Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2411028

EP2411028 - THERAPY FOR PROMOTING CELL GROWTH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2012/05]Therapy for promoting cell growth
[2018/52]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.04.2019
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.12.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  19.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Correction of patent specificationpublished on 20.11.2019  [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Moleac Pte Ltd.
11 Biopolis Way Helios No. 09-08
Singapore 138667 / SG
[2012/05]
Inventor(s)01 / LAZDUNSKI, Michel, Maurice, Jacques
21 ave Colombo
F-06000 Nice / FR
02 / HEURTEAUX, Catherine, Louise, Claude
Résidence ELVINA HILLS Bat D1
1133 Route de Saint Jean
F-06600 Antibes / FR
03 / PICARD, David
18 Sian Tuan Avenue
Singapore 588292 / SG
 [2012/05]
Representative(s)Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[2019/20]
Former [2012/05]Clegg, Richard Ian , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London
Greater London EC2V 8AS / GB
Application number, filing date10756446.029.03.2010
[2019/20]
WO2010SG00122
Priority number, dateUS20090164352P27.03.2009         Original published format: US 164352 P
[2012/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010110755
Date:30.09.2010
Language:EN
[2010/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2411028
Date:01.02.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2010
[2012/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2411028
Date:15.05.2019
Language:EN
[2019/20]
Type: B9 Corrected patent specification 
No.:EP2411028
Date:20.11.2019
[2019/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU30.09.2010
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.02.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61K36/00, A61K36/236, A61K36/65, A61K36/537, A61K36/69, A61K36/736, A61K36/888, A61K36/286, A61P9/10, A61P25/28
[2012/05]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/05]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:THERAPIE ZUR FÖRDERUNG VON ZELLWACHSTUM[2012/05]
English:THERAPY FOR PROMOTING CELL GROWTH[2018/52]
French:THÉRAPIE PROMOUVANT LA CROISSANCE DES CELLULES[2018/52]
Former [2012/05]Therapy for promoting cell growth
Former [2012/05]Thérapie promouvant la croissance des cellules
Entry into regional phase07.10.2011National basic fee paid 
07.10.2011Search fee paid 
07.10.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
07.10.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.01.2011Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
07.10.2011Examination requested  [2012/05]
22.10.2012Observations by third parties
11.10.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
20.12.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.04.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.08.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.01.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.09.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.12.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.04.2019Fee for grant paid
05.04.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.04.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.04.2016
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application
20.12.2013Request for further processing filed
20.12.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
30.01.2014Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
20.12.2013Request for further processing filed
20.12.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
16.01.2014Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
11.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
12.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
24.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
25.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
24.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
23.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
26.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO2007043796  (DIGITAL BIOTECH CO LTD [KR], et al) [Y] 1-15 *cf. abstract, section [9] at page 3, claims 1/2*;
 [YL]CN102091166
 [YL]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2011, no. 51, Database accession no. 2011-J08612, XP002690914 & CN102091166 A 20110615 (UNIV FUDAN HUASHAN HOSPITAL) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * [L]
International search[X]WO2007106049  (MOLEAC PTE LTD [SG], et al);
 [X]CN101279016  (QINGJU ZHAO [CN]);
 [X]  - CHARLES HUA CHIANG SIOW, "Neuroaid in Stroke Recovery", EUR NEUROL, (2008), vol. 60, pages 264 - 266, XP008147710

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1159/000155220
 [X]  - QIUTAO GAO ET AL., "Verification of the formulation and efficacy of Danggui Buxae Tang (a decoction of radix Astragali and radix AngelicaeSinensis): an exemplifying systematic approach to revealing the complexity of Chinese herbal medicine formulae.", CHINESE MEDICINE, (2007), vol. 2, no. 12, pages 1 - 10, XP021039811
 [X]  - MENG H ET AL., "Angiogenic effects of the extracts from herbs: Angelica and Chuanxiong", AM J CHIN MED., (2008), vol. 36, no. 3, pages 541 - 554, XP008166827

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1142/S0192415X08005965
other   - "Aarukum", TKDL, Database accession no. AK12/372, XP003030885
    - MAHENDRA BHAUGIKA, Dhanvantarinighantauh, (2002), page 154
    - "Khokh/Shaftaloo", TKDL, Database accession no. AH1/259, XP003030886
    - ABU ALI LBN E SINA, Al-Qaanoon-fil-Tibb, (1987), vol. II, page 169
    - "Ghiza-e-Dawaee Barae Rasha", TKDL, Database accession no. AA1/143, XP003030887
    - ABU BAKR MOHAMMAD.BIN ZAKARIYYA AL-RAZI, Kitaab-al-Haawi-fil-Tibb, (1974), vol. I, page 71
    - "Shorba Bara-e-Raasha", TKDL, Database accession no. AA1/170, XP003030888
    - ABU BAKR MOHAMMAD.BINZAKARIYYA AL-RAZI, Kitaab-al-Haawi-fil-Tibb, (1974), vol. I, page 75
    - "Majoon-e-Sanjari", TKDL, Database accession no. MH1/3382, XP003030889
    - MOHAMMAD SHAREEF KHAN, Ilaaj-al-Amraaz, (1921), page 287