Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2456689


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
07.06.2019 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  10.07.2019  [2019/28]
24.05.2019 Change - representative
24.05.2019 Interruption published on  26.06.2019  [2019/26]
12.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
16.03.2018 Change - representative
31.05.2016 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
15.03.2016 Change: Appeal number
14.03.2016 New entry: Appeal number
14.03.2016 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
12.02.2016 Change - representative
19.01.2016 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
19.01.2016 New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked
17.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.08.2015  [2015/34]
10.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.08.2015  [2015/33]
03.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.08.2015  [2015/32]
08.05.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.06.2015  [2015/24]
26.02.2015 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
11.07.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.08.2014  [2014/33]
20.06.2014 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
28.02.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.04.2014  [2014/14]
21.02.2014 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
07.02.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.03.2014  [2014/11]
31.01.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.03.2014  [2014/10]
24.01.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.02.2014  [2014/09]
24.01.2014 Opposition filed published on  26.02.2014  [2014/09]
22.11.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.12.2013  [2013/52]
15.11.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.12.2013  [2013/51]
08.11.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.12.2013  [2013/50]
01.11.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.12.2013  [2013/49]
25.10.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.11.2013  [2013/48]
18.10.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.11.2013  [2013/47]
15.03.2013 (Expected) grant published on  17.04.2013  [2013/16]
06.03.2013 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
06.03.2013 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
08.01.2013 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
28.12.2012 Change - inventor published on  30.01.2013  [2013/05]
28.12.2012 Change - French title published on  30.01.2013  [2013/05]
21.12.2012 Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
28.09.2012 Change - extension states published on  31.10.2012  [2012/44]
25.09.2012 Amendment by applicant
25.07.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.04.2012 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  30.05.2012  [2012/22]
27.04.2012 Request for examination filed published on  30.05.2012  [2012/22]
23.03.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
17.02.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
27.01.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
23.12.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
11.02.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
28.01.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
21.09.2010 PCT data prior to European publication