Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2426570

EP2426570 - CONTROL DEVICE AND CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.01.2017
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip27.01.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.03.2017  [2017/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22, Nagaike-cho
Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2012/10]For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / MATSUI, Ryoji
c/o SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA
22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP
 [2012/10]
Representative(s)Müller Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
St.-Martin-Strasse 58
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/10]Müller - Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
Application number, filing date10769577.725.03.2010
WO2010JP55246
Priority number, dateJP2009011088530.04.2009         Original published format: JP 2009110885
[2012/10]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010125878
Date:04.11.2010
Language:JA
[2010/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2426570
Date:07.03.2012
Language:EN
[2012/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP04.11.2010
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.05.2015
ClassificationInternational:G05F1/00, G05F1/67, H01L31/04, H01M8/04, H01M10/44, H02J3/32, H02J3/38, H01M10/46, H01M16/00, H02J7/35
[2015/24]
Former International [2012/10]G05F1/00, G05F1/67, H01L31/04, H01M8/04, H01M10/44
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/10]
TitleGerman:STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN[2012/10]
English:CONTROL DEVICE AND CONTROL METHOD[2012/10]
French:DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE[2012/10]
Entry into regional phase27.10.2011Translation filed 
27.10.2011National basic fee paid 
27.10.2011Search fee paid 
27.10.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
27.10.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.10.2011Examination requested  [2012/10]
30.11.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.10.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/09]
27.10.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/09]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.05.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
12.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
24.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
25.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP1986306  (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 1,3-6,8-11,13-20,22 * the whole document * [I] 2,12,21;
 [XI]WO2007086472  (SHARP KK [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-11,13-20,22 * the whole document * [I] 2,12,21;
 [A]JP2008061308  (SHARP KK) [A] 9-12 * abstract *
International search[Y]JPH10174312  (NIPPON ELECTRIC IND);
 [Y]JP2004129483  (CANON KK);
 [Y]JP2008306795  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP);
 [Y]JP2008118845  (ELECTRIC POWER RES INST)
by applicantJP2007201257