Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2483889 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2483889



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1897
21.10.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.10.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.10.2019 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
15.10.2019 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 47
15.10.2019 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 1
15.10.2019 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
15.10.2019 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
15.10.2019 Means of redress Opposition 2
27.09.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
27.09.2019 All other documents for the Appeal procedure not covered by any other Code Opposition 4
27.09.2019 Clean copy of description pages in the opposition procedure Opposition 3
27.09.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
27.09.2019 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.05.2019 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
21.05.2019 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 1
21.05.2019 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
21.05.2019 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
03.04.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
03.04.2019 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
03.04.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
29.03.2019 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 20
29.03.2019 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
13.02.2019 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
13.02.2019 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 3
04.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
04.01.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 31
04.01.2019 Claims Appeal 34
04.01.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
04.01.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
12.09.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.09.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
07.09.2018 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 12
04.09.2018 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
29.11.2017 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 2
23.11.2017 Request for change of address - applicant Appeal 15
17.11.2017 F3348 Confirmation of withdrawal of the opposition by the respondent and former opponent Appeal 1
17.11.2017 F3348 Confirmation of withdrawal of the opposition by the respondent and former opponent Appeal 1
09.11.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
09.11.2017 Cover sheet for fax transmission Appeal 2
09.11.2017 Withdrawal of an opposition Appeal 2
07.11.2017 Miscellaneous requests concerning client data Appeal 1
04.10.2017 Document concerning representation Appeal 3
18.04.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.04.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
10.04.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
10.04.2017 Reply to appeal Appeal 9
04.04.2017 F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
05.01.2017 F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
30.11.2016 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
23.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
23.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
23.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
23.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
23.11.2016 Claims Appeal 4
23.11.2016 Claims Appeal 4
23.11.2016 Claims Appeal 4
23.11.2016 Claims Appeal 4
23.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
23.11.2016 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 10
07.10.2016 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 2
07.10.2016 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 2
22.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
22.09.2016 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
22.09.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
22.09.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
22.09.2016 Request for change of address - applicant Appeal 1
14.09.2016 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
13.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
13.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
13.09.2016 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
05.09.2016 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 3
01.08.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.07.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.07.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
13.07.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
13.07.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
13.07.2016 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
13.07.2016 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
13.07.2016 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 12
13.07.2016 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
13.07.2016 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
13.07.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
13.07.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
13.07.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
13.07.2016 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
13.07.2016 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 8
13.07.2016 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 15
20.06.2016 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 9
27.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
20.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
20.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
20.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 5
20.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 5
20.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
20.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
20.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
20.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
20.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
20.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 5
20.05.2016 Claims Opposition 5
20.05.2016 Claims Opposition 4
20.05.2016 Claims Opposition 5
20.05.2016 Claims Opposition 4
20.05.2016 Claims Opposition 4
20.05.2016 Claims Opposition 5
20.05.2016 Claims Opposition 4
20.05.2016 Claims Opposition 4
20.05.2016 Claims Opposition 3
20.05.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
20.05.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
20.05.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 7
20.05.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
04.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
28.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
28.04.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
28.04.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.04.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
11.04.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
11.04.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.12.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.12.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.11.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
30.11.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
30.11.2015 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 7
30.11.2015 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
30.11.2015 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
30.11.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
30.11.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.11.2015 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.11.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
19.10.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 10
24.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.09.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
18.09.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
18.09.2015 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 13
11.08.2015 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
23.07.2015 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 14
21.07.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.07.2015 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
16.07.2015 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Opposition 13
16.07.2015 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 27
15.07.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
15.07.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
15.07.2015 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
13.03.2015 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 16
10.03.2015 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
10.03.2015 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
09.02.2015 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
03.02.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
30.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
30.01.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
30.01.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
30.01.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
30.01.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 26
30.01.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
30.01.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 76
30.01.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 25
30.01.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 46
30.01.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
30.01.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 49
30.01.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
30.01.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 41
19.01.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 17
02.05.2014 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
03.04.2014 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
20.03.2014 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
20.03.2014 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
20.03.2014 German translation of the claims Search / examination 5
03.03.2014 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
11.12.2013 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
11.12.2013 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
11.12.2013 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
11.12.2013 Text intended for grant Search / examination 117
07.10.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
07.10.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
07.10.2013 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 4
07.10.2013 Claims Search / examination 4
07.10.2013 Description Search / examination 3
07.10.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.10.2013 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
06.08.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
06.08.2013 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
24.07.2013 Examination started Search / examination 1
25.02.2013 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
16.11.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.11.2012 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
16.11.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 9
16.11.2012 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
16.11.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
18.07.2012 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
11.07.2012 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
02.07.2012 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
07.06.2012 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
09.05.2012 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
20.04.2012 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 15
14.02.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
14.02.2012 Annex Search / examination 1
14.02.2012 Annex Search / examination 1
14.02.2012 Annex Search / examination 1
14.02.2012 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
10.02.2012 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
19.09.2011 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
19.09.2011 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
18.08.2011 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 6
18.08.2011 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 2
19.05.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
19.05.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
19.05.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 10
29.04.2011 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 134
29.04.2011 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 138
29.04.2011 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 135
07.04.2011 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 146
04.10.2010 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
04.10.2010 Claims International Searching Authority 31
04.10.2010 Description International Searching Authority 100
04.10.2010 Drawings International Searching Authority 13