Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2456689 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2456689



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 732
21.06.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.06.2019 Request for transfer of rights - opponent Appeal 2
11.06.2019 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
11.06.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
31.05.2019 Request for transfer of rights - opponent Appeal 11
27.05.2019 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
24.05.2019 Brief communication to applicant Appeal 1
24.05.2019 Brief communication to third party Appeal 1
24.05.2019 Communication from the Legal Division Appeal 3
30.04.2019 Annex Appeal 4
30.04.2019 Letter to the Legal Division Appeal 2
20.03.2018 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
14.03.2018 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
22.01.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.01.2018 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 22
09.10.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.10.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
04.10.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
04.10.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 13
13.10.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.10.2016 Reply to appeal Appeal 18
22.07.2016 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
06.06.2016 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
04.06.2016 Claims Appeal 30
04.06.2016 Non-scannable object Appeal 15
04.06.2016 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
04.06.2016 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 4
30.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
30.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
30.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
30.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
30.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
30.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
30.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
30.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
30.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
30.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
30.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
30.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
30.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
30.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
30.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
30.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
30.05.2016 Claims Appeal 1
30.05.2016 Claims Appeal 1
30.05.2016 Claims Appeal 1
30.05.2016 Claims Appeal 1
30.05.2016 Claims Appeal 1
30.05.2016 Claims Appeal 1
30.05.2016 Claims Appeal 1
30.05.2016 Claims Appeal 1
30.05.2016 Claims Appeal 1
30.05.2016 Claims Appeal 1
30.05.2016 Claims Appeal 1
30.05.2016 Claims Appeal 1
30.05.2016 Claims Appeal 1
30.05.2016 Claims Appeal 1
30.05.2016 Claims Appeal 1
30.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
30.05.2016 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 19
05.04.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
29.03.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.03.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
21.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.03.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
18.03.2016 F3045 Inadmissibility of the appeal: missing address / missing name Appeal 1
18.03.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
18.03.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
18.03.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.03.2016 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
10.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
10.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
10.03.2016 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
17.02.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
05.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
05.02.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
05.02.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
02.02.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
01.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
01.02.2016 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
01.02.2016 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
26.01.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.01.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.01.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.01.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.01.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
20.01.2016 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
20.01.2016 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
20.01.2016 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 7
20.01.2016 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
20.01.2016 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
20.01.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
20.01.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
20.01.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
20.01.2016 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
20.01.2016 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
20.01.2016 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 4
21.10.2015 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.10.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.10.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
01.10.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 5
15.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.09.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
10.09.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.09.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.09.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.09.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.09.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.09.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.09.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.09.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.09.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.09.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.09.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.09.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.09.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.09.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.09.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
10.09.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.09.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 16
07.09.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 8
02.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.08.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
27.08.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.08.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
14.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.08.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
10.08.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.08.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
06.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.07.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.03.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
03.03.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.03.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.02.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.02.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
26.02.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
26.02.2015 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
26.02.2015 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
26.02.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.02.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.02.2015 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.11.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.10.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 15
25.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.06.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
19.06.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
19.06.2014 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 9
11.03.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
11.03.2014 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
26.02.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
21.02.2014 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
21.02.2014 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
17.02.2014 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
22.01.2014 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
17.01.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
17.01.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
17.01.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 14
17.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
17.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 31
17.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
17.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 27
17.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 41
17.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
17.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
17.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 46
17.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
17.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
17.04.2013 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
21.03.2013 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
28.02.2013 English translation of the claims Search / examination 1
28.02.2013 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
28.02.2013 German translation of the claims Search / examination 1
28.02.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
09.01.2013 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
09.01.2013 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
09.01.2013 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
09.01.2013 Text intended for grant Search / examination 9
24.09.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.09.2012 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
24.09.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 1
24.09.2012 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
24.09.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
01.08.2012 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
20.07.2012 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
04.05.2012 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
30.03.2012 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
24.03.2012 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
24.03.2012 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
07.02.2012 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
22.12.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
22.12.2011 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
02.12.2011 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
22.02.2011 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 16
27.01.2011 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
27.01.2011 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
27.01.2011 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 11
21.12.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
21.12.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
21.12.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
13.09.2010 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
13.09.2010 Claims International Searching Authority 1
13.09.2010 Description International Searching Authority 4
13.09.2010 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1
13.09.2010 Drawings International Searching Authority 4