Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2464360

EP2464360 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING METAL HYDROXIDES, HYDROXYL ORGANOMETALS AND WHITE CARBON SUITABLE FOR USE IN AYURVEDIC MEDICINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.01.2017
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.08.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ICS Green Growing SRL
Via Lev Tolstoi 27, App. 32
2001 Chisinau / MD
[2012/25]
Inventor(s)01 / MERATI, Antonio
Via Palestro 20
I-24030 Brembate Sopra / IT
 [2012/25]
Representative(s)Gervasi, Gemma
Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A.
Corso di Porta Vittoria 9
20122 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2012/25]Villa, Livia
Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A.
Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9
20122 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date10759993.813.08.2010
WO2010IB53660
Priority number, dateIT2009MI0147913.08.2009         Original published format: IT MI20091479
[2012/25]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011018773
Date:17.02.2011
Language:EN
[2011/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2464360
Date:20.06.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2011
[2012/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.02.2011
ClassificationInternational:A61K33/00, A61K33/24, A61K33/44, C01B31/00, C01B31/02, C01B31/08
[2012/25]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/25]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON METALLHYDROXIDEN, HYDROXYLORGANOMETALLEN UND WEISSEM KOHLENSTOFF FÜR DIE AYURVEDISCHE MEDIZIN[2012/25]
English:PROCESS FOR PREPARING METAL HYDROXIDES, HYDROXYL ORGANOMETALS AND WHITE CARBON SUITABLE FOR USE IN AYURVEDIC MEDICINE[2012/25]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'HYDROXYDES MÉTALLIQUES, D HYDROXYL ORGANOMÉTAUX ET DE CARBONE BLANC APPROPRIÉS POUR UNE UTILISATION EN MÉDECINE AYURVÉDIQUE[2012/25]
Entry into regional phase12.03.2012National basic fee paid 
12.03.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
12.03.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.03.2012Examination requested  [2012/25]
28.09.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.01.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
13.03.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.04.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination13.06.2017Appeal received No.  T2082/17
09.08.2017Statement of grounds filed
15.09.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.05.2016
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
13.03.2017Request for further processing filed
13.03.2017Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
21.03.2017Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
03.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
11.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
10.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
25.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
14.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
10.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
15.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201405   M06   Fee paid on   11.02.2015
31.08.201607   M06   Fee paid on   25.11.2016
Cited inInternational search[I]US2007003603  (KARANDIKAR BHALCHANDRA M [US] ET AL) [I] 1-7 * paragraphs [0002] - [0006] - [0009] - [0028] - [0114] - [0116] - [0155] - [0160] *;
 [A]  - HOU P X ET AL, "Purification of carbon nanotubes", CARBON, ELSEVIER, OXFORD, GB, vol. 46, no. 15, ISSN 0008-6223, (20081201), pages 2003 - 2025, (20080909), XP025589762 [A] 1-7 * page 2009, column R - page 2010, column L *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.carbon.2008.09.009
 [A]  - KO C-J ET AL, "Highly efficient microwave-assisted purification of multiwalled carbon nanotubes", MICROELECTRONIC ENGINEERING, ELSEVIER PUBLISHERS BV., AMSTERDAM, NL, (20040601), vol. 73-74, ISSN 0167-9317, pages 570 - 577, XP004564664 [A] 1-7 * abstract * * page 571, column L, paragraph L - page 572, column L * * page 576, column L, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-9317(04)00141-8
 [A]  - KHAYDAROV R A; KHAYDAROV R R; GAPUROVA O; ESTRIN Y; SCHEPER T, "Electrochemical method for the synthesis of silver nanoparticles", JOURNAL OF NANOPARTICLE RESEARCH, (20080921), vol. 11, no. 5, pages 1193 - 1200, XP002572664 [A] 1-7 * page 1193, column R, paragraph L - page 1194, column R, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11051-008-9513-x
 [A]  - PATEL K; KAPOOR S; DAVE D P; MUKHERJEE T, "Synthesis of nanosized silver colloids by microwave dielectric heating", J. CHEM. SCI, (200501), vol. 117, no. 1, pages 53 - 60, XP002572665 [A] 1-7 * page 53 - page 54 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02704361