Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2425634

EP2425634 - EARPIECE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.01.2020
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.01.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.10.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.02.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE, CH, FR, LI, SI
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Harman International Industries, Inc.
400 Atlantic Street, Suite 1500
Stamford, CT 06901 / US
[2018/46]
Former [2017/02]For all designated states
Harman International Industries, Incorporated
400, Atlantic Street, Suite 1500
Stamford, CT 06901 / US
Former [2012/10]For all designated states
Verto Medical Solutions, LLC
401 Westchester
Glen Carbon, Illinois 62034-1955 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BURGETT, Seth
401 Westchester
Glen Carbon Illinois 62034-1955 / US
02 / DANIELS, Richard J.
324 Weston Oaks Ct.
St. Louis Missouri 63122-2953 / US
03 / LEEDLE, Melvin Joshua
9518 Trefore Ave.
St. Louis Missouri 63134 / US
 [2012/10]
Representative(s)Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[2019/09]
Former [2012/10]Hedges, Martin Nicholas , et al
A.A. Thornton & Co.
235 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
Application number, filing date10770431.430.04.2010
[2019/09]
WO2010US33197
Priority number, dateUS20090174305P30.04.2009         Original published format: US 174305 P
[2012/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2010127265
Date:04.11.2010
Language:EN
[2010/44]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2425634
Date:07.03.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.2010
[2012/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2425634
Date:27.02.2019
Language:EN
[2019/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US05.04.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.03.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04R1/10
[2012/10]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/10]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:HÖRERSYSTEM[2012/10]
English:EARPIECE SYSTEM[2012/10]
French:SYSTÈME D'ÉCOUTEUR[2012/10]
Entry into regional phase30.11.2011National basic fee paid 
30.11.2011Search fee paid 
30.11.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
30.11.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.11.2011Examination requested  [2012/10]
12.04.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.04.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.10.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.11.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.12.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.04.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.10.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.01.2019Fee for grant paid
15.01.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.01.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.04.2013
Opposition(s)28.11.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2020/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
29.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
27.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
27.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
25.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
25.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201203   M06   Fee paid on   25.05.2012
30.04.201405   M06   Fee paid on   30.06.2014
30.04.201506   M06   Fee paid on   27.05.2015
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT27.02.2019
