Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2414956

EP2414956 - CLOUD COMPUTING FOR AN INDUSTRIAL AUTOMATION AND MANUFACTURING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.07.2013
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.04.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Honeywell International Inc.
115 Tabor Road
Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US
[2015/51]
Former [2012/06]For all designated states
Honeywell International Inc.
101 Columbia Road
Morristown, NJ 07962 / US
Inventor(s)01 / STAGGS, Kevin P.
13387 W. Tyler Trail
Peoria Arizona 85383 / US
02 / MCLAUGHLIN, Paul F.
804 Alene Road
Amber Pennsylvania 19002 / US
 [2012/06]
Representative(s)Houghton, Mark Phillip , et al
Patent Outsourcing Limited
1 King Street
Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/06]Buckley, Guy Julian
Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell
Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB
Application number, filing date10764812.323.03.2010
WO2010US28208
Priority number, dateUS2009041685901.04.2009         Original published format: US 416859
[2012/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2010120440
Date:21.10.2010
Language:EN
[2010/42]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2414956
Date:08.02.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.2010
[2012/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR20.01.2011
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.03.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06F15/16, G06F15/76, G06F9/50
[2013/15]
Former International [2012/06]G06F15/16, G06F15/76
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/06]
TitleGerman:CLOUD-COMPUTING FÜR EIN INDUSTRIELLES AUTOMATISIERUNGS- UND FABRIKATIONSSYSTEM[2012/06]
English:CLOUD COMPUTING FOR AN INDUSTRIAL AUTOMATION AND MANUFACTURING SYSTEM[2012/06]
French:INFORMATIQUE EN NUAGE POUR UN SYSTÈME INDUSTRIEL D'AUTOMATISATION ET DE FABRICATION[2012/06]
Entry into regional phase30.09.2011National basic fee paid 
30.09.2011Search fee paid 
30.09.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
30.09.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.09.2011Examination requested  [2012/06]
28.03.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.07.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.09.2014Date of oral proceedings
14.11.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
14.11.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination12.01.2015Appeal received No.  T1133/15
17.03.2015Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.03.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
08.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
10.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
06.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
08.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
07.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
29.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
29.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[I]  - NEAL LEAVITT, "Is Cloud Computing Really Ready for Prime Time?", COMPUTER, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, US, (20090101), vol. 41, no. 1, ISSN 0018-9162, pages 15 - 20, XP011241543 [I] 1-10 * the whole document *
 [I]  - GROSSMAN R L, "The Case for Cloud Computing", IT PROFESSIONAL, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, US, (20090301), vol. 11, no. 2, ISSN 1520-9202, pages 23 - 27, XP011293281 [I] 1-10 * the whole document *
International search[X]US2006230149  (JACKSON, D. B.);
 [AP]US2009125370  (BLONDEAU ANTOINE ET AL.);
 [AP]US2009210071  (AGRUSA RUSSELL L. ET AL.);
 [AP]US7636764  (FEIN GENE ET AL.)