Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2477597

EP2477597 - NATURAL HAIR DYES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  31.08.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.05.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.03.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.11.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
University Of Leeds
Leeds
West Yorkshire LS2 9JT / GB
[2012/30]
Inventor(s)01 / BLACKBURN, Richard Simon
Centre for Technical Textiles
University of Leeds
Leeds Yorkshire LS2 9JT / GB
02 / ROSE, Paul Martin
Industrial Research Limited
69 Gracefield Road, PO Box 31310
Lower Hutt 5040 / NZ
03 / RAYNER, Christopher Mark
School of Chemistry
University of Leeds
Leeds Yorkshire LS2 9JT / GB
 [2012/30]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
[2018/40]
Former [2013/32]Chalk, Anthony John , et al
Harrison Goddard Foote LLP
Saviour House
9 St Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
Former [2012/30]Harrison Goddard Foote
Saviour House
9 St Saviourgate
York
YO1 8NQ / GB
Application number, filing date10763405.714.05.2010
[2018/40]
WO2010GB50790
Priority number, dateGB2009000839715.05.2009         Original published format: GB 0908397
[2012/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2010131049
Date:18.11.2010
Language:EN
[2010/46]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2477597
Date:25.07.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.2010
[2012/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2477597
Date:03.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.06.2012
ClassificationInternational:A61K8/49, A61K8/97, A61Q5/06, A61K36/185, A61K36/73, A61K36/87, A61K36/45, A61K8/00, A61K36/00
[2012/30]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/30]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:NATÜRLICHE HAARFÄRBEMITTEL[2012/30]
English:NATURAL HAIR DYES[2012/30]
French:TEINTURES POUR CHEVEUX NATURELLES[2012/30]
Entry into regional phase14.12.2011National basic fee paid 
14.12.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
14.12.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.12.2011Examination requested  [2012/30]
09.01.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.10.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.03.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
10.06.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.06.2014Observations by third parties
02.10.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.02.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.01.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.10.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.05.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.09.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.11.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.03.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
03.05.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.08.2018Fee for grant paid
24.08.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.08.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.10.2013
Opposition(s)04.07.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/37]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
10.06.2014Request for further processing filed
10.06.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
24.06.2014Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
17.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
11.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
21.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
05.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
03.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
08.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL03.10.2018
AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
DK03.10.2018
EE03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
HR03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
MC03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
RO03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
SI03.10.2018
SK03.10.2018
SM03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
PT03.02.2019
[2020/07]
Former [2019/50]AL03.10.2018
AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
DK03.10.2018
EE03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
HR03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
RO03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
SI03.10.2018
SK03.10.2018
SM03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
PT03.02.2019
Former [2019/40]AL03.10.2018
AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
