Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2482866 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2482866



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1337
17.05.2024 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 4
17.05.2024 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 4
10.05.2024 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
05.02.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
05.02.2024 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.02.2024 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
30.01.2024 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.01.2024 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
30.01.2024 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 17
30.01.2024 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 2
30.01.2024 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
30.01.2024 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
30.01.2024 Means of redress Opposition 2
30.01.2024 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 3
30.01.2024 Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition Opposition 27
30.01.2024 Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition Opposition 27
17.10.2023 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
12.10.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
12.10.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
12.10.2023 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.08.2023 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
02.08.2023 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
02.08.2023 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
02.08.2023 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
02.08.2023 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
20.04.2023 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
17.04.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
17.04.2023 Amended description with annotations Opposition 11
17.04.2023 Description Opposition 11
17.04.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
17.04.2023 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.02.2023 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
07.02.2023 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
07.02.2023 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
07.02.2023 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
07.02.2023 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
13.12.2022 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 30
13.12.2022 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
13.12.2022 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
11.10.2022 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
11.10.2022 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
11.10.2022 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 4
08.09.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.09.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
06.09.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
06.09.2022 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
06.09.2022 Claims Appeal 3
06.09.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
06.09.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
06.09.2022 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
06.09.2022 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Appeal 1
06.09.2022 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 2
01.09.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
31.08.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
31.08.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
31.08.2022 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
23.08.2022 Oral proceedings: change of venue Appeal 5
23.08.2022 Oral proceedings: change of venue Appeal 5
19.08.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 5
18.08.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
18.08.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
18.08.2022 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
08.08.2022 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 6
08.08.2022 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 6
05.08.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.08.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
01.08.2022 General enquiry Appeal 1
01.08.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
20.07.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.07.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
15.07.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
15.07.2022 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
30.05.2022 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 4
30.05.2022 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 4
23.05.2022 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
10.02.2022 F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
11.02.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.02.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
06.02.2019 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 15
06.02.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
06.02.2019 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
04.01.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.12.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
19.12.2018 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 73
19.12.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
19.12.2018 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 17
06.08.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.07.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
30.07.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
30.07.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
30.07.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
30.07.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
30.07.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
30.07.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
30.07.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
30.07.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
30.07.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
30.07.2018 Claims Appeal 3
30.07.2018 Claims Appeal 3
30.07.2018 Claims Appeal 3
30.07.2018 Claims Appeal 3
30.07.2018 Claims Appeal 3
30.07.2018 Claims Appeal 3
30.07.2018 Claims Appeal 3
30.07.2018 Claims Appeal 3
30.07.2018 Claims Appeal 3
30.07.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
30.07.2018 Reply to appeal Appeal 18
28.03.2018 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
23.03.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
23.03.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
23.03.2018 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 24
30.01.2018 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
24.01.2018 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
23.01.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
23.01.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
23.01.2018 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
13.12.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.11.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.11.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.11.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.11.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.11.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.11.2017 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
14.11.2017 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
14.11.2017 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
14.11.2017 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 21
14.11.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
14.11.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
14.11.2017 Means of redress Opposition 2
14.11.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
14.11.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
14.11.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
14.11.2017 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
13.09.2017 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.06.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.06.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
19.06.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
19.06.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 15
15.05.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.04.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
26.04.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
26.04.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.03.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
31.01.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.01.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.01.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.01.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.01.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.01.2017 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 11
20.01.2017 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
20.01.2017 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
20.01.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.01.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.10.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.10.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
10.10.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
10.10.2016 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 13
02.06.2016 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
02.06.2016 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
22.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
22.04.2016 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 6
22.04.2016 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 4
22.04.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
22.04.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
22.04.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
22.04.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.04.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
22.04.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
22.04.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
22.04.2016 Notice of opposition Opposition 21
22.04.2016 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
22.04.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 81
22.04.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 46
22.04.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 35
22.04.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 87
22.04.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 39
22.04.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
22.04.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 71
22.04.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 27
22.04.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
22.04.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
23.07.2015 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
25.06.2015 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
08.06.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.06.2015 English translation of the claims Search / examination 3
08.06.2015 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
08.06.2015 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
08.06.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
23.02.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
23.02.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
23.02.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
23.02.2015 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 17
23.02.2015 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 17
13.02.2015 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
04.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
04.02.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
04.02.2015 Claims Search / examination 3
04.02.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
04.02.2015 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 2
24.09.2014 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
24.09.2014 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
24.09.2014 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
24.09.2014 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 17
24.09.2014 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 17
14.03.2014 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
12.03.2014 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
14.06.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
14.06.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
14.06.2013 Claims Search / examination 3
14.06.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
14.06.2013 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
14.02.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
14.02.2013 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
17.10.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
17.10.2012 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
17.10.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
17.10.2012 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
17.10.2012 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 6
17.10.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
11.07.2012 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
21.05.2012 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
27.04.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.04.2012 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
20.04.2012 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
10.02.2012 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
28.04.2011 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 18
07.04.2011 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
07.04.2011 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
07.04.2011 Published international application - A1 Search / examination 17
12.01.2011 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
11.01.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII International Searching Authority 2
11.01.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet International Searching Authority 1
11.01.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box International Searching Authority 2
29.09.2010 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
29.09.2010 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
29.09.2010 Claims PCT receiving Office 3
29.09.2010 Description PCT receiving Office 10
29.09.2010 Drawings PCT receiving Office 3