EP2480259 - METHODS OF EMITTING A VOLATILE MATERIAL FROM A DIFFUSER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 01.05.2020 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2020 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 03.06.2020 [2020/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S.C. Johnson & Son, Inc. 1525 Howe Street Racine, WI 53403 / US | [2012/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GASPER, Thomas, P. N101 W14353 Huckleberry Court Germantown Wisconsin 53022 / US | [2012/31] | Representative(s) | Madgwick, Paul Roland Ruschke Madgwick Seide & Kollegen Patentanwälte Patent Attorney (UK) PartG mbB Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/31] | Madgwick, Paul Roland Ruschke Madgwick Seide & Kollegen Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10766370.0 | 20.09.2010 | [2020/23] | WO2010US02558 | Priority number, date | US20090244285P | 21.09.2009 Original published format: US 244285 P | [2012/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011034613 | Date: | 24.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2480259 | Date: | 01.08.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2480259 | Date: | 19.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/47] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2480259 | Date: | 03.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61L9/12, A61L9/03 | [2012/31] | CPC: |
A61L9/035 (EP,US);
A61L9/125 (EP,US);
A61L9/037 (EP,US);
A61L9/127 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/31] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR EMISSION EINES FLÜCHTIGEN MATERIALS AUS EINEM DIFFUSOR | [2012/31] | English: | METHODS OF EMITTING A VOLATILE MATERIAL FROM A DIFFUSER | [2012/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉS D'ÉMISSION D'UN MATÉRIAU VOLATILE PROVENANT D'UN DIFFUSEUR | [2012/31] | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/31] | 25.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.12.2013 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.08.2015
24.08.2015
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnatti, Ohio 45202 / US Opponent's representative Jump, Timothy John Simon Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2015/40] | 23.09.2015 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.12.2015 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 17.03.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.04.2017 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 26.11.2019 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 16.01.2020 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 20.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 24.04.2020 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 23.06.2017 | Appeal received No. T1723/17 | 24.08.2017 | Statement of grounds filed | 26.11.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 26.11.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.12.2019 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.09.2010 | AL | 19.11.2014 | AT | 19.11.2014 | BE | 19.11.2014 | BG | 19.11.2014 | CY | 19.11.2014 | CZ | 19.11.2014 | DK | 19.11.2014 | EE | 19.11.2014 | FI | 19.11.2014 | HR | 19.11.2014 | LT | 19.11.2014 | LV | 19.11.2014 | MC | 19.11.2014 | MK | 19.11.2014 | MT | 19.11.2014 | NL | 19.11.2014 | PL | 19.11.2014 | RO | 19.11.2014 | SE | 19.11.2014 | SI | 19.11.2014 | SK | 19.11.2014 | SM | 19.11.2014 | TR | 19.11.2014 | NO | 19.02.2015 | GR | 20.02.2015 | IS | 19.03.2015 | PT | 19.03.2015 | IE | 20.09.2015 | LU | 20.09.2015 | CH | 30.09.2015 | FR | 30.09.2015 | LI | 30.09.2015 | DE | 01.04.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 20.09.2010 | |
AT | 19.11.2014 | ||
BE | 19.11.2014 | ||
BG | 19.11.2014 | ||
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
MK | 19.11.2014 | ||
MT | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
SM | 19.11.2014 | ||
TR | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
IE | 20.09.2015 | ||
LU | 20.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
FR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
DE | 01.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/46] | HU | 20.09.2010 | |
AT | 19.11.2014 | ||
BE | 19.11.2014 | ||
BG | 19.11.2014 | ||
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
MT | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
SM | 19.11.2014 | ||
TR | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
IE | 20.09.2015 | ||
LU | 20.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
FR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
DE | 01.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 20.09.2010 | |
AT | 19.11.2014 | ||
BG | 19.11.2014 | ||
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
MT | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
SM | 19.11.2014 | ||
TR | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
IE | 20.09.2015 | ||
LU | 20.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
FR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
DE | 01.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/22] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
MT | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
IE | 20.09.2015 | ||
LU | 20.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
FR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
DE | 01.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
IE | 20.09.2015 | ||
LU | 20.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
FR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
DE | 01.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
IE | 20.09.2015 | ||
LU | 20.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
DE | 01.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
LU | 20.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
LU | 20.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 19.11.2014 | |
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 19.11.2014 | |
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 19.11.2014 | |
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 19.11.2014 | |
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 19.11.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US5297988 (NISHINO TOMOHIDE [JP], et al) [X] 5-8,10,11 * column 3, lines 17-63; figure 1; claims 1-3 * [A] 1-4,14-20 [I] 9,12,13; | [XI]US2005205916 (CONWAY SIMON M [US], et al) [X] 5,6,8,9,11-13 * paragraphs [0061] , [0 66]; claim 18 * [I] 7,10 | by applicant | US7441360 | US20060427714 | US20090319606 | Opposition | JPH05173648 |