Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2483889

EP2483889 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR IDENTIFYING AUDIO CONTENT USING AN INTERACTIVE MEDIA GUIDANCE APPLICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.03.2014
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip14.10.2019New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rovi Guides, Inc.
2160 Gold Street
San Jose, CA 95002 / US
[2018/01]
Former [2016/45]For all designated states
Rovi Guides, Inc.
2 Circle Star Way
San Carlos, CA 94070 / US
Former [2015/37]For all designated states
Rovi Guides, Inc.
2830 De La Cruz Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95050 / US
Former [2012/32]For all designated states
United Video Properties, Inc.
2830 De La Cruz Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95050 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LAJOIE, Dan
420 California Avenue 6
Santa Monica, California 90403 / US
02 / CARLBERG, Marvin
12021 Wilshire Blvd. 727
Los Angeles, California90025 / US
03 / NISHIMURA, Akitaka
Tokyo Otemachi 39601
Otemachi Tokyo 100-0004 / JP
 [2012/32]
Representative(s)Pisani, Diana Jean
Haley Guiliano International LLP
26-28 Bedford Row
London WC1R 4HE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/18]Korenberg, Alexander Tal , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Former [2012/32]Korenberg, Alexander Tal , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
GB-London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date10763927.027.09.2010
WO2010US50380
Priority number, dateUS2009057008430.09.2009         Original published format: US 570084
US2009057009530.09.2009         Original published format: US 570095
US2009057011030.09.2009         Original published format: US 570110
[2012/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2011041259
Date:07.04.2011
Language:EN
[2011/14]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2483889
Date:08.08.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2011
[2012/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2483889
Date:30.04.2014
Language:EN
[2014/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.08.2011
ClassificationInternational:G11B27/28, G11B27/32, G06F17/30, H04N21/231, H04N21/233, H04N21/472, H04N21/81, H04N5/445
[2014/01]
Former International [2012/32]G11B27/28
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/32]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG VON AUDIOINHALTEN MIT EINER ANWENDUNG FÜR INTERAKTIVE MEDIENANLEITUNG[2012/32]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR IDENTIFYING AUDIO CONTENT USING AN INTERACTIVE MEDIA GUIDANCE APPLICATION[2012/32]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS D'IDENTIFICATION D'UN CONTENU AUDIO À L'AIDE D'UNE APPLICATION INTERACTIVE DE GUIDAGE DE MÉDIA[2012/32]
Entry into regional phase14.02.2012National basic fee paid 
14.02.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
14.02.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.02.2012Examination requested  [2012/32]
16.11.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.08.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.10.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.12.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.03.2014Fee for grant paid
03.03.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP14166460.7  / EP2824666
EP17167652.1  / EP3217403
EP17211245.0  / EP3373302
EP18186407.5  / EP3413314
EP19220286.9
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.08.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  30.01.2015  09.11.2017  WITHDRAWN
Virgin Media Limited
Media House
Bartley Wood Business Park
Hook Hampshire RG27 9UP / GB
Opponent's representative
Martin, Philip John
Marks & Clerk LLP
62-68 Hills Road
Cambridge
CB2 1LA / GB
 [2018/01]
Former [2016/43]
Opponent(s)01  30.01.2015  05.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Virgin Media Limited
Media House
Bartley Wood Business Park
Hook Hampshire RG27 9UP / GB
Opponent's representative
Martin, Philip John
Marks & Clerk LLP
62-68 Hills Road
Cambridge
CB2 1LA / GB
Former [2015/11]
Opponent(s)01  30.01.2015  05.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Virgin Media Limited
Media House
Bartley Wood Business Park
Hook Hampshire RG27 9UP / GB
Opponent's representative
Gwilt, Julia Louise
Marks & Clerk LLP
62-68 Hills Road
Cambridge
CB2 1LA / GB
10.03.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
18.09.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
20.06.2016Date of oral proceedings
13.07.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
