Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2425551

EP2425551 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MANAGING USER EQUIPMENT HISTORY INFORMATION IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.07.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.02.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change - divisional application(s)published on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR
[2019/33]
Former [2012/39]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR
Former [2012/10]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / LIM, Chae Gwon
No. 302 Roivill
909-9 Daechi 4-dong
Gangnam-gu
Seoul 135-841 / KR
02 / JEONG, Kyeong In
No. 112-1302 Daewoo Prugio Apt.
Gisan-ri
Taean-eup
Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 445-300 / KR
03 / CHOI, Sung Ho
No. 437-601 Samsung Raemian Apt.
Yeongtong-dong
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-470 / KR
04 / BAE, Beom Sik
No. 1001-1803 Bangjuk Maeul Yeongtong Ddranchae
707 Mangpo-dong
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-745 / KR
 [2012/10]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2019/33]
Former [2012/10]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date10769941.528.04.2010
[2019/33]
WO2010KR02670
Priority number, dateKR2009003720528.04.2009         Original published format: KR 20090037205
[2012/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2010126296
Date:04.11.2010
Language:EN
[2010/44]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2425551
Date:07.03.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.2010
[2012/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2425551
Date:14.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR27.01.2011
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W8/22, H04W36/16, H04B7/26, // H04W24/08
[2019/12]
Former International [2015/33]H04B7/26, H04W8/22, H04W36/00
Former International [2012/10]H04B7/26
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/10]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERWALTUNG VON BENUTZERGERÄT-VERLAUFSINFORMATIONEN IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZ[2012/10]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MANAGING USER EQUIPMENT HISTORY INFORMATION IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION NETWORK[2012/10]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE GESTION D'INFORMATIONS D'HISTORIQUE D'ÉQUIPEMENT D'UTILISATEUR DANS UN RÉSEAU DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL[2012/10]
Entry into regional phase25.10.2011National basic fee paid 
25.10.2011Search fee paid 
25.10.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
25.10.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.10.2011Examination requested  [2012/10]
09.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.11.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.03.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
16.07.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.02.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.07.2019Fee for grant paid
01.07.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.07.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP19191509.9
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.11.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
26.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
27.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
26.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
23.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
26.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2008040962  (VODAFONE PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1-10 * page 2, lines 24-31 * * page 4, lines 16-31 * * page 21, line 14 - page 24, line 21 * * abstract *;
 [I]WO2008133566  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [I] 1-10 * page 2, lines 6-17 * * page 4, line 34 - page 5, line 15 * * page 7, lines 4-36 * * abstract *;
 [A]WO2008049213  (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract *
International search[A]KR20060067679  (PANTECH & CURITEL COMM INC [KR]);
 [A]US2007293201  (MEDA RAJASEKHAR V [US]);
 [A]US5446756  (MALLINCKRODT ALBERT J [US])