blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2421983


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
17.03.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  19.04.2017  [2017/16]
04.12.2016 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
04.06.2016 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
28.07.2015 Change - representative
05.04.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.05.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.05.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.07.2012 Change - extension states published on  15.08.2012  [2012/33]
06.03.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.01.2012 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  29.02.2012  [2012/09]
27.01.2012 Request for examination filed published on  29.02.2012  [2012/09]
10.11.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
21.10.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
12.11.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
29.10.2010 PCT data prior to European publication