13.07.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
21.05.2019Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
27.09.2019Reply to a communication from the opposition division
15.10.2019Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
Appeal following opposition13.09.2016Appeal received No.  T2123/16
23.11.2016Statement of grounds filed
05.02.2019Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
05.02.2019Date of oral proceedings
13.02.2019Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU27.09.2010
AL30.04.2014
AT30.04.2014
BE30.04.2014
CY30.04.2014
CZ30.04.2014
DK30.04.2014
EE30.04.2014
FI30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
MC30.04.2014
MK30.04.2014
MT30.04.2014
NL30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
RO30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
SI30.04.2014
SK30.04.2014
SM30.04.2014
TR30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
IE27.09.2014
LU27.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
[2018/46]
Former [2018/30]HU27.09.2010
AT30.04.2014
BE30.04.2014
CY30.04.2014
CZ30.04.2014
DK30.04.2014
EE30.04.2014
FI30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
MC30.04.2014
MK30.04.2014
MT30.04.2014
NL30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
RO30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
SI30.04.2014
SK30.04.2014
SM30.04.2014
TR30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
IE27.09.2014
LU27.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
Former [2016/33]HU27.09.2010
AT30.04.2014
BE30.04.2014
CY30.04.2014
CZ30.04.2014
DK30.04.2014
EE30.04.2014
FI30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
MC30.04.2014
MT30.04.2014
NL30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
RO30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
SI30.04.2014
SK30.04.2014
SM30.04.2014
TR30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
IE27.09.2014
LU27.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
Former [2016/32]HU27.09.2010
AT30.04.2014
BE30.04.2014
CY30.04.2014
CZ30.04.2014
DK30.04.2014
EE30.04.2014
FI30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
MC30.04.2014
MT30.04.2014
NL30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
RO30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
SI30.04.2014
SK30.04.2014
SM30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
IE27.09.2014
LU27.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
Former [2016/28]AT30.04.2014
BE30.04.2014
CY30.04.2014
CZ30.04.2014
DK30.04.2014
EE30.04.2014
FI30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
MC30.04.2014
MT30.04.2014
NL30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
RO30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
SI30.04.2014
SK30.04.2014
SM30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
IE27.09.2014
LU27.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
Former [2016/22]AT30.04.2014
BE30.04.2014
CY30.04.2014
CZ30.04.2014
DK30.04.2014
EE30.04.2014
FI30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
MC30.04.2014
NL30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
RO30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
SI30.04.2014
SK30.04.2014
SM30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
IE27.09.2014
LU27.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
Former [2015/37]AT30.04.2014
BE30.04.2014
CY30.04.2014
CZ30.04.2014
DK30.04.2014
EE30.04.2014
FI30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
MC30.04.2014
NL30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
RO30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
SI30.04.2014
SK30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
IE27.09.2014
LU27.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
Former [2015/36]AT30.04.2014
BE30.04.2014
CY30.04.2014
CZ30.04.2014
DK30.04.2014
EE30.04.2014
FI30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
MC30.04.2014
NL30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
RO30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
SI30.04.2014
SK30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
LU27.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
Former [2015/33]AT30.04.2014
BE30.04.2014
CY30.04.2014
CZ30.04.2014
DK30.04.2014
EE30.04.2014
FI30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
MC30.04.2014
NL30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
RO30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
SK30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
LU27.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
Former [2015/22]AT30.04.2014
BE30.04.2014
CY30.04.2014
CZ30.04.2014
DK30.04.2014
EE30.04.2014
FI30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
