Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2460071

EP2460071 - AUTOMATED PROCESSING OF MULTI-USAGE DATA, IMPLEMENTING FUNCTIONS REQUIRING VARIOUS LEVELS OF SECURITY OR LIMITS OF RESPONSIBILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.03.2014
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.07.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Airbus
1, Rond-Point Maurice Bellonte
31700 Blagnac / FR
[2012/23]
Inventor(s)01 / VERMANDE, Severine
16 Résidence des Chênes
F-31620 Cepet / FR
02 / BIONDI, Philippe
26 rue d'Alésia
F-75014 Paris / FR
 [2012/23]
Representative(s)Santarelli
49, avenue des Champs-Elysées
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/34]Santarelli
49, avenue des Champs Elysées
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2012/23]Imbert de Tremiolles, Ghislain
Santarelli 14 Avenue de la Grande Armée
75017 PARIS / FR
Application number, filing date10752854.928.07.2010
WO2010FR00552
Priority number, dateFR2009005528128.07.2009         Original published format: FR 0955281
[2012/23]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2011020954
Date:24.02.2011
Language:FR
[2011/08]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2460071
Date:06.06.2012
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2011
[2012/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.04.2011
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/455, G06F21/24, H04W12/06
[2012/23]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/23]
TitleGerman:AUTOMATISIERTE VERARBEITUNG VON MEHRZWECKDATEN, IMPLEMENTIERUNG VON FUNKTIONEN MIT ERFORDERLICHEN VERSCHIEDENEN SICHERHEITSSTUFEN ODER VERANTWORTUNGSGRENZEN[2012/23]
English:AUTOMATED PROCESSING OF MULTI-USAGE DATA, IMPLEMENTING FUNCTIONS REQUIRING VARIOUS LEVELS OF SECURITY OR LIMITS OF RESPONSIBILITY[2012/23]
French:TRAITEMENT AUTOMATISÉ DE DONNÉES MULTI-USAGES, METTANT EN OEUVRE DES FONCTIONS AYANT BESOIN DE DIFFÉRENTS NIVEAUX DE SÛRETÉ OU LIMITES DE RESPONSABILITÉ[2012/23]
Entry into regional phase09.02.2012National basic fee paid 
09.02.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
09.02.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.02.2012Examination requested  [2012/23]
16.08.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.09.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.03.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.02.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination29.03.2017Appeal received No.  T1507/17
30.05.2017Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.09.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
22.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
23.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
23.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
22.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
24.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
27.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
25.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Cited inInternational search[X]US2002169987  (MEUSHAW ROBERT V [US] ET AL) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0032] *;
 [X]US2008216096  (WANG WANDING [CN]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0034] *;
 [X]US2005223220  (CAMPBELL RANDOLPH L [US] ET AL) [X] 1 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0055] *