Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2473930

EP2473930 - VISUALIZATION OF RELEVANCE FOR CONTENT-BASED IMAGE RETRIEVAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.08.2013
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
16.10.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[2013/39]
Former [2012/28]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / UNAY, Devrim
c/o High Tech Campus Building 44
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
02 / EKIN, Ahmet
c/o High Tech Campus Building 44
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
 [2012/28]
Representative(s)van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2012/28]Van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date10760018.130.08.2010
WO2010IB53872
Priority number, dateEP2009016949504.09.2009         Original published format: EP 09169495
[2012/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011027275
Date:10.03.2011
Language:EN
[2011/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2473930
Date:11.07.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2011
[2012/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.03.2011
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30, G06F19/00
[2012/28]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/28]
TitleGerman:RELEVANZVISUALISIERUNG FÜR INHALTSBASIERTEN BILDABRUF[2012/28]
English:VISUALIZATION OF RELEVANCE FOR CONTENT-BASED IMAGE RETRIEVAL[2012/28]
French:VISUALISATION DE PERTINENCE POUR LA RÉCUPÉRATION D'IMAGE BASÉE SUR LE CONTENU[2012/28]
Entry into regional phase04.04.2012National basic fee paid 
04.04.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
04.04.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.02.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.04.2012Examination requested  [2012/28]
11.02.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.08.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.09.2016Date of oral proceedings
12.10.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
12.10.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination12.12.2016Appeal received No.  T0504/17
02.02.2017Statement of grounds filed
14.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.02.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
02.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
01.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
31.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
31.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
31.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
31.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
02.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Cited inInternational search[X]  - SÖRGEL W ET AL., "Computer Aided Diagnosis of Bone Lesions in the Facial Skeleton", PROC. WORKSHOP: IMAGE PROC. IN MEDICINE '98, Aachen, Germany, (199803), pages 179 - 183, XP002613279 [X] 1-14 * page 180, paragraph 1 - page 182, paragraph 1 * * figure 1 *
 [X]  - XUE Z ET AL., "Investigating CBIR Techniques for Cervicographic Images", PROCEEDINGS OF AMERICAN MEDICAL INFORMATICS ASSOCIATION (AMIA) ANNUAL SYMPOSIUM,, (2007), pages 826 - 830, XP002613280 [X] 1-14 * page 828, column r, paragraph 5 - page 829, column l, paragraph 2 * * figure 2 *
by applicant   - R. DATTA ET AL., Image retrieval, ideas, influences and trends of the new age, ACM COMPUTING SURVEYS, (2008), vol. 40, pages 1 - 60
    - RUI ET AL., "Relevance Feedback: A Power Tool for Interactive Content-Based Image Retrieval", IEEE TRANSACTION ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEM FOR VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, (199809), vol. 6, doi:doi:10.1109/76.718510, pages 644 - 655, XP000779460

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/76.718510