EP2414373 - NOVEL SODIUM CHANNEL BLOCKING COMPOUNDS TETRODOTOXIN GALACTOPYRANOSIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.12.2013 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.01.2014 [2014/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wex Medical Limited No. 2 Dai Fu Street Tai Po Industrial Estate N.T. Hong Kong / CN | For all designated states Lin, Weiyang 1519, 15/F, Block 2 Lei Muk Shue Estate Kwaichung N.T. Hong Kong / CN | [2012/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIN, Weiyang 1519, 15/F, BLOCK 2 Lei Muk Shue Estate Kwaichung N.T. Hong Kong / CN | [2012/06] | Representative(s) | ABG Intellectual Property Law, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2012/06] | ABG Patentes, S.L. Avenida de Burgos 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 10757967.4 | 26.03.2010 | WO2010CA00470 | Priority number, date | US20090211471P | 30.03.2009 Original published format: US 211471 P | [2012/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010111777 | Date: | 07.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2414373 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 07.10.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07H15/26, A61K31/7042, A61P29/00 | [2012/06] | CPC: |
A61K31/7042 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP);
C07H15/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/06] | Title | German: | NEUE NATRIUMKANALBLOCKERVERBINDUNGEN MIT TETRODOTOXIN UND GALACTOPYRANOSIDEN | [2012/06] | English: | NOVEL SODIUM CHANNEL BLOCKING COMPOUNDS TETRODOTOXIN GALACTOPYRANOSIDES | [2012/06] | French: | NOUVEAUX COMPOSÉS GALACTOPYRANOSIDES DE TÉTRODOTOXINE BLOQUANT LES CANAUX SODIQUES | [2012/06] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2011 | Search fee paid | 26.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/06] | 29.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/03] | 12.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2007025213 (WEX PHARMACEUTICALS INC [CA], et al) [A] 1-13 * Claims and Formulae (I) and (IV) pages 6-8 and 10-11 *; | [A] - EIICHI YOSHIDA, "Photoaffinity Labeling of the Electroplax Sodium Channel with Tetrodotoxin Derivatives. II. Comparison of the Photoreactivity of Different Photoactivable Groups in the Tetrodotoxin Binding Site", CHEM. PHARM. BULL., (19900101), vol. 38, no. 4, pages 982 - 987, XP055043802 [A] 1-13 * Whole document; in particular chart 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1248/cpb.38.982 | International search | [A]WO0242308 (NANNING MAPLE LEAF PHARMACEUTI [CN], et al); | [A]US6552191 (ZHOU MAOQING [CN], et al); | [T] - HANIFIN C. T., "The Chemical and Evolutionary Ecology of Tetrodotoxin (TTX) Toxicity in Terrestrial Vertebrates", MAR. DRUGS, (201008), pages 577 - 593, XP008154275 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/md8030577 |