blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2493841 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201080048592 EP10771365



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2012232222Global Dossier 13.09.2012A1
Priority number Date
WO2010EP63066 07.09.2010
DE102009046194 30.10.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2013509460Global Dossier 14.03.2013A
Priority number Date
WO2010EP63066 07.09.2010
DE102009046194 30.10.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN102686552Global Dossier 19.09.2012A
Priority number Date
WO2010EP63066 07.09.2010
DE102009046194 30.10.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2493841Global Dossier 05.09.2012A1
Priority number Date
WO2010EP63066 07.09.2010
DE102009046194 30.10.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RU2012121998 10.12.2013A
Priority number Date
WO2010EP63066 07.09.2010
DE102009046194 30.10.2009
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2011051031Global Dossier 05.05.2011A1
Priority number Date
DE102009046194 30.10.2009
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR20120099656Global Dossier 11.09.2012A
Priority number Date
DE102009046194 30.10.2009
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE102009046194 05.05.2011A1
Priority number Date
DE102009046194 30.10.2009
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TW201121937 01.07.2011A
Priority number Date
DE102009046194 30.10.2009