Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2421373

EP2421373 - COLON LAVAGE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.04.2019
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip04.05.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bachwich, Dale R.
7660 Cinnamon Ridge Drive
Rapid City, SD 57702 / US
[2012/09]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2012/09]
Representative(s)Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Postfach 13 03 91
20103 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/09]Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58
20148 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date10767640.520.04.2010
WO2010US31754
Priority number, dateUS20090171337P21.04.2009         Original published format: US 171337 P
[2012/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010123901
Date:28.10.2010
Language:EN
[2010/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2421373
Date:29.02.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2010
[2012/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US28.10.2010
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.01.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61P1/10, A61P3/02
[2019/18]
Former International [2014/01]A01N59/02, A61K9/00, A61K9/48, A61P1/10, A61P3/02, A61P3/12, A61P41/00, A61P1/14, A61K31/77, A61K33/04, A61K33/10, A61K33/14
Former International [2012/09]A01N59/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/09]
TitleGerman:DARMREINIGUNGSSYSTEM[2012/09]
English:COLON LAVAGE SYSTEM[2012/09]
French:SYSTÈME DE LAVAGE DU CÔLON[2012/09]
Entry into regional phase27.10.2011National basic fee paid 
27.10.2011Search fee paid 
27.10.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
27.10.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.10.2011Examination requested  [2012/09]
18.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.07.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.11.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.02.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.03.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.07.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
29.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
28.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
27.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
27.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
27.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
27.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
29.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[XYI]WO2006122104  (SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * the whole document * * paragraph [0069]; example 5; claims 1,6,18,20,21,25,26 * [Y] 1-15 [I] 1-15;
 [XYI]EP0396165  (GIULIANI SPA [IT]) [X] 13-15 * the whole document * * examples 1-3; claim - * [Y] 1-15 [I] 1-15;
 [XY]US5164192  (LOUWES HERMAN D [NL]) [X] 13-15 * the whole document * * column 1, lines 60-65; claims 1-5 * [Y] 1-15;
 [XY]EP0003679  (NEAVERSON MICHAEL ANTHONY DR) [X] 13-15 * the whole document * * page 22, line 26 - page 23, line 13; claim 6 * [Y] 1-15;
 [XYI]  - "Moviprep (PEG-3350, Sodium Sulfate, Sodium Chloride, Potassium Chloride, Sodium Ascorbate and Ascorbic acid for Oral solution)", (2006), pages 1 - 7, FDA, URL: http://www.accessdata.fda.gov/drugsatfda_docs/label/2006/021881lbl.pdf, (20131120), XP002716678 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * *Description*; page 1 * [Y] 1-15 [I] 1-15
 [XYI]  - WEXNER S D ET AL, "A consensus document on bowel preparation prior to colonoscopy", INTERNET CITATION, (20060430), pages 1 - 25, URL: http://sages.org/publication/id/BOWEL/, (20091207), XP002559030 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * * page 3, line 25 - page 4, line 4 * * page 8, lines 8-17 * * page 8, lines 22-33 * [Y] 1-15 [I] 1-15
 [XYI]  - "Summary of product characteristics: Laxido Orange, powder for oral solution", INTERNET CITATION, (20081110), pages 1 - 5, URL: http://www.galen.co.uk/files/Laxido%20Orange%20ROI%20SPC%20sugary.pdf, (20100820), XP002598513 [X] 13-15 * the whole document * * page 1, paragraph 2 * [Y] 1-15 [I] 1-15
 [T]  - PREPARED BY: ASGE TECHNOLOGY COMMITTEE ET AL, "Colonoscopy preparation", GASTROINTESTINAL ENDOSCOPY, ELSEVIER, NL, vol. 69, no. 7, doi:10.1016/J.GIE.2009.01.035, ISSN 0016-5107, (20090601), pages 1201 - 1209, (20090528), XP026142103 [T] * the whole document * * See the different available commercial products in Table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.gie.2009.01.035
 [Y]  - PASHANKAR DINESH S ET AL, "Polyethylene glycol 3350 without electrolytes: a new safe, effective, and palatable bowel preparation for colonoscopy in children.", THE JOURNAL OF PEDIATRICS MAR 2004, (200403), vol. 144, no. 3, ISSN 0022-3476, pages 358 - 362, XP009174435 [Y] 1-13 * the whole document * * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jpeds.2003.11.033
International search[X]US2004192614  (VANNER STEPHEN J [CA], et al);
 [Y]US2007207216  (CASWELL MICHAEL L [US]);
 [Y]US2005180921  (TAYLOR ANDREW J [US], et al);
 [Y]US6447763  (GORDON IAN L [US])
by applicantUS2007098764
 US2007298008
 WO2006122104
    - FORDTRAN et al., Gastroenterology, (19900000), vol. 98, pages 11 - 16
    - EMSTOFF et al., Gastroenterology, (19830000), vol. 84, pages 1512 - 6
    - DAVIS et al., Gastroenterology, (19800000), vol. 78, pages 991 - 995
    - MOVIPREP, PEG-3350, Sodium Sulfate, Sodium Chloride, Potassium Chlo-ride, Sodium Ascorbate and Ascorbic acid for Oral solution, FDA, (20060000), pages 1 - 7
    - WEXNER S D et al., A consensus document on bowel preparation prior to colonoscopy