Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2470994

EP2470994 - IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO DATABASE REPLICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.08.2014
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 17.08.2016  [2016/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE CITY UNIVERSITY
Northampton Square
London EC1V 0HB / GB
[2012/27]
Inventor(s)01 / POPOV, Peter Tonev
Centre for Software Reliability
City University
London
Northampton Square
London EC1V 0HB / GB
02 / STANKOVIC, Vladimir
Centre for Software Reliability
City University
London
Northampton Square
LondonEC1V 0HB / GB
 [2012/27]
Representative(s)Lawrence, Richard Anthony , et al
Keltie LLP
No.1 London Bridge
London SE1 9BA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/27]Lawrence, Richard Anthony , et al
Keltie LLP Fleet Place House 2 Fleet Place
London EC4M 7ET / GB
Application number, filing date10763407.313.08.2010
WO2010GB51347
Priority number, dateGB2009001481525.08.2009         Original published format: GB 0914815
[2012/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2011023979
Date:03.03.2011
Language:EN
[2011/09]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2470994
Date:04.07.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2011
[2012/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2470994
Date:09.10.2013
Language:EN
[2013/41]
Search report(s)International search reportEP14.04.2011
ClassificationInternational:G06F11/20
[2012/27]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/27]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERBESSERUNGEN IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT DATENBANKREPLIKATIONEN[2012/27]
English:IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO DATABASE REPLICATION[2012/27]
French:AMÉLIORATIONS APPORTÉES À LA RÉPLICATION D'UNE BASE DE DONNÉES[2012/27]
Entry into regional phase20.03.2012National basic fee paid 
20.03.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
20.03.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.03.2012Examination requested  [2012/27]
30.10.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.02.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.06.2013Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
24.06.2013Fee for grant paid
24.06.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.07.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.02.2013
Opposition(s)10.07.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
29.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU13.08.2010
AT09.10.2013
BE09.10.2013
BG09.10.2013
CY09.10.2013
CZ09.10.2013
DK09.10.2013
EE09.10.2013
ES09.10.2013
FI09.10.2013
HR09.10.2013
IT09.10.2013
LT09.10.2013
LV09.10.2013
MC09.10.2013
MT09.10.2013
NL09.10.2013
PL09.10.2013
RO09.10.2013
SE09.10.2013
SI09.10.2013
SK09.10.2013
SM09.10.2013
TR09.10.2013
NO09.01.2014
GR10.01.2014
IS09.02.2014
PT10.02.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU13.08.2010
AT09.10.2013
BE09.10.2013
BG09.10.2013
CY09.10.2013
CZ09.10.2013
DK09.10.2013
EE09.10.2013
ES09.10.2013
FI09.10.2013
HR09.10.2013
IT09.10.2013
LT09.10.2013
LV09.10.2013
MC09.10.2013
MT09.10.2013
NL09.10.2013
PL09.10.2013
RO09.10.2013
SE09.10.2013
SI09.10.2013
SK09.10.2013
SM09.10.2013
NO09.01.2014
GR10.01.2014
IS09.02.2014
PT10.02.2014
Former [2016/28]AT09.10.2013
BE09.10.2013
BG09.10.2013
CY09.10.2013
CZ09.10.2013
DK09.10.2013
EE09.10.2013
ES09.10.2013
FI09.10.2013
HR09.10.2013
IT09.10.2013
LT09.10.2013
LV09.10.2013
MC09.10.2013
MT09.10.2013
NL09.10.2013
PL09.10.2013
RO09.10.2013
SE09.10.2013
SI09.10.2013
SK09.10.2013
SM09.10.2013
NO09.01.2014
GR10.01.2014
IS09.02.2014
PT10.02.2014
Former [2016/22]AT09.10.2013
BE09.10.2013
