Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2493841

EP2493841 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING (1-ALKOXY-2-METHYL-1-OXOPROPAN-2-YL)-(METH)ACRYLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.09.2015
Database last updated on 22.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.09.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.10.2015  [2015/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Evonik Röhm GmbH
Kirschenallee
64293 Darmstadt / DE
[2012/36]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHÜTZ, Thorben
Karlstrasse 12
64342 Seeheim-Jugenheim / DE
02 / KNEBEL, Joachim
Alsbacher Strasse 11
64665 Alsbach-Hähnlein / DE
03 / GRÄFF, Günther
Gernsheimer Strasse 52
64665 Alsbach-Hähnlein / DE
04 / CARLOFF, Rüdiger
Malvenweg 29
64291 Darmstadt / DE
05 / RECKTENWALD, Roger
Ottostrasse 5
64625 Bensheim / DE
06 / HERZOG, Volker
Seeheimer Strasse 25a
64297 Darmstadt / DE
 [2012/36]
Representative(s)Wolf, Oliver
Evonik Röhm GmbH DG-IPM-PAT Postcode 84/339 Rodenbacher Chaussee 4
63457 Hanau / DE
[2012/36]
Application number, filing date10771365.307.09.2010
WO2010EP63066
Priority number, dateDE2009104619430.10.2009         Original published format: DE102009046194
[2012/36]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011051031
Date:05.05.2011
Language:DE
[2011/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2493841
Date:05.09.2012
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.05.2011
[2012/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.05.2011
ClassificationInternational:C07C69/67, C07C67/03, C07C67/08, C08F220/26, C08F8/00, C09D4/00
[2012/36]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/36]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON (1-ALKOXY-2-METHYL-1-OXOPROPAN-2-YL)-(METH)ACRYLAT[2012/36]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCING (1-ALKOXY-2-METHYL-1-OXOPROPAN-2-YL)-(METH)ACRYLATE[2012/36]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE (MÉTH) ACRYLATE DE (1-ALCOXY-2-MÉTHYL-1-OXOPROPAN-2-YLE)[2012/36]
Entry into regional phase06.03.2012National basic fee paid 
06.03.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
06.03.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.03.2012Examination requested  [2012/36]
25.06.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.04.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/44]
02.06.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2015/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
20.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201405   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XDI]JPH1124274  (NIPPON ZEON CO) [XD] 8,9,14 * paragraphs [0016] , [0022]; compounds 7,8,9,5 * [I] 1-7;
 [XD]JPH11222460  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [XD] 14 * paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0056]; compound 21 *;
 [A]DE3824724  (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1,8,10 * page 2, line 45 - page 48 * * page 9, line 40 - line 50 *;
 [I]GB991623  (ROHM & HAAS) [I] 1-9,14,15 * example 3; claim - * * page 2, line 13 - line 20 *;
 [XPI]US2009317743  (SHIONO DAIJU [JP], et al) [XP] 8 * page 66; compounds 10-1 * [I] 1-7
by applicantJPH11222460
 JP2000347410
 JPH1124274
    - KRICHELDORF ET AL., J. POL. SCI.: PART A: POL. CHEM., (2008), vol. 46, pages 6229 - 6237,
    - CHEM.REV., (1993), vol. 93, pages 1449 - 70,