Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2438068

EP2438068 - SUBSTITUTED 6-(2-HYDROXYBENZYLAMINO)PURINE DERIVATIVES, THEIR USE AS MEDICAMENTS AND COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING THESE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.01.2017
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip22.09.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 25.10.2017 [2017/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Univerzita Palackého v Olomouci
Krízkovského 8
771 47 Olomouc / CZ
For all designated states
Biopatterns s.r.o.
Slechtitelu 813/21
779 00 Olomouc / CZ
[2012/15]
Inventor(s)01 / ZATLOUKAL, Marek
Revolucni 18a
787 01 Sumperk / CZ
02 / KRYSTOF, Vladimir
Varsavske nam. 7
779 00 Olomouc / CZ
03 / HAVLICEK, Libor
Trnkova 1774
142 00 Praha 4 / CZ
04 / POPA, Igor
Masarykova trida 959/61
772 00 Olomouc / CZ
05 / DOLEZAL, Karel
Posluchov 31
783 65 Hlubocky / CZ
06 / STRNAD, Miroslav
Západní 25
779 00 Olomouc / CZ
07 / JORDA, Radek
Zelená 5
779 00 Olomouc / CZ
 [2012/15]
Representative(s)Hartvichova, Katerina , et al
Inventia s.r.o.
Na Belidle 3
150 00 Praha 5 / CZ
[2017/09]
Former [2012/15]Gabrielova, Marta , et al
Inventia s.r.o. Na Belidle 3
150 00 Praha 5 / CZ
Application number, filing date10754660.802.06.2010
[2017/09]
WO2010CZ00067
Priority number, dateCZ2009000035903.06.2009         Original published format: CZ 20090359
[2012/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010139289
Date:09.12.2010
Language:EN
[2010/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2438068
Date:11.04.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.2010
[2012/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2438068
Date:01.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/09]
Search report(s)International search reportEP09.12.2010
ClassificationInternational:C07D473/16, A61K31/52
[2012/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/15]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SUBSTITUIERTE 6-(2-HYDROXYBENZYLAMINO)PURIN-DERIVATE, DEREN VERWENDUNG ALS MEDIKAMENTE UND DEREN ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN[2016/50]
English:SUBSTITUTED 6-(2-HYDROXYBENZYLAMINO)PURINE DERIVATIVES, THEIR USE AS MEDICAMENTS AND COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING THESE DERIVATIVES[2012/15]
French:DÉRIVÉS DE 6-(2-HYDROXYBENZYLAMINO)PURINE SUBSTITUÉS, LEUR UTILISATION EN TANT QUE MÉDICAMENTS ET COMPOSITIONS CONTENANT CES DÉRIVÉS[2012/15]
Former [2012/15]SUBSTITUIERTE 6-(2-HYDROXYBENZYLAMINO)PURIN-DERIVATE, IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS MEDIKAMENTE UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT DIESEN DERIVATEN
Entry into regional phase22.11.2011National basic fee paid 
22.11.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
22.11.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.11.2011Examination requested  [2012/15]
27.06.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.08.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.10.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.11.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.12.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
02.01.2017Fee for grant paid
02.01.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.08.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
03.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
29.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
02.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
15.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
NL01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
[2017/41]
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO0149688  (UNIVERSITAIRE INSTELLING ANTWE [BE], et al) [Y] 3-10,12 * claim 1 * * pages 55-56; table 2; compounds entries 17-21 * * page 61; table 3; compounds entries 1, 4, 10 *;
 [Y]EP1348707  (USTAV EX BOTAN AV CR I OF EX B [CZ]) [Y] 3-10,12 * claim 1 * * entries 27-35; 68-76; 109-117; pages 57-62; example 20; table 5 *;
