Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2488368

EP2488368 - USE OF MARKING AGENTS HAVING NARROW BANDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2012/34]MARKING AGENTS HAVING NARROW BANDS
[2014/02]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  11.04.2014
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.12.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
11.12.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF SE
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/34]For all designated states
BASF SE
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SENS, Rüdiger
Faselwiese 15
67069 Ludwigshafen / DE
02 / GEßNER, Thomas
Gundolfstr.1
69120 Heidelberg / DE
03 / THIEL, Erwin
Schöntalstr. 4
57078 Siegen / DE
 [2012/34]
Representative(s)Reitstötter Kinzebach
Patentanwälte
Postfach 21 11 60
67011 Ludwigshafen / DE
[N/P]
Application number, filing date10768457.312.10.2010
WO2010EP65234
Priority number, dateEP2009017331016.10.2009         Original published format: EP 09173310
[2012/34]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011045294
Date:21.04.2011
Language:DE
[2011/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2488368
Date:22.08.2012
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2011
[2012/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2488368
Date:14.05.2014
Language:DE
[2014/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.04.2011
ClassificationInternational:B41M3/14, G07D7/12, B41M1/26, B41M5/00
[2012/34]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/34]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG DER MARKIERSTOFFE MIT SCHMALEN BANDEN[2014/02]
English:USE OF MARKING AGENTS HAVING NARROW BANDS[2014/02]
French:UTILISATION DE SUBSTANCES DE MARQUAGE À BANDES ÉTROITES[2014/02]
Former [2012/34]MARKIERSTOFFE MIT SCHMALEN BANDEN
Former [2012/34]MARKING AGENTS HAVING NARROW BANDS
Former [2012/34]SUBSTANCES DE MARQUAGE À BANDES ÉTROITES
Entry into regional phase16.05.2012National basic fee paid 
16.05.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
16.05.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.08.2011Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.05.2012Examination requested  [2012/34]
19.12.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.04.2014Fee for grant paid
02.04.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.04.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.12.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  12.02.2015  18.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Giesecke+Devrient Currency Technology GmbH
Prinzregentenstraße 159
81677 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Destouchesstraße 68
80796 München / DE
 [2019/49]
Former [2017/30]
Opponent(s)01  12.02.2015  18.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Giesecke & Devrient GmbH
Prinzregentenstrasse 159
81677 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Destouchesstraße 68
80796 München / DE
Former [2015/13]
Opponent(s)01  12.02.2015  18.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Giesecke & Devrient GmbH
Prinzregentenstrasse 159
81677 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Patentanwälte
Destouchesstraße 68
80796 München / DE
20.03.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
30.07.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
23.11.2016Date of oral proceedings
21.12.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
21.12.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition23.02.2017Appeal received No.  T0559/17
28.04.2017Statement of grounds filed
16.11.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU12.10.2010
AL14.05.2014
BG14.05.2014
CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
IT14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
MC14.05.2014
MK14.05.2014
MT14.05.2014
NL14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
RS14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SI14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
SM14.05.2014
TR14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
IE12.10.2014
LU12.10.2014
BE31.10.2014
FR31.10.2014
AT12.10.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/30]HU12.10.2010
BG14.05.2014
CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
IT14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
MC14.05.2014
MK14.05.2014
MT14.05.2014
NL14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
RS14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SI14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
SM14.05.2014
TR14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
IE12.10.2014
LU12.10.2014
BE31.10.2014
FR31.10.2014
AT12.10.2015
Former [2017/18]HU12.10.2010
BG14.05.2014
CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
IT14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
MC14.05.2014
MT14.05.2014
NL14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
RS14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SI14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
SM14.05.2014
TR14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
IE12.10.2014
LU12.10.2014
BE31.10.2014
FR31.10.2014
AT12.10.2015
Former [2016/33]HU12.10.2010
BG14.05.2014
CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
IT14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
MC14.05.2014
MT14.05.2014
NL14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
RS14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SI14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
SM14.05.2014
TR14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
IE12.10.2014
LU12.10.2014
BE31.10.2014
FR31.10.2014
Former [2016/32]HU12.10.2010
BG14.05.2014
CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
IT14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
MC14.05.2014
NL14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
RS14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SI14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
SM14.05.2014
TR14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
IE12.10.2014
LU12.10.2014
BE31.10.2014
FR31.10.2014
Former [2016/28]BG14.05.2014
CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
IT14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
MC14.05.2014
NL14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
RS14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SI14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
SM14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
IE12.10.2014
LU12.10.2014
BE31.10.2014
FR31.10.2014
Former [2016/22]CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
IT14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
MC14.05.2014
NL14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
RS14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SI14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
SM14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
IE12.10.2014
LU12.10.2014
BE31.10.2014
FR31.10.2014
Former [2015/46]CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
IT14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
MC14.05.2014
NL14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
RS14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SI14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
IE12.10.2014
LU12.10.2014
BE31.10.2014
FR31.10.2014
Former [2015/38]CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
IT14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
MC14.05.2014
NL14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
RS14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SI14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
LU12.10.2014
BE31.10.2014
FR31.10.2014
Former [2015/36]CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
IT14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
MC14.05.2014
NL14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
RS14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SI14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
LU12.10.2014
BE31.10.2014
Former [2015/30]CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
IT14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
MC14.05.2014
NL14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
RS14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
LU12.10.2014
BE31.10.2014
Former [2015/27]CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
IT14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
MC14.05.2014
NL14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
RS14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
LU12.10.2014
Former [2015/26]CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
IT14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
NL14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
RS14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
LU12.10.2014
Former [2015/22]CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
IT14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
NL14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
RS14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
Former [2015/12]CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
NL14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
RS14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
Former [2015/11]CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
RS14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
Former [2015/10]CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
RS14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
Former [2015/08]CY14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
RS14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
Former [2015/02]CY14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
RS14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
Former [2014/52]CY14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
RS14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
Former [2014/50]CY14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
Former [2014/49]CY14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
Former [2014/48]CY14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
Former [2014/47]CY14.05.2014
Cited inInternational search[XD]WO2004029163  (SICPA HOLDING SA [CH], et al) [XD] 1-25 * page 1, lines 2-10 * * page 2, line 16 - page 31, line last *;
 [AD]US5238903  (MIKOSHIBA HISASHI [JP], et al) [AD] 1-25 * column 47 - column 52; example 1 * * column 54; example 3 *;
 [AD]US6303213  (BERNETH HORST [DE], et al) [AD] 1-25 * column 1, line 45 - column 5, line 47 *;
 [AD]EP0340898  (ICI PLC [GB]) [AD] 1-25 * column 3, line 54 - column 6, line 28 *;
 [A]WO9325391  (ICI PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 7, line 5 - page 8, line 22 *
by applicantUS6303213
 US5238903
 EP0340898
 WO2004029163
 EP20080168116