Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2480155

EP2480155 - PHARMACY WASTE IDENTIFICATION LABELING AND DISPOSAL SYSTEM AND RELATED METHOD OF USING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.09.2014
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Avery Dennison Corporation
150 North Orange Grove Blvd.
Pasadena, CA 91103 / US
[N/P]
Former [2012/31]For all designated states
Avery Dennison Corporation
150 North Orange Grove Bvld.
Pasadena, CA 91103 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DEHLINGER, Anne, M.
7180 Creekbend Drive
Pendleton, NY 14120 / US
02 / BECKER, William
6379 Tonawanda Creek Road
Lockport, NY 14094 / US
 [2012/31]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/31]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Straße 2
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date10766390.821.09.2010
WO2010US49563
Priority number, dateUS20090244270P21.09.2009         Original published format: US 244270 P
[2012/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011035277
Date:24.03.2011
Language:EN
[2011/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2480155
Date:01.08.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2011
[2012/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2480155
Date:20.11.2013
Language:EN
[2013/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.03.2011
ClassificationInternational:G06Q10/00, A61B19/00, A61B19/02, B65F1/14, G06F19/00
[2013/22]
Former International [2012/31]A61B19/00, A61B19/02, B65F1/00, G06F19/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/31]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG, MARKIERUNG UND ENTSORGUNG VON PHARMAABFALL UND ZUGEHÖRIGES VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN[2012/31]
English:PHARMACY WASTE IDENTIFICATION LABELING AND DISPOSAL SYSTEM AND RELATED METHOD OF USING[2012/31]
French:SYSTÈME D'ÉTIQUETAGE D'IDENTIFICATION ET DE MISE AU REBUT DE DÉCHETS PHARMACEUTIQUES ET PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION ASSOCIÉ[2012/31]
Entry into regional phase05.04.2012National basic fee paid 
05.04.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
05.04.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.04.2012Examination requested  [2012/31]
16.10.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.06.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.10.2013Fee for grant paid
10.10.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.06.2013
Opposition(s)21.08.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
27.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU21.09.2010
AL20.11.2013
AT20.11.2013
BG20.11.2013
CY20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
DK20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
HR20.11.2013
IT20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
MC20.11.2013
MK20.11.2013
MT20.11.2013
PL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
SI20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
SM20.11.2013
TR20.11.2013
NO20.02.2014
GR21.02.2014
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
[2018/46]
Former [2018/30]HU21.09.2010
AT20.11.2013
BG20.11.2013
CY20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
DK20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
HR20.11.2013
IT20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
MC20.11.2013
MK20.11.2013
MT20.11.2013
PL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
SI20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
SM20.11.2013
TR20.11.2013
NO20.02.2014
GR21.02.2014
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
Former [2016/33]HU21.09.2010
AT20.11.2013
BG20.11.2013
CY20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
DK20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
HR20.11.2013
IT20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
MC20.11.2013
MT20.11.2013
PL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
SI20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
SM20.11.2013
TR20.11.2013
NO20.02.2014
GR21.02.2014
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
Former [2016/32]HU21.09.2010
AT20.11.2013
BG20.11.2013
CY20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
DK20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
HR20.11.2013
IT20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
MC20.11.2013
MT20.11.2013
PL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
SI20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
SM20.11.2013
NO20.02.2014
GR21.02.2014
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
Former [2016/31]AT20.11.2013
BG20.11.2013
CY20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
DK20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
HR20.11.2013
IT20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
MC20.11.2013
MT20.11.2013
PL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
SI20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
SM20.11.2013
NO20.02.2014
GR21.02.2014
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
Former [2016/28]AT20.11.2013
BG20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
DK20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
HR20.11.2013
IT20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
MC20.11.2013
MT20.11.2013
PL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
SI20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
SM20.11.2013
NO20.02.2014
GR21.02.2014
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
Former [2016/22]AT20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
DK20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
HR20.11.2013
IT20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
MC20.11.2013
PL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
SI20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
SM20.11.2013
NO20.02.2014
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
Former [2015/37]AT20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
DK20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
HR20.11.2013
IT20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
MC20.11.2013
PL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
SI20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
NO20.02.2014
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
Former [2015/20]AT20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
DK20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
HR20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
MC20.11.2013
PL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
SI20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
NO20.02.2014
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
Former [2015/14]AT20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
DK20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
HR20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
PL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
SI20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
NO20.02.2014
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
Former [2014/41]AT20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
DK20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
HR20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
PL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
NO20.02.2014
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
Former [2014/37]AT20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
HR20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
PL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
NO20.02.2014
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
Former [2014/36]AT20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
HR20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
NO20.02.2014
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
Former [2014/28]AT20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
HR20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
NO20.02.2014
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
Former [2014/25]AT20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
HR20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
NO20.02.2014
IS20.03.2014
Former [2014/24]AT20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
HR20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
NO20.02.2014
IS20.03.2014
Former [2014/23]FI20.11.2013
HR20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
NO20.02.2014
IS20.03.2014
Former [2014/22]FI20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
NO20.02.2014
Former [2014/20]LT20.11.2013
NO20.02.2014
Cited inInternational search[ID]US2009206995  (FORSTER IAN JAMES [US]) [ID] 11,13-15 * paragraphs [0038] , [0046]; figure 3 *;
 [YA]US2008190953  (MALLETT SCOTT R [US], et al) [Y] 1-4,7,8 * paragraph [0287] * [A] 11,16,18;
 [Y]US2008237341  (FLECK STEVEN [US], et al) [Y] 1-4,7,8 * paragraph [0136] *
by applicantUS2009206995