Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2421983

EP2421983 - SYSTEMS, APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR OBTAINING INTRACELLULAR PRODUCTS AND CELLULAR MASS AND DEBRIS FROM ALGAE AND DERIVATIVE PRODUCTS AND PROCESS OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.03.2017
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  04.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip17.03.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.04.2017  [2017/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Orginoil, Inc.
5645 W Adams Blvd.
Los Angeles, CA 90016 / US
[2012/09]
Inventor(s)01 / ECKELBERRY, Nicholas, D.
1808 N. Van Ness Ave.
Los Angeles CA 90028 / US
02 / GREEN, Michael, Philip
302 Cortsen Rd.
Pleasant Hill CA 94523 / US
03 / FRASER, Scott, Alexander
3420 Alma Ave
Manhattan Beach CA 90266 / US
 [2012/09]
Representative(s)Dummett Copp LLP
25 The Square
Martlesham Heath
Ipswich IP5 3SL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/09]Gemmell, Peter Alan
Dummett Copp LLP 25 The Square Martlesham Heath
Ipswich IP5 3SL / GB
Application number, filing date10767641.320.04.2010
WO2010US31756
Priority number, dateUS20090170698P20.04.2009         Original published format: US 170698 P
[2012/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010123903
Date:28.10.2010
Language:EN
[2010/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2421983
Date:29.02.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2010
[2012/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US28.10.2010
ClassificationInternational:C12P1/00
[2012/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/09]
TitleGerman:SYSTEME, VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR GEWINNUNG INTRAZELLULÄRER PRODUKTE, ZELLULÄRER MASSE UND ZELLULÄREN ABFALLS AUS ALGEN SOWIE DERIVATE DAVON UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER VERWENDUNG[2012/09]
English:SYSTEMS, APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR OBTAINING INTRACELLULAR PRODUCTS AND CELLULAR MASS AND DEBRIS FROM ALGAE AND DERIVATIVE PRODUCTS AND PROCESS OF USE THEREOF[2012/09]
French:SYSTÈMES, APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉS POUR OBTENIR DES PRODUITS INTRACELLULAIRES ET UNE MASSE CELLULAIRE ET DES DÉBRIS À PARTIR D'ALGUES ET PRODUITS DÉRIVÉS, ET LEUR PROCÉDÉ DE MISE EN UVRE[2012/09]
Entry into regional phase11.10.2011National basic fee paid 
11.10.2011Search fee paid 
11.10.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
11.10.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.10.2011Examination requested  [2012/09]
01.11.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/16]
05.12.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2017/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
30.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
29.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201607   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO2009017677  (ECKELBERRY NICHOLAS [US], et al);
 [Y]US5543034  (HILBERTZ WOLF H [IE], et al);
 [Y]US2006172417  (RATHENOW JORG [DE], et al);
 [Y]US7136699  (PALTI YORAM [IL])