Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2470994


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
22.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.07.2018  [2018/30]
15.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.08.2016  [2016/33]
08.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.08.2016  [2016/32]
10.06.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.07.2016  [2016/28]
29.04.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.06.2016  [2016/22]
27.03.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.04.2015  [2015/18]
05.09.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.10.2014  [2014/41]
15.08.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.09.2014  [2014/38]
15.08.2014 No opposition filed within time limit published on  17.09.2014  [2014/38]
08.08.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.09.2014  [2014/37]
01.08.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.09.2014  [2014/36]
06.06.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.07.2014  [2014/28]
23.05.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.06.2014  [2014/26]
16.05.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.06.2014  [2014/25]
09.05.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.06.2014  [2014/24]
02.05.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.06.2014  [2014/23]
25.04.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.05.2014  [2014/22]
11.04.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.05.2014  [2014/20]
14.02.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.03.2014  [2014/12]
06.09.2013 (Expected) grant published on  09.10.2013  [2013/41]
02.09.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.07.2013 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
12.07.2013 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
12.07.2013 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
25.02.2013 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
05.11.2012 Amendment by applicant
26.10.2012 Change - extension states published on  28.11.2012  [2012/48]
05.09.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.06.2012 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  04.07.2012  [2012/27]
01.06.2012 Request for examination filed published on  04.07.2012  [2012/27]
03.04.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
23.03.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
16.03.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
15.04.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
15.03.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
04.03.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
21.10.2010 PCT data prior to European publication