Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2489242

EP2489242 - PHASE CUT DIMMING OF LEDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  05.09.2014
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tridonic UK Limited
Aurora House Hampshire International Business Park Crockford Lane Chineham Basingstoke
Hampshire RG24 8LB / GB
[2012/34]
Inventor(s)01 / WILSON, Ian
3 Parkside East Herrington
Sunderland Tyne and Wear SR3 3RH / GB
02 / FRANKLAND, James
8 Silver Meadows
Barton
Richmond Yorkshire DL10 6SL / GB
03 / STEVENS, Frederick
47 Whitworth Terrace
Spennymoor DL16 7LE / GB
 [2012/34]
Representative(s)Rupp, Christian
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstraße 33
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/34]Rupp, Christian
Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date10766043.314.10.2010
WO2010EP65412
Priority number, dateAT20090000639U14.10.2009         Original published format: AT 63909 U
[2013/10]
Former [2012/34]AT20090000639U14.10.2009
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011045372
Date:21.04.2011
Language:EN
[2011/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2489242
Date:22.08.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2011
[2012/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.04.2011
ClassificationInternational:H05B33/08
[2012/34]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/34]
TitleGerman:PHASENSCHNITTVERDUNKLUNG VON LEDS[2012/34]
English:PHASE CUT DIMMING OF LEDS[2012/34]
French:GRADATION D'INTENSITÉ DE DEL PAR COUPURE DE PHASE[2012/34]
Entry into regional phase26.03.2012National basic fee paid 
26.03.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
26.03.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.03.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.03.2012Examination requested  [2012/34]
15.10.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.04.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.01.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.03.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.04.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.09.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.02.2015Date of oral proceedings
10.03.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
10.03.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination10.04.2015Appeal received No.  T1568/15
15.06.2015Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.10.2012
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
31.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
30.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
31.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
31.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
30.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
28.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Cited inInternational search[XYI]US2007182347  (SHTEYNBERG ANATOLY [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7,8,10,12-14,16,19,20 * page 2, paragraph 16; figures 6-11 * * page 3, paragraphs 18-20 * * page 4, paragraph 41 - page 5, paragraph 50 * * page 6, paragraph 55 - page 9, paragraph 76 * [Y] 11 [I] 3-6,9,15,17,18;
 [XDI]WO2009121956  (LEMNIS LIGHTING PATENT HOLDING [NL], et al) [XD] 1,2,8,9,12-14,16,17,20 * the whole document * [I] 3,7,19;
 [YA]WO2005115058  (POLYBRITE INTERNATIONAL INC [US], et al) [Y] 11 * page 1; figures 5-8 * * page 4, paragraph 14 * * page 5, paragraph 24 - page 6, paragraph 26 * * page 6, paragraph 29 - page 7, paragraph 31 * * page 7, paragraph 34 - page 8, paragraph 39 * * claim 1 * [A] 1-10,12-20;
 [A]US2009184662  (GIVEN TERRY [NZ], et al) [A] 1-20 * page 1, paragraphs 3, 10; figures 3, 4, 5A, 5B, 6A, 6B * * page 2, paragraph 15 * * page 3, paragraph 36 * * page 4, paragraph 45 - page 7, paragraph 63 *;
 [AD]EP1016062  (COLOR KINETICS INC [US]) [AD] 1-20 * the whole document *
 [X]  - RAND D ET AL, "Issues, Models and Solutions for Triac Modulated Phase Dimming of LED Lamps", POWER ELECTRONICS SPECIALISTS CONFERENCE, 2007. PESC 2007. IEEE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20070617), ISBN 978-1-4244-0654-8, pages 1398 - 1404, XP031218489 [X] 1,13 * page 1403, column r, paragraph Dummy load - page 1404, column l, paragraph 1; figure 12 *
by applicantEP1016062
 WO2009121956