Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2496726


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
01.11.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.11.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.10.2018 Change: Appeal number
06.11.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.05.2017 Change: Appeal number
24.03.2017 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of appeal
23.12.2016 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
23.12.2016 New entry: Appeal number
10.11.2016 New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused
09.11.2016 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
04.11.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.03.2016 Change - representative
04.12.2015 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
27.11.2015 Deletion: Date of oral proceedings
27.11.2015 Deletion: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
10.11.2015 New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
04.11.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.02.2015 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
06.11.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.11.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.07.2013 New entry: Reply to examination report
01.04.2013 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
22.03.2013 First examination report
04.01.2013 Change - extension states published on  06.02.2013  [2013/06]
14.12.2012 Amendment by applicant
05.11.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.08.2012 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.09.2012  [2012/37]
10.08.2012 Request for examination filed published on  12.09.2012  [2012/37]
13.06.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
01.06.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
24.05.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
13.05.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
11.03.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
06.11.2010 PCT data prior to European publication