Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2480484

EP2480484 - GANTRY LIFT TRUCK FOR USE IN CONTAINER TERMINALS AND FOR GENERAL TRANSPORT PURPOSES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.02.2018
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.05.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
27.05.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pfenning Elektroanlagen GmbH
Molkereistrasse 6a
97199 Ochsenfurt / DE
[2012/31]
Inventor(s)01 / PFENNING, Wilhelm
Am Eiselberg 2
97340 Marktbreit / DE
 [2012/31]
Representative(s)Lelgemann, Karl-Heinz
Patentanwälte Spalthoff und Lelgemann
Postfach 34 02 20
45074 Essen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/31]Lelgemann, Karl-Heinz
Haumannplatz 4
45130 Essen / DE
Application number, filing date10763602.922.09.2010
WO2010EP05782
Priority number, dateDE2009104267723.09.2009         Original published format: DE102009042677
[2012/31]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011035890
Date:31.03.2011
Language:DE
[2011/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2480484
Date:01.08.2012
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2011
[2012/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2480484
Date:25.03.2015
Language:DE
[2015/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP31.03.2011
ClassificationInternational:B66C19/00, B66C13/22
[2012/31]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/31]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:PORTALHUBWAGEN ZUM EINSATZ IN CONTAINERTERMINALS UND FÜR ALLGEMEINE TRANSPORTZWECKE[2012/31]
English:GANTRY LIFT TRUCK FOR USE IN CONTAINER TERMINALS AND FOR GENERAL TRANSPORT PURPOSES[2012/31]
French:CHARIOT DE LEVAGE DE PORTIQUE À UTILISER DANS DES TERMINAUX À CONTENEURS ET À DES FINS GÉNÉRALES DE TRANSPORT[2012/31]
Entry into regional phase14.03.2012National basic fee paid 
14.03.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
14.03.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.03.2012Examination requested  [2012/31]
31.10.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.10.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.01.2015Fee for grant paid
30.01.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.01.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.10.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.12.2015  07.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Demag Cranes & Components GmbH
Forststrasse 16
40597 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Moser Götze & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Paul-Klinger-Strasse 9
45127 Essen / DE
 [2019/01]
Former [2016/06]
Opponent(s)01  23.12.2015  07.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Terex MHPS GmbH
Forststrasse 16
40597 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Moser Götze & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Paul-Klinger-Strasse 9
45127 Essen / DE
29.01.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
31.05.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
08.11.2017Date of oral proceedings
27.02.2018Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
27.02.2018Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition24.04.2018Appeal received No.  T1085/18
21.06.2018Statement of grounds filed
12.12.2019Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
19.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
23.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU22.09.2010
AL25.03.2015
BG25.03.2015
CY25.03.2015
CZ25.03.2015
DK25.03.2015
