Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2478603 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2478603



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 768
12.04.2021 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
07.04.2021 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.04.2021 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
29.03.2021 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 18
29.03.2021 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 20
29.03.2021 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 20
02.03.2021 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 4
02.03.2021 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 4
02.03.2021 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 3
17.02.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
17.02.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
09.02.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
09.02.2021 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
08.02.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
08.02.2021 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 26
08.02.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
29.01.2021 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.01.2021 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
25.01.2021 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
25.01.2021 Oral proceedings: change of venue Appeal 4
25.01.2021 Oral proceedings: change of venue Appeal 4
21.01.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.01.2021 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 6
21.01.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.01.2021 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
15.01.2021 Claims Appeal 20
15.01.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
15.01.2021 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
11.01.2021 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 10
21.12.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.12.2020 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
21.12.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
21.12.2020 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
15.12.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
15.12.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
15.12.2020 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
06.05.2020 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.05.2020 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.04.2020 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 7
28.04.2020 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 7
28.04.2020 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
28.04.2020 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
28.04.2020 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 4
25.02.2020 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
22.01.2020 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Appeal 3
22.01.2020 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 2
09.01.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
09.01.2020 Annexes in respect of a client data request Appeal 3
09.01.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
09.01.2020 Submission concerning change of applicant's name Appeal 1
26.06.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.06.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.06.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.06.2017 Reply to appeal Appeal 9
14.06.2017 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 2
14.06.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.06.2017 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
02.06.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
02.06.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
02.06.2017 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
02.02.2017 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
24.01.2017 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 29
23.01.2017 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 29
02.12.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
02.12.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
29.11.2016 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
28.11.2016 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
28.11.2016 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
24.11.2016 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
24.11.2016 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
24.11.2016 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
20.10.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.10.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.10.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.10.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.09.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
27.09.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
27.09.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 12
27.09.2016 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
27.09.2016 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 7
27.09.2016 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 22
27.09.2016 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
27.09.2016 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
27.09.2016 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
27.09.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
27.09.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
27.09.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
27.09.2016 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
27.09.2016 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 3
06.07.2016 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 5
13.06.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.06.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
06.06.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
06.06.2016 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Opposition 9
06.06.2016 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Opposition 3
06.06.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 12
02.06.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.06.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
23.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
23.05.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.05.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.05.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
23.05.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
11.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
06.05.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.05.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
18.02.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.02.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.02.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.02.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.02.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
02.02.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
02.02.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 11
02.02.2016 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
02.02.2016 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
02.02.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.02.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
01.12.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.11.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
24.11.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
24.11.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 20
03.02.2015 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
09.01.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.12.2014 Claims Opposition 1
23.12.2014 Claims Opposition 1
23.12.2014 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 12
04.11.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.11.2014 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
28.10.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.10.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
28.10.2014 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.10.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
12.08.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.08.2014 Authorisation Opposition 1
06.08.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
27.06.2014 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
27.06.2014 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
28.05.2014 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
20.05.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
20.05.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 24
20.05.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
20.05.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
20.05.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
20.05.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
20.05.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
20.05.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
20.05.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
20.05.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
20.05.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
20.05.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
05.11.2013 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
29.10.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.10.2013 Annexes in respect of a client data request Search / examination 1
29.10.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
29.10.2013 Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) Search / examination 1
21.08.2013 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
25.07.2013 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
08.07.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
08.07.2013 English translation of the claims Search / examination 2
08.07.2013 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
08.07.2013 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
08.07.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
03.04.2013 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
03.04.2013 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
03.04.2013 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
03.04.2013 Text intended for grant Search / examination 9
08.11.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
08.11.2012 Claims Search / examination 2
08.11.2012 Description Search / examination 1
08.11.2012 Description Search / examination 1
08.11.2012 Drawings Search / examination 2
08.11.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
08.11.2012 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.10.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
08.10.2012 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 1
08.10.2012 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
17.08.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
17.08.2012 Description Search / examination 3
17.08.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
17.08.2012 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
14.08.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
14.08.2012 Claims Search / examination 2
14.08.2012 Description Search / examination 4
14.08.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
14.08.2012 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
09.08.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
09.08.2012 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 1
09.08.2012 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
27.06.2012 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
13.04.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
13.04.2012 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
13.04.2012 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
13.04.2012 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
13.04.2012 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
12.04.2012 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 9
03.04.2012 Notification of the recording of a change PCT receiving Office 1
03.04.2012 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
27.01.2012 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
13.04.2011 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 11
13.04.2011 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 11
24.03.2011 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
24.03.2011 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
24.03.2011 Published international application - A1 Search / examination 10
21.02.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII International Searching Authority 2
21.02.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet International Searching Authority 1
21.02.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box International Searching Authority 5
15.09.2010 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
15.09.2010 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
15.09.2010 Claims PCT receiving Office 2
15.09.2010 Description PCT receiving Office 5
15.09.2010 Drawings PCT receiving Office 2
15.09.2010 Priority document (RO-procedure) PCT receiving Office 10
15.09.2010 Priority document (RO-procedure) PCT receiving Office 10