Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2601774

EP2601774 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR NETWORK TRAFFIC MANIPULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.08.2017
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 02.05.2018  [2018/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HT S.r.L.
Via Moscova 13
20121 Milano / IT
[2013/24]
Inventor(s)01 / ORNAGHI, Alberto
Via Verrazzano 36
I-24047 Treviglio / IT
02 / VALLERI, Marco
Via Regina Elena 9
I-73100 Lecce / IT
03 / MILAN, Daniele
Via Cave Ticino 1
I-20020 Robecchetto Con Induno / IT
04 / BEDESCHI, Valeriano
Via Correggio, 55
I-20149 Milano / IT
 [2016/21]
Former [2013/24]01 / ORNAGHI, Alberto
Via Verrazzano 36
I-24047 Treviglio / IT
02 / VALLERI, Marco
Via Regina Elena 9
I-73100 Lecce / IT
03 / MILAN, Daniele
Via Cave Ticino 1
I-20020 Robecchetto Con Induno / IT
04 / BEDESCHI, Valeriano
vIA cORREGGIO, 55
I-20149 Milano / IT
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners
Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
[2016/42]
Former [2013/24]Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners (IT)
Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date10771534.403.08.2010
[2016/42]
WO2010IT00352
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012017457
Date:09.02.2012
Language:EN
[2012/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2601774
Date:12.06.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2012
[2013/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2601774
Date:19.10.2016
Language:EN
[2016/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.02.2012
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/08
[2013/24]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/24]
Extension statesBA11.02.2013
RS11.02.2013
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE MANIPULATION VOM NETZWERKVERKEHR[2013/24]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR NETWORK TRAFFIC MANIPULATION[2013/24]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA MANIPULATION DE TRAFIC DE RÉSEAU[2013/24]
Entry into regional phase09.02.2012Translation filed 
11.02.2013National basic fee paid 
11.02.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
11.02.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.12.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.02.2013Examination requested  [2013/24]
29.04.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.09.2016Fee for grant paid
05.09.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.09.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.04.2016
Opposition(s)20.07.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
14.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
18.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
08.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT19.10.2016
BE19.10.2016
CZ19.10.2016
DK19.10.2016
EE19.10.2016
ES19.10.2016
FI19.10.2016
HR19.10.2016
IT19.10.2016
LT19.10.2016
LV19.10.2016
MC19.10.2016
NL19.10.2016
PL19.10.2016
RO19.10.2016
SE19.10.2016
SI19.10.2016
SK19.10.2016
SM19.10.2016
BG19.01.2017
NO19.01.2017
GR20.01.2017
IS19.02.2017
PT20.02.2017
[2018/18]
Former [2017/52]AT19.10.2016
BE19.10.2016
CZ19.10.2016
DK19.10.2016
EE19.10.2016
ES19.10.2016
FI19.10.2016
HR19.10.2016
IT19.10.2016
LT19.10.2016
LV19.10.2016
NL19.10.2016
PL19.10.2016
RO19.10.2016
SE19.10.2016
SI19.10.2016
SK19.10.2016
SM19.10.2016
BG19.01.2017
NO19.01.2017
GR20.01.2017
IS19.02.2017
PT20.02.2017
Former [2017/38]AT19.10.2016
BE19.10.2016
CZ19.10.2016
DK19.10.2016
EE19.10.2016
ES19.10.2016
FI19.10.2016
HR19.10.2016
IT19.10.2016
LT19.10.2016
LV19.10.2016
NL19.10.2016
PL19.10.2016
RO19.10.2016
SE19.10.2016
SK19.10.2016
SM19.10.2016
BG19.01.2017
NO19.01.2017
GR20.01.2017
IS19.02.2017
PT20.02.2017
Former [2017/37]AT19.10.2016
BE19.10.2016
CZ19.10.2016
DK19.10.2016
EE19.10.2016
ES19.10.2016
FI19.10.2016
HR19.10.2016
IT19.10.2016
LT19.10.2016
LV19.10.2016
NL19.10.2016
PL19.10.2016
RO19.10.2016
SE19.10.2016
SK19.10.2016
SM19.10.2016
NO19.01.2017
GR20.01.2017
IS19.02.2017
PT20.02.2017
Former [2017/36]AT19.10.2016
BE19.10.2016
CZ19.10.2016
DK19.10.2016
EE19.10.2016
ES19.10.2016
FI19.10.2016
HR19.10.2016
LT19.10.2016
LV19.10.2016
NL19.10.2016
PL19.10.2016
RO19.10.2016
SE19.10.2016
SK19.10.2016
NO19.01.2017
GR20.01.2017
IS19.02.2017
PT20.02.2017
Former [2017/34]AT19.10.2016
BE19.10.2016
CZ19.10.2016
DK19.10.2016
ES19.10.2016
FI19.10.2016
HR19.10.2016
LT19.10.2016
LV19.10.2016
NL19.10.2016
PL19.10.2016
SE19.10.2016
NO19.01.2017
GR20.01.2017
IS19.02.2017
PT20.02.2017
Former [2017/33]AT19.10.2016
BE19.10.2016
DK19.10.2016
ES19.10.2016
FI19.10.2016
HR19.10.2016
LT19.10.2016
LV19.10.2016
NL19.10.2016
PL19.10.2016
SE19.10.2016
NO19.01.2017
GR20.01.2017
IS19.02.2017
PT20.02.2017
Former [2017/26]AT19.10.2016
BE19.10.2016
ES19.10.2016
FI19.10.2016
HR19.10.2016
LT19.10.2016
LV19.10.2016
NL19.10.2016
PL19.10.2016
SE19.10.2016
NO19.01.2017
GR20.01.2017
IS19.02.2017
PT20.02.2017
Former [2017/12]LV19.10.2016
Cited inInternational search[XA]US2002178381  (LEE FRANK [TW], et al) [X] 7,8 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 20 * * page 4, paragraphs 40-47 * * page 6, paragraph 75 * [A] 1-6;
 [XA]US2006031404  (KASSAB HISHAM [US]) [X] 7,8 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 5 * * page 5, paragraph 85 - page 6, paragraph 90 * [A] 1-6;
 [A]US6687732  (BECTOR RAJEEV [US], et al) [A] 7 * claim 1 *