Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2419508

EP2419508 - METHOD FOR THE INDUCTION OF A REWARD RESPONSE BY MODULATION OF DOPAMINERGIC SYSTEMS IN THE CENTRAL NERVOUS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.11.2014
Database last updated on 18.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip14.11.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.12.2014  [2014/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Somalabs, Inc.
40 Allen Road
South Burlington, VT 05403 / US
[2012/08]
Inventor(s)01 / JONES, Dennis
c/o Somalabs Inc.
40 Allen Road
South Burlington, VT 05403 / US
 [2012/08]
Representative(s)Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Sohnckestrasse 12
81479 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/08]Prüfer & Partner GbR European Patent Attorneys
Sohnckestrasse 12
81479 München / DE
Application number, filing date10765276.016.04.2010
WO2010US31430
Priority number, dateUS20090170234P17.04.2009         Original published format: US 170234 P
[2012/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010121159
Date:21.10.2010
Language:EN
[2010/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2419508
Date:22.02.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.2010
[2012/08]
Search report(s)International search reportUS21.10.2010
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP17.10.2012
ClassificationInternational:C12N5/16
[2012/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/08]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR AUSLÖSUNG EINER BELOHNUNGSREAKTION MITTELS MODULATION DOPAMINERGER SYSTEME IM ZENTRALNERVENSYSTEM[2012/08]
English:METHOD FOR THE INDUCTION OF A REWARD RESPONSE BY MODULATION OF DOPAMINERGIC SYSTEMS IN THE CENTRAL NERVOUS SYSTEM[2012/08]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'INDUCTION D'UNE RÉPONSE DE RÉCOMPENSE PAR MODULATION DE SYSTÈMES DOPAMINERGIQUES DANS LE SYSTÈME NERVEUX CENTRAL[2012/08]
Entry into regional phase16.11.2011National basic fee paid 
16.11.2011Search fee paid 
16.11.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
16.11.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.11.2011Examination requested  [2012/08]
25.05.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.02.2013Observations by third parties
01.08.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.02.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.03.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.07.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/51]
13.08.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2014/51]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.08.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
29.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201405   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO0214279  (AXON BIOCHEMICALS B V [NL], et al) [X] 1-11 *cf. abstract, 1st para. at page 1, page 6, lines 9-31, page 20, lines 18-21, page 23, lines 6-34, claims 12,14 and 15* [Y] 12-20;
 [XY]WO2008000194  (OSMOTICA CORP, et al) [X] 1-11 *cf. abstract, page 30, lines 1-14, claims 1-22* [Y] 12-20
International search[Y]US2006165822  (VAN DER GIESSEN ROB [CH], et al);
 [Y]US2006062859  (BLUM KENNETH [US], et al);
 [Y]US2004077556  (CHINERY ROBERT [US])
 [Y]  - "Anti-HIV benzoisoquinoline alkaloids and flavonoids from the leaves of Nelumbo nucifera. Natural Product Radiance", THERAPEUTICS., (2005), page 1,
other   - "Uccatadyamodakah", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. HG/1938, XP003030703
    - VANGASENA, Vangasena, page 236,
    - "Simhanada Gugguluh", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. AK11/1519, XP003030704
    - VANGASENA, Vangasena, pages 390 - 391,
    - "Nilakamala Kanda Gunah", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. RS6/487A, XP003030705
    - KAIYADEVA, Kaiyadevanighantau, pages 268 - 269,
    - "Vamanamtarasah", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. RS17/3734, XP003030706
    - SMKARADAJISASTRIPADE, Aryabhisaka (Hindustana Ca Vaidyaraja), page 433,
    - "Svetatanduladi Yogah (Bhasmake)", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. RS17/1012, XP003030707
    - SMKARADAJISASTRIPADE, Aryabhisaka (Hindustana Ca Vaidyaraja), page 80,
    - "Sitatanduladi Ksirapaka", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. AK11/744, XP003030708
    - VANGASENA, Vangasena, page 187,