Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2409063

EP2409063 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR STORING A LASER OPTICAL FIBER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.06.2015
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.07.2018  [2018/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Patient Pocket, Llc
405 Hialeah Drive
Cherry Hill, NJ 08002 / US
[2012/04]
Inventor(s)01 / SEFTEL, Allen, D.
405 Hialeah Drive
Cherry Hill NJ 08002 / US
02 / PASTOR, Stephen, T.
469 Steep Rock Drive
Sagamore Hills, OH 44067 / US
03 / WILLIAMS, Richard Alan
585 Dalaware Avenue
Akron, OH 44303 / US
 [2012/04]
Former [N/P]01 / SEFTEL, Allen, D.
405 Hialeah Drive
Cherry Hill NJ 08002 / US
Representative(s)Thalmeir, Anton
Patentanwalt
Laternenstrasse 27
86842 Türkheim / DE
[2014/33]
Former [2012/04]Thalmeir, Anton
Patentanwalt Laternenstrasse 27
86842 Türkheim / DE
Application number, filing date10754228.422.03.2010
WO2010US28141
Priority number, dateUS20090161840P20.03.2009         Original published format: US 161840 P
[2012/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010108175
Date:23.09.2010
Language:EN
[2010/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2409063
Date:25.01.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2010
[2012/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2409063
Date:13.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US23.09.2010
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.12.2012
ClassificationInternational:B65H75/36
[2013/02]
Former International [2012/04]F16L3/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/04]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR LAGERUNG EINER LASERGLASFASER[2012/04]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR STORING A LASER OPTICAL FIBER[2012/04]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR STOCKER UNE FIBRE OPTIQUE LASER[2012/04]
Entry into regional phase18.10.2011National basic fee paid 
18.10.2011Search fee paid 
18.10.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
18.10.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.10.2011Examination requested  [2012/04]
11.07.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.02.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.07.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
07.07.2014Fee for grant paid
07.07.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.02.2014
Opposition(s)15.05.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU22.03.2010
AT13.08.2014
CY13.08.2014
CZ13.08.2014
EE13.08.2014
FI13.08.2014
HR13.08.2014
LT13.08.2014
LV13.08.2014
MC13.08.2014
MK13.08.2014
MT13.08.2014
PL13.08.2014
RO13.08.2014
SE13.08.2014
SI13.08.2014
SK13.08.2014
SM13.08.2014
TR13.08.2014
BG13.11.2014
NO13.11.2014
GR14.11.2014
IS13.12.2014
PT15.12.2014
IE22.03.2015
LU22.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
[2018/30]
Former [2017/38]HU22.03.2010
AT13.08.2014
CY13.08.2014
CZ13.08.2014
EE13.08.2014
FI13.08.2014
HR13.08.2014
LT13.08.2014
LV13.08.2014
MC13.08.2014
MT13.08.2014
PL13.08.2014
RO13.08.2014
SE13.08.2014
SI13.08.2014
SK13.08.2014
SM13.08.2014
TR13.08.2014
BG13.11.2014
NO13.11.2014
GR14.11.2014
IS13.12.2014
PT15.12.2014
IE22.03.2015
LU22.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2017/03]AT13.08.2014
CY13.08.2014
CZ13.08.2014
EE13.08.2014
FI13.08.2014
HR13.08.2014
LT13.08.2014
LV13.08.2014
MC13.08.2014
MT13.08.2014
PL13.08.2014
RO13.08.2014
SE13.08.2014
SI13.08.2014
SK13.08.2014
BG13.11.2014
NO13.11.2014
GR14.11.2014
IS13.12.2014
PT15.12.2014
IE22.03.2015
