Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2496726 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2496726



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 268
13.02.2019 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
16.10.2018 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 1
19.02.2018 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
24.05.2017 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
05.05.2017 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
21.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
21.03.2017 Claims Appeal 1
21.03.2017 Claims Appeal 1
21.03.2017 Claims Appeal 1
21.03.2017 Claims Appeal 1
21.03.2017 Claims Appeal 1
21.03.2017 Claims Appeal 1
21.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.03.2017 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 14
15.02.2017 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
15.02.2017 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
20.01.2017 Refund of fees Appeal 1
22.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
22.12.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
22.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
22.12.2016 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
17.11.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
11.11.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
11.11.2016 Annex to a communication Search / examination 1
11.11.2016 Annex to a communication Search / examination 1
11.11.2016 Annex to a communication Search / examination 1
11.11.2016 Annex to a communication Search / examination 1
11.11.2016 Annex to a communication Search / examination 1
11.11.2016 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
11.11.2016 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
11.11.2016 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 7
11.11.2016 Means of redress Search / examination 2
10.11.2016 Annex to a communication Search / examination 1
10.11.2016 Annex to a communication Search / examination 1
10.11.2016 Annex to a communication Search / examination 1
10.11.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
10.11.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
10.11.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
10.11.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
13.10.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.10.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
13.10.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 1
12.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
12.09.2016 Claims Search / examination 1
12.09.2016 Claims Search / examination 1
12.09.2016 Claims Search / examination 1
12.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.09.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 6
16.03.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
10.03.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
03.03.2016 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
03.03.2016 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 3
11.01.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
11.12.2015 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
04.12.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
04.12.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
19.11.2015 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
19.11.2015 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
12.11.2015 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
12.11.2015 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
11.11.2015 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
10.11.2015 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
06.11.2015 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
05.11.2015 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
02.11.2015 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
22.10.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.10.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
22.10.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 42
13.02.2015 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
07.02.2015 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
04.02.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
04.02.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
04.02.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
16.01.2015 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
16.07.2013 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
02.04.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
02.04.2013 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
13.12.2012 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
16.08.2012 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
21.06.2012 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
08.05.2012 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
04.05.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.05.2012 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
16.03.2012 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
15.06.2011 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
14.06.2011 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
14.06.2011 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
14.06.2011 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
14.06.2011 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
14.06.2011 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
14.06.2011 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
14.06.2011 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
14.06.2011 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
06.06.2011 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 12
23.05.2011 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
23.05.2011 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
12.05.2011 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
12.05.2011 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
12.05.2011 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 10
05.05.2011 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
03.05.2011 Document concerning fees and payments PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
03.05.2011 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
10.03.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
10.03.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
10.03.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
26.10.2010 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
26.10.2010 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
26.10.2010 Claims PCT receiving Office 1
26.10.2010 Description PCT receiving Office 7
26.10.2010 Drawings PCT receiving Office 1
26.10.2010 Priority document (RO-procedure) PCT receiving Office 11