blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2480065 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP09171021 EP10755162



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9320211Global Dossier 26.04.2016B2
US2012185960 19.07.2012A1
Priority number Date
EP09171021 22.09.2009
WO2010EP63761 19.09.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2480065Global Dossier 22.05.2019B1
EP2480065 01.08.2012A1
Priority number Date
EP09171021 22.09.2009
WO2010EP63761 19.09.2010
EP10755162 19.09.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2010299993B 07.08.2014B2
AU2010299993 23.02.2012A1
Priority number Date
EP09171021 22.09.2009
WO2010EP63761 19.09.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX2012002791 11.04.2012A
Priority number Date
EP09171021 22.09.2009
WO2010EP63761 19.09.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ZA201200975 28.11.2018B
Priority number Date
EP09171021 22.09.2009
WO2010EP63761 19.09.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2011036108Global Dossier 31.03.2011A1
Priority number Date
EP09171021 22.09.2009
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2308285Global Dossier 13.04.2011A1
Priority number Date
EP09171021 22.09.2009
TypeType Divisional application