CY09.10.2013
CZ09.10.2013
DK09.10.2013
EE09.10.2013
ES09.10.2013
FI09.10.2013
HR09.10.2013
IT09.10.2013
LT09.10.2013
LV09.10.2013
MC09.10.2013
NL09.10.2013
PL09.10.2013
RO09.10.2013
SE09.10.2013
SI09.10.2013
SK09.10.2013
SM09.10.2013
NO09.01.2014
IS09.02.2014
PT10.02.2014
Former [2015/18]AT09.10.2013
BE09.10.2013
CY09.10.2013
CZ09.10.2013
DK09.10.2013
EE09.10.2013
ES09.10.2013
FI09.10.2013
HR09.10.2013
IT09.10.2013
LT09.10.2013
LV09.10.2013
MC09.10.2013
NL09.10.2013
PL09.10.2013
RO09.10.2013
SE09.10.2013
SI09.10.2013
SK09.10.2013
NO09.01.2014
IS09.02.2014
PT10.02.2014
Former [2014/41]AT09.10.2013
BE09.10.2013
CY09.10.2013
CZ09.10.2013
DK09.10.2013
EE09.10.2013
ES09.10.2013
FI09.10.2013
HR09.10.2013
IT09.10.2013
LT09.10.2013
LV09.10.2013
NL09.10.2013
PL09.10.2013
RO09.10.2013
SE09.10.2013
SI09.10.2013
SK09.10.2013
NO09.01.2014
IS09.02.2014
PT10.02.2014
Former [2014/38]AT09.10.2013
BE09.10.2013
CY09.10.2013
CZ09.10.2013
EE09.10.2013
ES09.10.2013
FI09.10.2013
HR09.10.2013
IT09.10.2013
LT09.10.2013
LV09.10.2013
NL09.10.2013
PL09.10.2013
RO09.10.2013
SE09.10.2013
SI09.10.2013
SK09.10.2013
NO09.01.2014
IS09.02.2014
PT10.02.2014
Former [2014/37]AT09.10.2013
BE09.10.2013
CY09.10.2013
CZ09.10.2013
EE09.10.2013
ES09.10.2013
FI09.10.2013
HR09.10.2013
LT09.10.2013
LV09.10.2013
NL09.10.2013
PL09.10.2013
RO09.10.2013
SE09.10.2013
SI09.10.2013
SK09.10.2013
NO09.01.2014
IS09.02.2014
PT10.02.2014
Former [2014/36]AT09.10.2013
BE09.10.2013
CY09.10.2013
EE09.10.2013
ES09.10.2013
FI09.10.2013
HR09.10.2013
LT09.10.2013
LV09.10.2013
NL09.10.2013
PL09.10.2013
SE09.10.2013
SI09.10.2013
NO09.01.2014
IS09.02.2014
PT10.02.2014
Former [2014/28]AT09.10.2013
BE09.10.2013
CY09.10.2013
ES09.10.2013
FI09.10.2013
HR09.10.2013
LT09.10.2013
LV09.10.2013
NL09.10.2013
PL09.10.2013
SE09.10.2013
SI09.10.2013
NO09.01.2014
IS09.02.2014
PT10.02.2014
Former [2014/26]AT09.10.2013
BE09.10.2013
CY09.10.2013
ES09.10.2013
FI09.10.2013
HR09.10.2013
LT09.10.2013
LV09.10.2013
NL09.10.2013
PL09.10.2013
SE09.10.2013
SI09.10.2013
NO09.01.2014
IS09.02.2014
Former [2014/25]AT09.10.2013
BE09.10.2013
ES09.10.2013
FI09.10.2013
HR09.10.2013
LT09.10.2013
LV09.10.2013
NL09.10.2013
PL09.10.2013
SE09.10.2013
SI09.10.2013
NO09.01.2014
IS09.02.2014
Former [2014/24]AT09.10.2013
BE09.10.2013
ES09.10.2013
FI09.10.2013
HR09.10.2013
LT09.10.2013
NL09.10.2013
PL09.10.2013
SE09.10.2013
SI09.10.2013
NO09.01.2014
IS09.02.2014
Former [2014/23]BE09.10.2013
FI09.10.2013
HR09.10.2013
LT09.10.2013
NL09.10.2013
SE09.10.2013
SI09.10.2013
NO09.01.2014
IS09.02.2014
Former [2014/22]FI09.10.2013
LT09.10.2013
NL09.10.2013
SE09.10.2013
SI09.10.2013
NO09.01.2014
Former [2014/20]LT09.10.2013
SI09.10.2013
NO09.01.2014
Former [2014/12]SI09.10.2013
Cited inInternational search[A]EP1349085  (ITI INC [US]) [A] 1-29 * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0023] , [0113] , [0114] , [0117] , [0121] - [0139] - [0187] , [0188] - [0199] - [0205] - [0254] * * figures 2a,2b,5a,5b,8 *
 [A]  - ELNIKETY S ET AL, "Database Replication Using Generalized Snapshot Isolation", RELIABLE DISTRIBUTED SYSTEMS, 2005. SRDS 2005. 24TH IEEE SYMPOSIUM ON ORLANDO, FL, USA 26-28 OCT. 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20051026), ISBN 978-0-7695-2463-4, pages 73 - 84, XP010854120 [A] 1-29 * abstract * * paragraphs [001.] , [01.1] , [01.2] , [01.3] , [02.2] , [0003] , [06.1] , [06.2] , [07.2] , [07.3] *
by applicantEP1349085
    - ADYA, A.; B. LISKOV ET AL., "Generalized Snapshot Isolation Levels", IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DATA ENGINEERING (ICDE, (2000),
    - AGRAWAL, D.; G. ALONSO ET AL., "Exploiting Atomic Broadcast in Replicated Databases", PROCEEDINGS OF EUROPAR (EUROPAR'97, (1997),
    - ANSI X3.135-1992, ANSI,
