 [A]WO2007137974  (NESTEC SA [CH], et al) [A] 1-5 * page 7, line 6 - page 12, line 24; figure - *;
 [A]WO2007122208  (NESTEC SA [CH], et al) [A] 1,2,5 * page 7, paragraph 8 - page 17, paragraph 1; figure - *
by applicantUS2899886
 US2968560
 US3403617
 US3607297
 CH605293
 EP0242556
 EP0468079
 EP0806373
 EP0554469