Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2470994 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2470994



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 389
13.08.2014 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
11.10.2013 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
12.09.2013 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
13.08.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.08.2013 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
13.08.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.07.2013 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
22.07.2013 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
22.07.2013 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
22.07.2013 Text intended for grant Search / examination 60
05.07.2013 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
24.06.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
24.06.2013 Description Search / examination 1
24.06.2013 Description Search / examination 1
24.06.2013 Description Search / examination 1
24.06.2013 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
24.06.2013 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
24.06.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
24.06.2013 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 3
25.02.2013 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
25.02.2013 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
25.02.2013 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
25.02.2013 Text intended for grant Search / examination 60
30.10.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
30.10.2012 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
30.10.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
30.10.2012 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 41
30.10.2012 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 41
30.10.2012 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
30.10.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
06.06.2012 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
20.04.2012 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
13.03.2012 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 9
20.02.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
20.02.2012 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
20.02.2012 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
06.01.2012 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
14.04.2011 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
14.04.2011 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 1
23.03.2011 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 49
03.03.2011 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 46
21.02.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
21.02.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
21.02.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 5