EE25.03.2015
HR25.03.2015
LT25.03.2015
LV25.03.2015
MC25.03.2015
MK25.03.2015
MT25.03.2015
RO25.03.2015
SE25.03.2015
SI25.03.2015
SK25.03.2015
SM25.03.2015
TR25.03.2015
NO25.06.2015
GR26.06.2015
IS25.07.2015
PT27.07.2015
AT22.09.2015
GB22.09.2015
LU22.09.2015
CH30.09.2015
FR30.09.2015
LI30.09.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/30]HU22.09.2010
BG25.03.2015
CY25.03.2015
CZ25.03.2015
DK25.03.2015
EE25.03.2015
HR25.03.2015
LT25.03.2015
LV25.03.2015
MC25.03.2015
MK25.03.2015
MT25.03.2015
RO25.03.2015
SE25.03.2015
SI25.03.2015
SK25.03.2015
SM25.03.2015
TR25.03.2015
NO25.06.2015
GR26.06.2015
IS25.07.2015
PT27.07.2015
AT22.09.2015
GB22.09.2015
LU22.09.2015
CH30.09.2015
FR30.09.2015
LI30.09.2015
Former [2017/38]HU22.09.2010
BG25.03.2015
CY25.03.2015
CZ25.03.2015
DK25.03.2015
EE25.03.2015
HR25.03.2015
LT25.03.2015
LV25.03.2015
MC25.03.2015
MT25.03.2015
RO25.03.2015
SE25.03.2015
SI25.03.2015
SK25.03.2015
SM25.03.2015
TR25.03.2015
NO25.06.2015
GR26.06.2015
IS25.07.2015
PT27.07.2015
AT22.09.2015
GB22.09.2015
LU22.09.2015
CH30.09.2015
FR30.09.2015
LI30.09.2015
Former [2017/17]CZ25.03.2015
DK25.03.2015
EE25.03.2015
HR25.03.2015
LT25.03.2015
LV25.03.2015
MC25.03.2015
MT25.03.2015
RO25.03.2015
SE25.03.2015
SI25.03.2015
SK25.03.2015
GR26.06.2015
IS25.07.2015
PT27.07.2015
AT22.09.2015
GB22.09.2015
LU22.09.2015
CH30.09.2015
FR30.09.2015
LI30.09.2015
Former [2016/36]CZ25.03.2015
DK25.03.2015
EE25.03.2015
HR25.03.2015
LT25.03.2015
LV25.03.2015
MC25.03.2015
RO25.03.2015
SE25.03.2015
SI25.03.2015
SK25.03.2015
GR26.06.2015
IS25.07.2015
PT27.07.2015
GB22.09.2015
LU22.09.2015
CH30.09.2015
FR30.09.2015
LI30.09.2015
Former [2016/34]CZ25.03.2015
DK25.03.2015
EE25.03.2015
HR25.03.2015
LT25.03.2015
LV25.03.2015
MC25.03.2015
RO25.03.2015
SE25.03.2015
SI25.03.2015
SK25.03.2015
GR26.06.2015
IS25.07.2015
PT27.07.2015
GB22.09.2015
LU22.09.2015
CH30.09.2015
LI30.09.2015
Former [2016/24]CZ25.03.2015
DK25.03.2015
EE25.03.2015
HR25.03.2015
LT25.03.2015
LV25.03.2015
MC25.03.2015
RO25.03.2015
SE25.03.2015
SI25.03.2015
SK25.03.2015
GR26.06.2015
IS25.07.2015
PT27.07.2015
LU22.09.2015
Former [2016/23]CZ25.03.2015
DK25.03.2015
EE25.03.2015
HR25.03.2015
LT25.03.2015
LV25.03.2015
MC25.03.2015
RO25.03.2015
SE25.03.2015
SK25.03.2015
GR26.06.2015
IS25.07.2015
PT27.07.2015
LU22.09.2015
Former [2016/21]CZ25.03.2015
DK25.03.2015
EE25.03.2015
HR25.03.2015
LT25.03.2015
LV25.03.2015
RO25.03.2015
SE25.03.2015
SK25.03.2015
GR26.06.2015
IS25.07.2015
PT27.07.2015
LU22.09.2015
Former [2016/07]CZ25.03.2015
DK25.03.2015
EE25.03.2015
HR25.03.2015
LT25.03.2015
LV25.03.2015
RO25.03.2015
SE25.03.2015
SK25.03.2015
GR26.06.2015
IS25.07.2015
PT27.07.2015
Former [2015/50]CZ25.03.2015
EE25.03.2015
HR25.03.2015
LT25.03.2015
LV25.03.2015
RO25.03.2015
SE25.03.2015
SK25.03.2015
GR26.06.2015
IS25.07.2015
PT27.07.2015
Former [2015/49]CZ25.03.2015
EE25.03.2015
HR25.03.2015
LT25.03.2015
LV25.03.2015
RO25.03.2015
SE25.03.2015
SK25.03.2015
GR26.06.2015
PT27.07.2015
Former [2015/39]HR25.03.2015
LT25.03.2015
LV25.03.2015
SE25.03.2015
GR26.06.2015
Former [2015/37]HR25.03.2015
LT25.03.2015
SE25.03.2015
GR26.06.2015
Former [2015/36]HR25.03.2015
LT25.03.2015
SE25.03.2015
Former [2015/35]LT25.03.2015
Cited inInternational search[A]DE202004018066U  (NOELL MOBILE SYSTEMS & CRANES [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0023] * * figure - *;
 [A]DE202006020028U  (NOELL MOBILE SYSTEMS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] * * claims 1-4 * * figure - *;
 [A]DE202008004985U  (LIEBHERR WERK BIBERACH [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0033] *