blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2493841


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
25.09.2015 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  28.10.2015  [2015/44]
01.06.2015 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
05.11.2014 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
27.09.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.01.2013 Change - extension states published on  06.02.2013  [2013/06]
24.09.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.08.2012 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.09.2012  [2012/36]
03.08.2012 Request for examination filed published on  05.09.2012  [2012/36]
26.06.2012 Amendment by applicant
23.03.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
20.05.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
06.05.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
10.11.2010 PCT data prior to European publication