DK03.10.2018
EE03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
HR03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
RO03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
SK03.10.2018
SM03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
PT03.02.2019
Former [2019/37]AL03.10.2018
AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
DK03.10.2018
EE03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
HR03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
RO03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
SM03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
PT03.02.2019
Former [2019/34]AL03.10.2018
AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
DK03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
HR03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
PT03.02.2019
Former [2019/26]AL03.10.2018
AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
HR03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
PT03.02.2019
Former [2019/24]AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
HR03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
Former [2019/23]AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
HR03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
Former [2019/22]CZ03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
Former [2019/21]FI03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
NO03.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
Former [2019/20]LT03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
NO03.01.2019
Former [2019/17]NL03.10.2018
Cited inInternational search[X]JP2001172143  (FANCL CORP; KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK) [X] 1-52 * paragraphs [0014] , [0016] , [0017]; claim - *;
 [X]WO2005107780  (INST TECNOLOGICO Y DE ESTUDIOS [MX]) [X] 1-52 * claims 1,2,16,19 *;
 [X]US2007251024  (GREAVES ERJEANA [US] ET AL GREAVES ERJENA [US] ET AL) [X] 1-52 * claim - *;
 [X]WO2007007936  (KWANGDUK INDUSTRY CO LTD [KR]; LEE SANG-HO [KR]) [X] 1-52 * example -; claim - *;
 [X]US6241785  (DARMENTON PATRICK [FR] ET AL) [X] 1-52 * examples 3-5 *;
 [X]WO9911223  (UNILEVER PLC [GB]; UNILEVER NV [NL]) [X] 1-52 * examples 1-2 *;
 [X]WO2004082646  (QUEST INT SERV BV [NL]; WATKINS STEPHEN [GB]; EYRE HEATHER [GB]) [X] 1-52 * example 1 *;
 [X]DE102007041493  (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE]) [X] 1-52 * claims 1-3 *;
 [X]WO2006061847  (COUNCIL SCIENT IND RES [IN]; PUSHPANGADAN PALPU [IN]; PAL MAHESH [IN];) [X] 1-52 * page 5, lines 15-25 *;
 [XD]PL192692B  (HAN STANISLAW) [XD] 1-52 * example -; claim - *;
 [X]US2007166256  (SHIROYAMA KENICHIRO [JP] ET AL) [X] 1-52 * examples 3-7 *;
 [XP]WO2010006957  (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE]; REICHERT ANJA [DE]; KOLONKO CLAUDIA [DE]; SU) [XP] 1-52 * example - *
ExaminationJPS62153211
    - "Refreshing treatment for blond hair with camomile", GNPD, MINTEL, (20090201), Database accession no. 1053475
    - "Conditioner", GNPD, MINTEL, (20080401), Database accession no. 904921
other   - "MATBOOKH-E-ULLAIQUE", TKDL, (1887), XP003034167
    - MOHAMMAD AZAM KHAN, "MATBOOKH-E-ULLAIQUE", MUHEET-E-AZAM, KANPUR, (1887), vol. III, page 222
    - "JOSHANDA-E-ULLAIQUE", TKDL, (1926), Database accession no. JA6/146A, XP003034168
    - MOHAMMAD NAJUL, GHANI KHAN, "JOSHANDA-E-ULLAIQUE", KHAZAAIN-AL-ADVIA, LAHORE, (1926), vol. III, page 141
    - "KHIZAAB BARA-E-SHAR", TKDL, (1967), Database accession no. AA20/226G, XP003034169
    - ABU BAKR MOHAMMAD, "KHIZAAB BARA-E-SHAR", ZAKARIYYA AL-RAZI, HYDERABAD, (1967), vol. XX, page 191
    - "KHIZAAB-E-BARGE TOOT", TKDL, (1874), Database accession no. WA1/254F, XP003034170
    - ZIYA AL-DIN ABDULLAH IBN AL-BAITAR, "KHIZAAB-E- BARGE TOOT", AL-JAAM E-MUFRADAAT-AL-ADVIA-WAL-AGHZIA, CAIRO, EGYPT, (1874), vol. I, page 142
    - ALI IBN-E-ABBAAS MAJOOSI, "MATBOOKH BARAAE TASWEED-E-SHAR", TKDL, (2005), Database accession no. AH3/711B, XP003034171
    - ALI IBN-E-ABBAAS MAJOOSI, "MATBOOKH BARAAE TASWEED-E-SHAR", KAAMIL-AL-SENA AH, NEW-DELHI-58, (2005), page 117, II
    - "NUSKHA-E-KHIZAAB", TKDL, (1937), Database accession no. MA2/252, XP003034172
    - AMINUDDAULAH ABUL FARJ IBN AL-QUFF MASEEHI, "NUSKHA-E-KHIZAAB", KITAAB-AL-UMDAH-FIL-JERAAHAT, HYDERABAD, (1937), page 65, II
    - "YASTAYADILEPAH", TKDL, (199908), Database accession no. RS/840, XP003034173
    - "YASTAYADILEPAH", BHARATA BHAISAJYA RATNAKARA (2ND. ED.), NEW DELHI, JAIN PUBLISHERS, (199908), page 309
    - "RASAYANARISTAH", TKDL, (1999), Database accession no. RS/992, XP003034174
    - SODHALA, "RASAYANARISTAH", GADANIGRAHAH ED (3TH ED.), VARANASI, (1999), page 392