Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2473832

EP2473832 - IMPROVEMENTS TO HIGH FORCE DIE SHEAR TOOLING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.09.2016
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Xyztec BV
J.F. Kennedylaan 14-B
5981 XC Panningen / NL
[2015/43]
Former [2012/28]For all designated states
Xyztec BV
J.F. Kennedylaan 14-B
5981 XC Panningen / NL
For all designated states
Sykes, Robert J.
Claire House The Green
Tendring, Essex CO16 0BT / GB
For all designated states
Dupont, Aubert D.V.
Nachtegaalstraat 8
5988 NG Helden / NL
Inventor(s)01 / SYKES, Robert J.
Claire House The Green
Tendring Essex CO16 0BT / GB
02 / DUPONT, Aubert D.V.
Nachtegaalstraat 8
NL-5988 NG Helden / NL
 [2012/28]
Representative(s)Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau B.V.
P.O. Box 645
5600 AP Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2015/45]Gray, James , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London SE1 2AU / GB
Former [2012/28]Chettle, Adrian John , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London
SE1 2AU / GB
Application number, filing date10763885.031.08.2010
[2015/45]
WO2010NL50545
Priority number, dateGB2009001529403.09.2009         Original published format: GB 0915294
GB2010000075818.01.2010         Original published format: GB 201000758
GB2010000526830.03.2010         Original published format: GB 201005268
[2012/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011028107
Date:10.03.2011
Language:EN
[2011/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2473832
Date:11.07.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2011
[2012/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2473832
Date:04.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.03.2011
ClassificationInternational:G01N3/24, G01N19/04, H01L23/00
[2015/25]
Former International [2012/28]G01N3/24, G01N19/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/28]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERBESSERTES SCHERTESTWERKZEUG MIT HOHER KRAFTANWENDUNG FÜR CHIPS[2012/28]
English:IMPROVEMENTS TO HIGH FORCE DIE SHEAR TOOLING[2012/28]
French:AMÉLIORATIONS APPORTÉES À UN OUTIL DE CISAILLEMENT DE PUCE À FORCE ÉLEVÉE[2012/28]
Entry into regional phase28.03.2012National basic fee paid 
28.03.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
28.03.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.03.2012Examination requested  [2012/28]
17.09.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.05.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.09.2015Fee for grant paid
21.09.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.09.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.05.2015
Opposition(s)05.08.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
08.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
08.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
12.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU31.08.2010
AL04.11.2015
AT04.11.2015
BE04.11.2015
BG04.11.2015
CY04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
DK04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
MC04.11.2015
MK04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SI04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
SM04.11.2015
TR04.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/38]HU31.08.2010
AT04.11.2015
BE04.11.2015
BG04.11.2015
CY04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
DK04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
MC04.11.2015
MK04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SI04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
SM04.11.2015
TR04.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2018/33]HU31.08.2010
AT04.11.2015
BE04.11.2015
CY04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
DK04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
MC04.11.2015
MK04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SI04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
SM04.11.2015
TR04.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2018/29]HU31.08.2010
AT04.11.2015
BE04.11.2015
CY04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
DK04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
MC04.11.2015
MK04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SI04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
SM04.11.2015
TR04.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2018/28]HU31.08.2010
AT04.11.2015
BE04.11.2015
CY04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
DK04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
MC04.11.2015
MK04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SI04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
SM04.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2017/23]AT04.11.2015
BE04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
DK04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
MC04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SI04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
SM04.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2017/03]AT04.11.2015
BE04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
DK04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SI04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
SM04.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2016/49]AT04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
DK04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SI04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
SM04.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2016/39]AT04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
DK04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
SM04.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2016/38]AT04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
SM04.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2016/36]AT04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2016/34]AT04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2016/25]AT04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2016/24]AT04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2016/23]ES04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
Former [2016/22]ES04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
Former [2016/21]ES04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
Former [2016/20]ES04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
Cited inInternational search[I]US5767414  (ANDREWS THOMAS [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [I]JPS6475938  (HITACHI LTD) [I] 1-15 * abstract *