CZ27.02.2019
DK27.02.2019
EE27.02.2019
ES27.02.2019
FI27.02.2019
HR27.02.2019
IT27.02.2019
LT27.02.2019
LV27.02.2019
MC27.02.2019
NL27.02.2019
PL27.02.2019
RO27.02.2019
SE27.02.2019
SI27.02.2019
SK27.02.2019
SM27.02.2019
BE30.04.2019
CH30.04.2019
FR30.04.2019
LI30.04.2019
LU30.04.2019
BG27.05.2019
NO27.05.2019
GR28.05.2019
IS27.06.2019
PT27.06.2019
[2020/11]
Former [2020/04]AT27.02.2019
CZ27.02.2019
DK27.02.2019
EE27.02.2019
ES27.02.2019
FI27.02.2019
HR27.02.2019
IT27.02.2019
LT27.02.2019
LV27.02.2019
MC27.02.2019
NL27.02.2019
PL27.02.2019
RO27.02.2019
SE27.02.2019
SK27.02.2019
SM27.02.2019
LU30.04.2019
BG27.05.2019
NO27.05.2019
GR28.05.2019
IS27.06.2019
PT27.06.2019
Former [2020/03]AT27.02.2019
CZ27.02.2019
DK27.02.2019
EE27.02.2019
ES27.02.2019
FI27.02.2019
HR27.02.2019
IT27.02.2019
LT27.02.2019
LV27.02.2019
MC27.02.2019
NL27.02.2019
PL27.02.2019
RO27.02.2019
SE27.02.2019
SK27.02.2019
SM27.02.2019
BG27.05.2019
NO27.05.2019
GR28.05.2019
IS27.06.2019
PT27.06.2019
Former [2020/01]CZ27.02.2019
DK27.02.2019
EE27.02.2019
ES27.02.2019
FI27.02.2019
HR27.02.2019
IT27.02.2019
LT27.02.2019
LV27.02.2019
MC27.02.2019
NL27.02.2019
PL27.02.2019
RO27.02.2019
SE27.02.2019
SK27.02.2019
SM27.02.2019
BG27.05.2019
NO27.05.2019
GR28.05.2019
IS27.06.2019
PT27.06.2019
Former [2019/52]CZ27.02.2019
DK27.02.2019
EE27.02.2019
ES27.02.2019
FI27.02.2019
HR27.02.2019
IT27.02.2019
LT27.02.2019
LV27.02.2019
NL27.02.2019
PL27.02.2019
RO27.02.2019
SE27.02.2019
SK27.02.2019
SM27.02.2019
BG27.05.2019
NO27.05.2019
GR28.05.2019
IS27.06.2019
PT27.06.2019
Former [2019/49]CZ27.02.2019
DK27.02.2019
EE27.02.2019
ES27.02.2019
FI27.02.2019
HR27.02.2019
IT27.02.2019
LT27.02.2019
LV27.02.2019
NL27.02.2019
RO27.02.2019
SE27.02.2019
SK27.02.2019
BG27.05.2019
NO27.05.2019
GR28.05.2019
IS27.06.2019
PT27.06.2019
Former [2019/48]DK27.02.2019
ES27.02.2019
FI27.02.2019
HR27.02.2019
IT27.02.2019
LT27.02.2019
LV27.02.2019
NL27.02.2019
SE27.02.2019
BG27.05.2019
NO27.05.2019
GR28.05.2019
IS27.06.2019
PT27.06.2019
Former [2019/47]ES27.02.2019
FI27.02.2019
HR27.02.2019
IT27.02.2019
LT27.02.2019
LV27.02.2019
NL27.02.2019
SE27.02.2019
BG27.05.2019
NO27.05.2019
GR28.05.2019
IS27.06.2019
PT27.06.2019
Former [2019/46]FI27.02.2019
HR27.02.2019
IT27.02.2019
LT27.02.2019
LV27.02.2019
NL27.02.2019
SE27.02.2019
BG27.05.2019
NO27.05.2019
GR28.05.2019
IS27.06.2019
PT27.06.2019
Former [2019/39]FI27.02.2019
HR27.02.2019
LT27.02.2019
LV27.02.2019
NL27.02.2019
SE27.02.2019
BG27.05.2019
NO27.05.2019
GR28.05.2019
IS27.06.2019
PT27.06.2019
Former [2019/38]FI27.02.2019
LT27.02.2019
NL27.02.2019
SE27.02.2019
BG27.05.2019
NO27.05.2019
GR28.05.2019
PT27.06.2019
Former [2019/37]FI27.02.2019
LT27.02.2019
NL27.02.2019
SE27.02.2019
NO27.05.2019
GR28.05.2019
PT27.06.2019
Former [2019/34]FI27.02.2019
LT27.02.2019
NL27.02.2019
SE27.02.2019
NO27.05.2019
PT27.06.2019
Former [2019/33]FI27.02.2019
LT27.02.2019
NO27.05.2019
PT27.06.2019
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9623443  (JABRA CORP [US]) [X] 1,4,5 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3,6,7,9,10;
 [X]US5247946  (HOLDER JACK M [US]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 19 - column 4, line 40 *;
 [X]US2521414  (SCHIER MAYER B A) [X] 1,4 * column 3, line 40 - column 5, line 55 *;
 [XY]US2006067551  (CARTWRIGHT KRISTOPHER L [US], et al) [X] 8 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3,6,7,9,10;
 [X]US2006291682  (URSO RICHARD C [US], et al) [X] 8 * page 5, paragraph 52 - page 10, paragraph 76 *
International search[X]US2006067556  (BAILEY ET AL.);
 [Y]US2006215864  (ESPERSEN ET AL.);
 [A]US2008181444  (BRYANT)