Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2496726

EP2496726 - METHOD FOR HANDLING AQUEOUS METHANESULFONIC ACID SOLUTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.07.2013
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF SE
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/37]For all designated states
BASF SE
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / FASSBENDER, Stefan
Hermann Langlotz Straße 3
67346 Speyer / DE
02 / PETERSEN, Peter
Schwalbenweg 3
67125 Dannstadt-Schauernheim / DE
03 / LAUTERBACH, Arnulf
Innsbrucker Weg 7
67067 Ludwigshafen / DE
04 / RENZ, Günter
Franz-Liszt-Str.20b
67251 Freinsheim / DE
05 / BORGMEIER, Frieder
Bellenstr.44
68163 Mannheim / DE
06 / KOLB, Peter
Brüsseler Ring 44
67069 Ludwigshafen / DE
 [2012/37]
Representative(s)BASF IP Association
BASF SE
G-FLP-C006
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/37](deleted)
...
Application number, filing date10768963.026.10.2010
WO2010EP66181
Priority number, dateEP2009017485303.11.2009         Original published format: EP 09174853
[2012/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011054703
Date:12.05.2011
Language:DE
[2011/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2496726
Date:12.09.2012
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2011
[2012/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.05.2011
ClassificationInternational:C22C38/44, C22C38/50, C07C309/00
[2012/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/37]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HANDHABUNG VON WÄSSRIGEN METHANSULFONSÄURELÖSUNGEN[2012/37]
English:METHOD FOR HANDLING AQUEOUS METHANESULFONIC ACID SOLUTIONS[2012/37]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR MANIPULER DES SOLUTIONS AQUEUSES D'ACIDE MÉTHANE SULFONIQUE[2012/37]
Entry into regional phase04.06.2012National basic fee paid 
04.06.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
04.06.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.05.2011Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.06.2012Examination requested  [2012/37]
13.12.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.04.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.07.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.11.2015Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.11.2015
24.11.2015Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
18.10.2016Date of oral proceedings
10.11.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
11.11.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination22.12.2016Appeal received No.  T1184/17
21.03.2017Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.04.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
31.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
02.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
31.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
02.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
31.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
31.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Cited inInternational search[X]JPH04120250  (TOKUYAMA SODA KK) [X] 1-6 * table 1 *;
 [X]US6120619  (GOUDIAKAS JEAN [FR], et al) [X] 1-6 * column 1, lines 40-53 *;
 [A]JPH07278854  (TOSOH CORP) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [I]  - GAUR, ET AL, "Corrosion of metals and alloys in methanesulfonic acid", BRITISH CORROSION JOURNAL, uk, (1999), vol. 34, no. 1, ISSN 0007-0599, XP009145687 [I] 1-6 * Conclusions *
 [X]  - Arkema, "Arkema Methanesulfonic Acid - Cleaning and Descaling", Application Information, (20070110), pages 1 - 4, URL: www.arkema-inc.com/literature/pdf/987.pdf, XP002627165 [X] 1-6 * the whole document *
by applicantUS3626004
 WO0031027
 CN1810780
 EP0906904
 WO2006092439