 [X]  - SILLER M. ET AL., "Interactions of Olomoucine II with human liver microsomal Cytochrome P450", DRUG METABOLISM AND DISPOSITION, (20090227), vol. 37, no. 6, pages 1198 - 1202, XP002606995 [X] 1-2,11 * page 1198, column 2, lines 22-28 * * page 1199, column 1, lines 1-17 * * page 1199; figure 1; compounds b, c *
 [Y]  - KRYSTOF V. ET AL., "Synthesis and biological activity of Olomoucine II", BIOORGANIC AND MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (2002), vol. 12, pages 3283 - 3286, XP002606996 [Y] 3-10,12 * abstract * * page 3284; table 1; compound Olomoucine II * * page 3284, column 2, lines 22-31 *
 [PX]  - NISLER J. ET AL., "Cytokinin receptor antagonists derived from 6-benzylaminopurine", PHYTOCHEMISTRY, (20100225), vol. 71, pages 823 - 830, XP002606997 [PX] 1-12 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.PHYTOCHEM.2010.01.018
 [PX]  - TRAVNICEK Z. ET AL., "The first iron(III) complexes with cyclin-dependent kinase inhibitors: magnetic, spectroscopic (IR, ES+MS, NMR, 57Fe Mössbauer), theoretical and biological activity studies", JOURNAL OF INORGANIC BIOCHEMISTRY, (20091205), vol. 104, pages 405 - 417, XP002606998 [PX] 1-12 * abstract * * page 406; compound L2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.JINORGBIO.2009.12.002
by applicant   - MEYERSON M. ET AL., EMBO J., (1992), vol. 11, pages 2909 - 2917,
    - SHERR, C.J., CELL, (1994), vol. 79, pages 551 - 555,
    - HARPER, J.W. ET AL., GENES DEV., (1998), vol. 12, pages 285 - 289,
    - MORGAN, D.O., NATURE, (1995), vol. 374, pages 131 - 134,
    - SHERR, C.J.; ROBERTS, J.M., GENES DEV., (1995), vol. 9, pages 1149 - 1163,
    - MEINHART, A. ET AL., GENS. DEV., (2005), vol. 19, pages 1401 - 1415,
    - FISCHER, P.M.; GIANELLA-BORRADORI, A., EXPERT OPIN. INVESTIC. DRUGS, (2005), vol. 14, pages 457 - 469,
    - HARDCASTLE, I.R. ET AL., ANNU. REV. PHARMACOL. TOXICOL., (2002), vol. 42, pages 325 - 348,
    - SHAPIRO, G.I., J. CLIN. ONCOL., (2006), vol. 24, pages 1770 - 1783,
    - PALANCADE, B.; BENSAUDE, O., EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (2003), vol. 270, pages 3859 - 3870,
    - CHAO, S.H.; PRICE, D.H., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2001), vol. 276, pages 31793 - 31799,
    - LU, X. ET AL., MOL. CANCER THER., (2004), vol. 3, pages 861 - 872,
    - MCCLUE, S.J. ET AL., INT. J. CANCER, (2002), vol. 102, pages 463 - 468,
    - ALVI, A.J. ET AL., BLOOD, (2005), vol. 105, pages 4484 - 4491,
    - RAJE, N. ET AL., BLOOD, (2005), vol. 106, pages 1042 - 1047,
    - OLOMOUCINE II; KRYSTOF V. ET AL., CELL. MOL. LIFE SCI., (2005), vol. 62, pages 1763 - 1771,
    - KRYSTOF, V. ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (2006), vol. 49, pages 6500 - 6509,
    - PARKER ET AL., PHYTOCHEMISTRY, (1986), vol. 25, pages 303 - 310,
    - BRIK ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM., (2005), vol. 13, pages 4622 - 4626,
    - PITTS ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LET., (2004), vol. 14, pages 2955 - 2958,
    - RYPKA ET AL., XENOBIOTICA, (2002), vol. 32, pages 1017 - 1032,
    - LU ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (2007), vol. 72, pages 5012 - 5015,
    - KELLEY ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1988), vol. 31, pages 2001 - 2004,
    - NAITO ET AL., CHEM. PHARM. BUL., (1982), vol. 30, pages 2011 - 2019,
    - DALBY ET AL., ANGEW. CHEM. GERMAN, (1993), vol. 105, pages 1822 - 1823,
    - WETERINGS ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LET., (2006), vol. 16, pages 3258 - 3261,
    - TOYOTA ET AL., SYNTH. COMMUN., (1993), vol. 23, pages 1295 - 1305,
    - GUNDERSEN ET AL., TETRAHEDRON, (1995), vol. 36, pages 1945 - 1948,
    - LU ET AL., J. ORGAN. CHEM., (2007), vol. 72, pages 5012 - 5015,
    - SHUM ET AL., NUCLEOS. NUCLEOT, (2001), vol. 20, pages 1067 - 1078,
    - DREZER ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (2001), vol. 44, pages 524 - 530,
    - FREBUNG ET AL., CANCER RES., vol. 52, pages 1992 - 6976,
    - SAMBROOK ET AL., MOL. CLONING, NEW YORK, (1989),