LU22.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2016/07]AT13.08.2014
CY13.08.2014
CZ13.08.2014
EE13.08.2014
FI13.08.2014
HR13.08.2014
LT13.08.2014
LV13.08.2014
MC13.08.2014
PL13.08.2014
RO13.08.2014
SE13.08.2014
SI13.08.2014
SK13.08.2014
BG13.11.2014
NO13.11.2014
GR14.11.2014
IS13.12.2014
PT15.12.2014
IE22.03.2015
LU22.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2016/06]AT13.08.2014
CY13.08.2014
CZ13.08.2014
EE13.08.2014
FI13.08.2014
HR13.08.2014
LT13.08.2014
LV13.08.2014
MC13.08.2014
PL13.08.2014
RO13.08.2014
SE13.08.2014
SI13.08.2014
SK13.08.2014
BG13.11.2014
NO13.11.2014
GR14.11.2014
IS13.12.2014
PT15.12.2014
LU22.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2015/50]AT13.08.2014
CY13.08.2014
CZ13.08.2014
EE13.08.2014
FI13.08.2014
HR13.08.2014
LT13.08.2014
LV13.08.2014
MC13.08.2014
PL13.08.2014
RO13.08.2014
SE13.08.2014
SI13.08.2014
SK13.08.2014
BG13.11.2014
NO13.11.2014
GR14.11.2014
IS13.12.2014
PT15.12.2014
LU22.03.2015
Former [2015/47]AT13.08.2014
CY13.08.2014
CZ13.08.2014
EE13.08.2014
FI13.08.2014
HR13.08.2014
LT13.08.2014
LV13.08.2014
MC13.08.2014
PL13.08.2014
RO13.08.2014
SE13.08.2014
SK13.08.2014
BG13.11.2014
NO13.11.2014
GR14.11.2014
IS13.12.2014
PT15.12.2014
LU22.03.2015
Former [2015/46]AT13.08.2014
CY13.08.2014
CZ13.08.2014
EE13.08.2014
FI13.08.2014
HR13.08.2014
LT13.08.2014
LV13.08.2014
MC13.08.2014
PL13.08.2014
RO13.08.2014
SE13.08.2014
SK13.08.2014
BG13.11.2014
NO13.11.2014
GR14.11.2014
IS13.12.2014
PT15.12.2014
Former [2015/24]AT13.08.2014
CY13.08.2014
CZ13.08.2014
EE13.08.2014
FI13.08.2014
HR13.08.2014
LT13.08.2014
LV13.08.2014
PL13.08.2014
RO13.08.2014
SE13.08.2014
SK13.08.2014
BG13.11.2014
NO13.11.2014
GR14.11.2014
IS13.12.2014
PT15.12.2014
Former [2015/23]AT13.08.2014
CY13.08.2014
CZ13.08.2014
EE13.08.2014
FI13.08.2014
HR13.08.2014
LT13.08.2014
LV13.08.2014
RO13.08.2014
SE13.08.2014
SK13.08.2014
BG13.11.2014
NO13.11.2014
GR14.11.2014
IS13.12.2014
PT15.12.2014
Former [2015/22]AT13.08.2014
CY13.08.2014
FI13.08.2014
HR13.08.2014
LT13.08.2014
LV13.08.2014
RO13.08.2014
SE13.08.2014
BG13.11.2014
NO13.11.2014
GR14.11.2014
IS13.12.2014
PT15.12.2014
Former [2015/12]AT13.08.2014
CY13.08.2014
FI13.08.2014
HR13.08.2014
LT13.08.2014
LV13.08.2014
SE13.08.2014
BG13.11.2014
NO13.11.2014
GR14.11.2014
IS13.12.2014
PT15.12.2014
Former [2015/11]CY13.08.2014
FI13.08.2014
LT13.08.2014
SE13.08.2014
BG13.11.2014
NO13.11.2014
GR14.11.2014
PT15.12.2014
Former [2015/10]FI13.08.2014
LT13.08.2014
SE13.08.2014
BG13.11.2014
NO13.11.2014
Former [2015/09]FI13.08.2014
LT13.08.2014
SE13.08.2014
Former [2015/08]LT13.08.2014
Documents cited:Search[A]US5263585  (LAWHON HARVEY A [US] ET AL) [A] 1,13 * column 3, line 67 - column 4, line 9 * * column 7, lines 10-68; figure - *;
 [A]FR2685627  (CHEVAL FRERES SA [FR]) [A] 1,13 * page 4, line 36 - page 5, line 20; figure - *;
 [A]US5103816  (KIRSCHBAUM WARREN [US] ET AL) [A] 1,13 * column 7, lines 35-52; figure - *;
 [A]US4977904  (KAUFMAN JACK W [US]) [A] 1,13 * column 4, lines 32-38; figure - *;
 [A]EP0574226  (SHERIDAN CATHETER CORP [US] SHERIDAN CATHETER CORP [BE]) [A] 1,13 * abstract *;
 [A]US5640923  (LONG CHARLES C [US]) [A] 1,13 * column 10, lines 10-42; figures 9,13 *;
 [A]US4522594  (STARK MARVIN M [US] ET AL) [A] 1,13 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0722702  (CORDIS EUROP [NL]) [A] 1,13 * abstract *
International search[Y]US5263585  (LAWHON ET AL.);
 [Y]US6144791  (WACH ET AL.);
 [Y]US5219650  (RITTER);
 [Y]US4952012  (STAMNITZ);
 [Y]US6840238  (VAN HEGELSOM);
 [A]US5873865  (HORZEWSKI ET AL.)
ExaminationUS4998795
 US2003147618