    - "A Critique of ANSI SQL Isolation Levels", BERENSON, H.; P. BERNSTEIN ET AL., SIGMOD International Conference on Management of Data, San Jose, ACM PRESS,
    - "Concurrency Control and Recovery in Database Systems", BERNSTEIN, A.; V. HADZILACOS ET AL., Reading, Mass., ADDISON-WESLEY,
    - "Database Replication Using Generalized Snapshot Isolation", ELNIKETY, S.; W. ZWAENEPOEL ET AL., Proceedings of the 24th IEEE Symposium on Reliable Distributed Systems (SRDS'05, IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY, pages 73 - 84,
    - FEKETE, A.; E. O'NEIL ET AL., "A read-only transaction anomaly under snapshot isolation", ACM SIGMOD RECORD, (2004), vol. 33, no. 3, pages 12 - 14,
    - GASHI, I.; P. POPOV, "Rephrasing Rules for Off-the-Shelf SQL Database Servers", SIXTH EUROPEAN DEPENDABLE COMPUTING CONFERENCE, 2006. EDCC '06., (2006),
    - GASHI, I.; P. POPOV ET AL., "Fault tolerance via diversity for off-the-shelf products: a study with SQL database server", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON DEPENDABLE AND SECURE COMPUTING, (2007),
    - "The Transaction Concept: Virtues and Limitations", GRAY, J., 7th International Conference on Very Large Data Bases (VLDB, IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY,
    - GRAY, J.; R. LORIE ET AL., "Granularity of locks and degrees of consistency in a shared data base", IFIP WORKING CONFERENCE ON MODELLING OF DATA BASE MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS, (1975),
    - GRAY, J.; A. REUTER, Transaction processing : concepts and techniques, MORGAN KAUFMANN,
    - HADZILACOS, V.; S. TOUEG, Fault-tolerant broadcast and related problems, ADDISON-WESLEY, pages 97 - 145,
    - JIMENEZ-PERIS, R.; M. PATINO-MARTINEZ, "D5: Transaction Support", ADAPT MIDDLEWARE TECHNOLOGIES FOR ADAPTIVE AND COMPOSABLE DISTRIBUTED COMPONENTS, (2003), page 20,
    - KEMME, B., "Database Replication fo Clusters of Workstations", SWISS FEDERAL INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY, (2000), page 145,
    - KEMME, B.; G. ALONSO, "Don't be lazy, be consistent: Postgres-R, a new way to implement Database Replication", INT. CONF. ON VERY LARGE DATABASES, (2000),
    - "Postgres-R(SI): Combining Replica Control with Concurrency Control based on Snapshot Isolation", KEMME, B.; S. WU, International Conference on Data Engineering, IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY,
    - LAMPORT, L.; R. SHOSTAK ET AL., "The Byzantine Generals Problem", ACM TRANSACTIONS ON PROGRAMMING LANGUAGES AND SYSTEMS (TOPLAS, (1982), vol. 4, no. 3, pages 382 - 401,
    - "Middleware Based Data Replication Providing Snapshot Isolation", LIN, Y.; B. KEMME ET AL., ACM SIGMOD International Conference on Management of Data, ACM PRESS,
    - MULLENDER, S., Distributed Svstems, ACM PRESS/ADDISON-WESLEY PUBLISHING CO.,
    - PATINO-MARTINEZ, M.; R. JIMENEZ-PERIS ET AL., "MIDDLE-R: Consistent database replication at the middleware level", ACM TRANSACTIONS ON COMPUTER SYSTEMS (TOCS), (2005), vol. 23, no. 4, pages 375 - 423,
    - PREGUIÇA, N.; R. RODRIGUES ET AL., "Byzantium: Byzantine-Fault-Tolerant Database Replication Providing Snapshot Isolation", FOURTH WORKSHOP ON HOT TOPICS IN SYSTEM DEPENDABILITY, (2008),
    - "Nonblocking commit protocols", SKEEN, D., Proceedings of ACM SIGMOD International conference on management of data, ACM PRESS,
    - "Detecting and Tolerating Byzantine Faults in Database Systems", VANDIVER, B., Programming Methodology Group, MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY, page 176,
    - WEISMANN, M.; F. PEDONE ET AL., "Database Replication Techniques: a Three Parameter Classification", 19TH IEEE SYMPOSIUM ON RELIABLE DISTRIBUTED SYSTEMS (SRDS'00, (2000),