Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2467024

EP2467024 - FERMENTED BAKERY DOUGH TOLERANT TO PROOFING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.08.2017
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lesaffre et Compagnie
41, rue Etienne Marcel
75001 Paris / FR
[2012/26]
Inventor(s)01 / BARTOLUCCI, Jean-Charles
43 avenue de Verdun
F-59350 St Andre Lez Lille / FR
 [2012/26]
Representative(s)Bandpay & Greuter
30, rue Notre-Dame des Victoires
75002 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2012/36]Cabinet Plasseraud
52, rue de la Victoire
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Former [2012/26]Touati, Catherine
Cabinet Plasseraud 52 Rue de la Victoire
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date10760039.702.09.2010
WO2010IB53957
Priority number, dateFR2009000398617.08.2009         Original published format: FR 0903986
[2012/26]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011027317
Date:10.03.2011
Language:FR
[2011/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2467024
Date:27.06.2012
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2011
[2012/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2467024
Date:13.08.2014
Language:FR
[2014/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.03.2011
ClassificationInternational:A21D8/04, A21D10/02, A21D10/00
[2012/26]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/26]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:GÄRUNGSTOLERANTER FERMENTIERTER BACKTEIG[2012/26]
English:FERMENTED BAKERY DOUGH TOLERANT TO PROOFING[2012/26]
French:PATE BOULANGERE FERMENTEE TOLERANTE A L'APPRET[2012/26]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase03.02.2012National basic fee paid 
03.02.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
03.02.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.02.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.02.2012Examination requested  [2012/26]
24.04.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.10.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.03.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.07.2014Fee for grant paid
01.07.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.07.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.04.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  13.05.2015  27.05.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Lallemand Inc.
1620 rue Préfontaine
Montréal, QC H1W 2N8 / CA
Opponent's representative
J A Kemp LLP
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2017/28]
Opponent(s)01  13.05.2015  27.05.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Lallemand Inc.
1620 rue Préfontaine
Montréal, QC H1W 2N8 / CA
Opponent's representative
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2015/26]
Opponent(s)01  13.05.2015   
Lallemand Inc.
1620 rue Préfontaine
Montréal, QC H1W 2N8 / CA
Opponent's representative
Roberts, Mark Peter
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
02.07.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
04.01.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
13.06.2017Date of oral proceedings
04.08.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
04.08.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition26.09.2017Appeal received No.  T2498/17
22.11.2017Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU02.09.2010
AL13.08.2014
CY13.08.2014
EE13.08.2014
FI13.08.2014
HR13.08.2014
LT13.08.2014
LV13.08.2014
MC13.08.2014
MK13.08.2014
MT13.08.2014
SE13.08.2014
SI13.08.2014
SK13.08.2014
SM13.08.2014
LU02.09.2014
BG13.11.2014
GR14.11.2014
IS13.12.2014
[2018/46]
Former [2018/30]HU02.09.2010
CY13.08.2014
EE13.08.2014
FI13.08.2014
HR13.08.2014
LT13.08.2014
LV13.08.2014
MC13.08.2014
MK13.08.2014
MT13.08.2014
SE13.08.2014
SI13.08.2014
SK13.08.2014
SM13.08.2014
LU02.09.2014
BG13.11.2014
GR14.11.2014
IS13.12.2014
Former [2016/33]HU02.09.2010
CY13.08.2014
EE13.08.2014
FI13.08.2014
HR13.08.2014
LT13.08.2014
LV13.08.2014
MC13.08.2014
MT13.08.2014
SE13.08.2014
SI13.08.2014
SK13.08.2014
SM13.08.2014
LU02.09.2014
BG13.11.2014
GR14.11.2014
IS13.12.2014
Former [2016/32]HU02.09.2010
CY13.08.2014
EE13.08.2014
FI13.08.2014
HR13.08.2014
LT13.08.2014
LV13.08.2014
MC13.08.2014
MT13.08.2014
SE13.08.2014
SI13.08.2014
SK13.08.2014
SM13.08.2014
BG13.11.2014
GR14.11.2014
IS13.12.2014
Former [2016/28]CY13.08.2014
EE13.08.2014
FI13.08.2014
HR13.08.2014
LT13.08.2014
LV13.08.2014
MC13.08.2014
MT13.08.2014
SE13.08.2014
SI13.08.2014
SK13.08.2014
SM13.08.2014
BG13.11.2014
GR14.11.2014
IS13.12.2014
Former [2016/22]CY13.08.2014
EE13.08.2014
FI13.08.2014
HR13.08.2014
LT13.08.2014
LV13.08.2014
MC13.08.2014
SE13.08.2014
SI13.08.2014
SK13.08.2014
SM13.08.2014
BG13.11.2014
GR14.11.2014
IS13.12.2014
Former [2015/50]CY13.08.2014
EE13.08.2014
FI13.08.2014
HR13.08.2014
LT13.08.2014
LV13.08.2014
MC13.08.2014
SE13.08.2014
SI13.08.2014
SK13.08.2014
BG13.11.2014
GR14.11.2014
IS13.12.2014
Former [2015/27]CY13.08.2014
EE13.08.2014
FI13.08.2014
HR13.08.2014
LT13.08.2014
LV13.08.2014
MC13.08.2014
SE13.08.2014
SK13.08.2014
BG13.11.2014
GR14.11.2014
IS13.12.2014
Former [2015/23]CY13.08.2014
EE13.08.2014
FI13.08.2014
HR13.08.2014
LT13.08.2014
LV13.08.2014
SE13.08.2014
SK13.08.2014
BG13.11.2014
GR14.11.2014
IS13.12.2014
Former [2015/12]CY13.08.2014
FI13.08.2014
HR13.08.2014
LT13.08.2014
LV13.08.2014
SE13.08.2014
BG13.11.2014
GR14.11.2014
IS13.12.2014
Former [2015/11]CY13.08.2014
FI13.08.2014
LT13.08.2014
SE13.08.2014
BG13.11.2014
GR14.11.2014
Former [2015/10]FI13.08.2014
LT13.08.2014
SE13.08.2014
BG13.11.2014
Former [2015/09]FI13.08.2014
LT13.08.2014
SE13.08.2014
Former [2015/08]LT13.08.2014
Cited inInternational search[Y]FR2777424  (LESAFFRE & CIE [FR]) [Y] 8-17 * examples 1,2 *;
 [YD]EP0078182  (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK [JP]) [YD] 8-17 * examples 1-3 *;
 [Y]GB2139473  (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK) [Y] 8-17 * example 2; claim -; tables 5,6 *;
 [Y]EP0903082  (EGGO COMPANY [US]) [Y] 8-17 * example -; claim - *;
 [Y]EP0636692  (LESAFFRE & CIE [FR]) [Y] 8-17 * examples 1-4; claims 1, 4, 17 *;
 [Y]US5639496  (NGUYEN TAN HUNG [FR], et al) [Y] 8-17 * column 1, line 40 - column 2, line 6; example 1 *;
 [YA]EP1808074  (CSM NEDERLAND BV [NL]) [Y] 8-17 * the whole document * [A] 1-7;
 [A]WO2009097333  (LALLEMAND INC [CA], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *
by applicantEP0078182