Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2416793

EP2416793 - A plant extract comprising statins and preparation techniques and uses thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.01.2017
Database last updated on 22.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.07.2017New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nanyang Polytechnic
180 Ang Mo Kio Avenue 8
Singapore 569830 / SG
For all designated states
Eu Yan Sang International Ltd
21 Tai Seng Drive
Singapore 535223 / SG
[2015/46]
Former [2012/07]For all designated states
Nanyang Polytechnic
180 Ang Mo Kio Avenue 8
Singapore 569830 / SG
For all designated states
Eu Yan Sang International LTD
269A South Bridge Road
Singapore 058818 / SG
Inventor(s)01 / LOH, Heng, Meng
106 Tai Keng Gardens
Singapore 535387 / SG
02 / LEE, Mun, Kin, Joel
43 Hindhede Walk
02-09, Southaven 1
Singapore 587973 / SG
03 / LEUNG, Pak, Ho, Henry
Blk 168 Ang Mo Kio Avenue 8, 07-01
Singapore 569830 / SG
04 / GURUSAMY, Subramaniam
Blk 836 Woodlands Street 83, 09-133
Singapore 730836 / SG
05 / FUNG, Wai, To
81 Meng Suan Road
Singapore 779301 / SG
 [2012/07]
Representative(s)Jones, Elizabeth Louise
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/07]Jones, Elizabeth Louise
Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square
GB-London EC4Y 8JD / GB
Application number, filing date10761948.808.04.2010
WO2010SG00142
Priority number, dateUS20090167543P08.04.2009         Original published format: US 167543 P
[2012/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010117342
Date:14.10.2010
Language:EN
[2010/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2416793
Date:15.02.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2010
[2012/07]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
International search report -
published on:
AU14.10.2010
Supplementary European search report -
dispatched on:
EP25.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61K36/00, A61K36/062, A61P3/06, A61K31/22, A61K36/48, A61K31/365, A61K36/899
[2012/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/07]
TitleGerman:PFLANZENEXTRAKT MIT STATINEN SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG[2012/07]
English:A plant extract comprising statins and preparation techniques and uses thereof[2012/07]
French:Extrait végétal comprenant des statines, ses techniques de préparation et ses utilisations[2012/07]
Entry into regional phase06.10.2011National basic fee paid 
06.10.2011Search fee paid 
06.10.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
06.10.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.02.2011Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
06.10.2011Examination requested  [2012/07]
01.11.2012Observations by third parties
01.04.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
06.06.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.01.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.06.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  31.01.2017
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
06.06.2014Request for further processing filed
06.06.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
23.06.2014Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
26.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
20.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
28.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
21.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[X]  - LEE CHUN-LIN ET AL, "A simple and rapid approach for removing citrinin while retaining monacolin K in red mold rice", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, vol. 55, no. 26, doi:10.1021/JF071640P, ISSN 0021-8561, (20071226), pages 11101 - 11108, (20071130), XP008125184 [X] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf071640p
 [X]  - YII-LIH LIN ET AL, "Biologically active components and nutraceuticals in the Monascus-fermented rice: a review", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20071122), vol. 77, no. 5, ISSN 1432-0614, pages 965 - 973, XP019560781 [X] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [X]  - HONG M Y ET AL, "Anticancer effects of Chinese red yeast rice versus monacolin K alone on colon cancer cells", JOURNAL OF NUTRITIONAL BIOCHEMISTRY, BUTTERWORTH PUBLISHERS, STONEHAM, GB, vol. 19, no. 7, doi:10.1016/J.JNUTBIO.2007.05.012, ISSN 0955-2863, (20080701), pages 448 - 458, (20080609), XP022710090 [X] 1-15 * page 449, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 450, column 1, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jnutbio.2007.05.012
 [T]  - WAI TO FUNG ET AL, "Assessment of Extracts from Red Yeast Rice for Herb-Drug Interaction by in-vitro and in-vivo assays", SCIENTIFIC REPORTS, (20120302), vol. 2, doi:10.1038/srep00298, XP055071670 [T] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/srep00298
International search[X]US4323648  (TANZAWA KAZUHIKO, et al);
 [X]US5202029  (HAYTKO PETER N [US], et al);
 [X]US6387258  (KERI VILMOS [HU], et al);
 [X]WO2005104864  (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al);
 [A]US2004018210  (HAJJAJ HASSAN [FR], et al)
 [X]  - LEE, C ET AL., "A Simple and Rapid Approach for Removing Citrinin while Retaining Monacolin K in Red Mold Rice", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, (2007), vol. 55, no. 26, pages 11101 - 11108, XP008125184

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf071640p
 [A]  - WANG, T ET AL., "Monascus Rice Products", ADVANCES IN FOOD AND NUTRITION RESEARCH, (2007), vol. 53, pages 123 - 159, XP009171268

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1043-4526(07)53004-4