MC30.04.2014
NL30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
RO30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
SK30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
LU27.09.2014
Former [2015/20]AT30.04.2014
BE30.04.2014
CY30.04.2014
CZ30.04.2014
DK30.04.2014
EE30.04.2014
FI30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
MC30.04.2014
NL30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
RO30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
SK30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
Former [2015/11]AT30.04.2014
BE30.04.2014
CY30.04.2014
CZ30.04.2014
DK30.04.2014
EE30.04.2014
FI30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
NL30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
RO30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
SK30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
Former [2015/10]AT30.04.2014
BE30.04.2014
CY30.04.2014
CZ30.04.2014
DK30.04.2014
EE30.04.2014
FI30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
NL30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
SK30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
Former [2015/08]AT30.04.2014
BE30.04.2014
CY30.04.2014
DK30.04.2014
FI30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
NL30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
Former [2015/02]AT30.04.2014
CY30.04.2014
FI30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
NL30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
Former [2014/51]AT30.04.2014
CY30.04.2014
FI30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
NL30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
Former [2014/50]CY30.04.2014
FI30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
NL30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
Former [2014/49]CY30.04.2014
FI30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
Former [2014/48]CY30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
Former [2014/47]CY30.04.2014
Cited inInternational search[I]WO0227600  (SHAZAM ENTERTAINMENT LTD [GB], et al) [I] 1-9,22-24,27-35,48-50,53-61,74-76 * page 6, line 8 - line 14 * * page 7, line 1 - line 16 * * page 8, line 3 - line 9 * * page 12, line 13 - line 21 * * page 18, line 15 - page 19, line 2 * * page 27, line 1 - line 13 * * page 30, line 5 - line 23 * * page 40, line 3 - line 12 * * page 41, line 15 - line 22 * * page 42, line 1 - line 6 * * page 43, line 20 - page 45, line 9 * * page 46, line 1 - line 9 * * page 48, line 1 - line 24 * * page 51, line 17 - line 22 *;
 [I]WO0211123  (SHAZAM ENTERTAINMENT LTD [GB], et al) [I] 1-9,22-24,27-35,48-50,53-61,74-76 * figure 1 * * page 4, lines 20-35 * * page 5, lines 16-29 * * page 7, lines 5-10 * * page 7, line 21 - page 8, line 36 * * page 9, line 36 - page 10, line 19 * * page 10, line 25 - page 11, line 18 *;
 [I]WO03007235  (AUDIBLE MAGIC CORP [US]) [I] 1-5,8,24,27-31,34,50,53-57,60,76 * figures 1A, 1B, 2 * * page 5, line 10 - page 6, line 14 * * page 6, line 25 - page 10, line 8 *;
 [X]WO2004090752  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 25,26,51,52,77,78 * figure 2 * * page 5, line 8 - line 14 * * page 6, line 3 - line 8 * * page 9, line 9 - line 10 * * page 9, line 18 - line 20 * * page 10, line 12 - line 33 * * page 11, line 19 - line 27 * * page 13, line 27 - page 14, line 2 *;
 [X]  - MICHAEL FINK ET AL, "Mass personalization: social and interactive applications using sound-track identification", MULTIMEDIA TOOLS AND APPLICATIONS, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, BO, (20061221), vol. 36, no. 1-2, ISSN 1573-7721, pages 115 - 132, XP019555263 [X] 79-126 * figures 1,2 * * page 121, paragraph 3.2 * * page 122, paragraph 3.3 * * page 116 * * page 120, paragraph 2.3 * * page 122, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4 *
 [I]  - CHING-WEI CHEN ET AL, "Content identification in consumer applications", MULTIMEDIA AND EXPO, 2009. ICME 2009. IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090628), doi:10.1109/ICME.2009.5202797, ISBN 978-1-4244-4290-4, pages 1536 - 1539, XP031511053 [I] 79-83,95-99,111-115 * figure 2 * * page 1537, paragraph 2.5 * * page 1539, paragraph 4.3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICME.2009.5202797
 [I]  - Anonymous, "Music Explorer", Shazam, (20090318), page 2PP, URL: http://replay.web.archive.org/20090318054006/http://www.shazam.com/music/web/pages/explorer.html, (20110510), XP002636311 [I] 79-83,95-99,111-115 * the whole document *
by applicantUS6564378
 US6239794
 US6756997
 US6388714
 US20030347673
 US20050179410
 US19990437304
 US20020105128
 US20050324202
 US19990332244
 US19980120488
 US20040927814