Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2486028

EP2486028 - METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION OF 2,5-FURANDICARBOXYLIC ACID AND FOR THE PREPARATION OF THE DIALKYL ESTER OF 2,5-FURANDICARBOXYLIC ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.08.2013
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Furanix Technologies B.V.
Zekeringstraat 29
1014 BV Amsterdam / NL
[N/P]
Former [2012/33]For all designated states
Furanix Technologies B.V
Zekeringstraat 29
1014 BV Amsterdam / NL
Inventor(s)01 / MUÑOZ DE DIEGO, Cesar
29 Zekeringstraat
NL-1014 BV Amsterdam / NL
02 / DAM, Matheus Adrianus
29 Zekeringstraat
NL-1014 BV Amsterdam / NL
03 / GRUTER, Gerardus Johannes Maria
29 Zekeringstraat
NL-1014 BV Amsterdam / NL
 [2012/33]
Representative(s)EP&C
P.O. Box 3241
2280 GE Rijswijk / NL
[2014/44]
Former [2012/33]Zeestraten, Albertus W. J.
Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241
NL-GE Rijswijk / NL
Application number, filing date10768600.806.10.2010
WO2010NL50654
Priority number, dateUS20090249395P07.10.2009         Original published format: US 249395 P
NL2009200360607.10.2009         Original published format: NL 2003606
[2012/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011043661
Date:14.04.2011
Language:EN
[2011/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2486028
Date:15.08.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2011
[2012/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.04.2011
ClassificationInternational:C07D307/68
[2012/33]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/33]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 2,5-FURANDICARBONSÄURE UND ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON DIALKYLESTER AUS 2,5-FURANDICARBONSÄURE[2012/33]
English:METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION OF 2,5-FURANDICARBOXYLIC ACID AND FOR THE PREPARATION OF THE DIALKYL ESTER OF 2,5-FURANDICARBOXYLIC ACID[2012/33]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'ACIDE 2,5-FURANE DICARBOXYLIQUE ET DE PRÉPARATION DE L'ESTER DIALKYLIQUE D'ACIDE 2,5-FURANE DICARBOXYLIQUE[2012/33]
Entry into regional phase07.05.2012National basic fee paid 
07.05.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
07.05.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.05.2012Examination requested  [2012/33]
07.11.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.04.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.08.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.03.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination18.05.2015Appeal received No.  T2018/15
15.07.2015Statement of grounds filed
10.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.04.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
29.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
27.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
27.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
27.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
27.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
29.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
28.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Cited inInternational search[ID]US2009156841  (SANBORN ALEXANDRA J [US], et al) [ID] 1-11,15 * the whole document * * in particular paragraph 60, example 7 and figure 8 *;
 [XP]JP2009242312  (AIR WATER INC) [XP] 1-11,15 * the whole document * * in particular paragraphs 31 and 43-46. *;
 [I]WO2006063220  (ARCHER DANIELS MIDLAND CO [US], et al) [I] 15 * examples 1-24; claims 1-26 *;
 [X]WO0172732  (DU PONT [US], et al) [X] 1-11,15 * page 7, line 2 - line 7; examples 16-40; claims 11-21 *;
 [X]WO2008054804  (BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE [US], et al) [X] 1-11,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0049] , [0050] , [0058]; figure 31; example 1; claims 5,10 *;
 [X]JP2009001519  (CANON KK) [X] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0025] *;
 [X]SU636233  (INST ORGANICHESKOGO SINTEZA AK [SU], et al) [X] 1-11 * the whole document * * in particular column 2, lines 9-10, examples 1, 2 and 4 and claim 1 *;
 [E]WO2010132740  (ARCHER DANIELS MIDLAND CO [US], et al) [E] 1-11,15 * examples 8,12; claims 1-18 *;
 [A]EP0356703  (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1-11,15 * the whole document *;
 [ID]  - WALT PARTENHEIMER ET AL., "Synthesis of 2,5-diformylfuran and furan-2,5-dicarboxylic acid by catalytic air oxidation of 5-hydroxymethylfurfural. Unexpectedly selective aerobic oxidation of benzyl alcohol to benzaldehyde with metal/bromide catalysts", ADV. SYNTH. CATAL., (2001), vol. 343, no. 1, pages 102 - 111, XP002584717 [ID] 1-11,15 * the whole document * * in particular figure 1, tables 1 and 3. *
 [I]  - HAWORTH W N ET AL, "The conversion of sucrose into furan compounds. Part II. Some 2 : 5-disubstituted tetrahydrofurans and their products of ring scission", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, CHEMICAL SOCIETY, LETCHWORTH; GB, (19450101), no. 1, doi:DOI:10.1039/JR9450000001, ISSN 0368-1769, pages 1 - 4, XP008122626 [I] 12-15 * the whole document * * in particular 1st paragraph on page 1 and last before paragraph on page 3. *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/JR9450000001
 [IP]  - TONG X ET AL, "Biomass into chemicals: Conversion of sugars to furan derivatives by catalytic processes", APPLIED CATALYSIS A: GENERAL, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 385, no. 1-2, ISSN 0926-860X, (20100915), pages 1 - 13, (20100730), XP027230510 [IP] 1-11,15 * the whole document * * in particular pages 9-10. *
 [I]  - BOISEN A ET AL, "Process integration for the conversion of glucose to 2,5-furandicarboxylic acid", CHEMICAL ENGINEERING RESEARCH AND DESIGN, PART A, INSTITUTION OF CHEMICAL ENGINEERS, XX, vol. 87, no. 9, doi:DOI:10.1016/J.CHERD.2009.06.010, ISSN 0263-8762, (20090901), pages 1318 - 1327, (20090725), XP026613647 [I] 1-11,15 * the whole document * * in particular paragraph 4.2.2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cherd.2009.06.010
 [A]  - GRABOWSKI G ET AL, "The electrochemical oxidation of 5-hydroxymethylfurfural with the nickel oxide/hydroxide electrode", ELECTROCHIMICA ACTA, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, BARKING, GB, vol. 36, no. 13, doi:DOI:10.1016/0013-4686(91)85084-K, ISSN 0013-4686, (19910101), page 1995, (19910101), XP026726025 [A] 1-11 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0013-4686(91)85084-K
by applicantGB621971
 WO0172732
 US4977283
 US2009156841
 WO2007104515
 WO2009030512
 US2673860
 US2628249
    - HENRY HIL, AM. CHEM. JOURN., (1901), vol. 25, page 439
    - TAARNING ET AL., CHEMSUSCHEM, (2008), vol. 1, pages 1 - 4
    - PARTENHEIMER ET AL., ADV. SYNTH. CATAL., (2001), vol. 343, pages 102 - 11
    - W. PARTENHEIMER, CATALYSIS TODAY, (1995), vol. 23, no. 2, pages 69 - 158