Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2485881

EP2485881 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE PRODUCTION OF A PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.11.2013
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
01.10.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Priamus System Technologies AG
Rheinweg 4
8200 Schaffhausen / CH
[2017/31]
Former [2012/33]For all designated states
Priamus System Technologies AG
Bahnhofstrasse 36
8200 Schaffhausen / CH
Inventor(s)01 / BADER, Christopherus
13A, Randkstrasse
CH-8413 Neftenbach / CH
 [2012/33]
Representative(s)Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt Weiß, Arat & Partner mbB
Zeppelinstraße 4
78234 Engen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/33]Weiss, Peter
Dr. Weiss & Arat
Zeppelinstrasse 4
78234 Engen / DE
Application number, filing date10773240.605.10.2010
WO2010EP06064
Priority number, dateDE2009104819605.10.2009         Original published format: DE102009048196
DE2009106066522.12.2009         Original published format: DE102009060665
[2012/33]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011042153
Date:14.04.2011
Language:DE
[2011/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2485881
Date:15.08.2012
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2011
[2012/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2485881
Date:11.12.2013
Language:DE
[2013/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.04.2011
ClassificationInternational:B29C45/76
[2012/33]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/33]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR REGELUNG DER HERSTELLUNG EINES PRODUKTES[2012/33]
English:METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE PRODUCTION OF A PRODUCT[2012/33]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR RÉGULER LA FABRICATION D'UN PRODUIT[2012/33]
Entry into regional phase07.05.2012National basic fee paid 
07.05.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
07.05.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.08.2011Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.05.2012Examination requested  [2012/33]
04.12.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.07.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.09.2013Fee for grant paid
11.09.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.07.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  11.09.2014  16.09.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Kistler Instrumente AG
Eulachstrasse 22
8408 Winterthur / CH
Opponent's representative
Zwick, Evelyn, et al
Kistler Holding AG Eulachstrasse 22
8408 Winterthur / CH
 [2014/43]
16.10.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
20.04.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
06.06.2016Date of oral proceedings
28.06.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
28.06.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition10.08.2016Appeal received No.  T1948/16
28.10.2016Statement of grounds filed
15.12.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
25.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL11.12.2013
BG11.12.2013
CY11.12.2013
EE11.12.2013
FI11.12.2013
HR11.12.2013
LT11.12.2013
LV11.12.2013
MC11.12.2013
MK11.12.2013
MT11.12.2013
RO11.12.2013
RS11.12.2013
SI11.12.2013
SK11.12.2013
SM11.12.2013
TR11.12.2013
NO11.03.2014
GR12.03.2014
IS11.04.2014
PT11.04.2014
LU05.10.2014
[2018/46]
Former [2018/30]BG11.12.2013
CY11.12.2013
EE11.12.2013
FI11.12.2013
HR11.12.2013
LT11.12.2013
LV11.12.2013
MC11.12.2013
MK11.12.2013
MT11.12.2013
RO11.12.2013
RS11.12.2013
SI11.12.2013
SK11.12.2013
SM11.12.2013
TR11.12.2013
NO11.03.2014
GR12.03.2014
IS11.04.2014
PT11.04.2014
LU05.10.2014
Former [2016/33]BG11.12.2013
CY11.12.2013
EE11.12.2013
FI11.12.2013
HR11.12.2013
LT11.12.2013
LV11.12.2013
MC11.12.2013
MT11.12.2013
RO11.12.2013
RS11.12.2013
SI11.12.2013
SK11.12.2013
SM11.12.2013
TR11.12.2013
NO11.03.2014
GR12.03.2014
IS11.04.2014
PT11.04.2014
LU05.10.2014
Former [2016/32]BG11.12.2013
CY11.12.2013
EE11.12.2013
FI11.12.2013
HR11.12.2013
LT11.12.2013
LV11.12.2013
MC11.12.2013
RO11.12.2013
RS11.12.2013
SI11.12.2013
SK11.12.2013
SM11.12.2013
TR11.12.2013
NO11.03.2014
GR12.03.2014
IS11.04.2014
PT11.04.2014
LU05.10.2014
Former [2016/28]BG11.12.2013
CY11.12.2013
EE11.12.2013
FI11.12.2013
HR11.12.2013
LT11.12.2013
LV11.12.2013
MC11.12.2013
RO11.12.2013
RS11.12.2013
SI11.12.2013
SK11.12.2013
SM11.12.2013
NO11.03.2014
GR12.03.2014
IS11.04.2014
PT11.04.2014
LU05.10.2014
Former [2016/22]CY11.12.2013
EE11.12.2013
FI11.12.2013
HR11.12.2013
LT11.12.2013
LV11.12.2013
MC11.12.2013
RO11.12.2013
RS11.12.2013
SI11.12.2013
SK11.12.2013
SM11.12.2013
NO11.03.2014
IS11.04.2014
PT11.04.2014
LU05.10.2014
Former [2015/27]CY11.12.2013
EE11.12.2013
FI11.12.2013
HR11.12.2013
LT11.12.2013
LV11.12.2013
MC11.12.2013
RO11.12.2013
RS11.12.2013
SI11.12.2013
SK11.12.2013
NO11.03.2014
IS11.04.2014
PT11.04.2014
LU05.10.2014
Former [2015/26]CY11.12.2013
EE11.12.2013
FI11.12.2013
HR11.12.2013
LT11.12.2013
LV11.12.2013
RO11.12.2013
RS11.12.2013
SI11.12.2013
SK11.12.2013
NO11.03.2014
IS11.04.2014
PT11.04.2014
LU05.10.2014
Former [2015/14]CY11.12.2013
EE11.12.2013
FI11.12.2013
HR11.12.2013
LT11.12.2013
LV11.12.2013
RO11.12.2013
RS11.12.2013
SI11.12.2013
SK11.12.2013
NO11.03.2014
IS11.04.2014
PT11.04.2014
Former [2014/37]CY11.12.2013
EE11.12.2013
FI11.12.2013
HR11.12.2013
LT11.12.2013
LV11.12.2013
RO11.12.2013
RS11.12.2013
SK11.12.2013
NO11.03.2014
IS11.04.2014
PT11.04.2014
Former [2014/36]CY11.12.2013
EE11.12.2013
FI11.12.2013
HR11.12.2013
LT11.12.2013
LV11.12.2013
RS11.12.2013
NO11.03.2014
IS11.04.2014
Former [2014/26]CY11.12.2013
FI11.12.2013
HR11.12.2013
LT11.12.2013
LV11.12.2013
RS11.12.2013
NO11.03.2014
Former [2014/25]FI11.12.2013
HR11.12.2013
LT11.12.2013
LV11.12.2013
RS11.12.2013
NO11.03.2014
Former [2014/24]FI11.12.2013
HR11.12.2013
LT11.12.2013
RS11.12.2013
NO11.03.2014
Former [2014/23]FI11.12.2013
HR11.12.2013
LT11.12.2013
NO11.03.2014
Former [2014/22]FI11.12.2013
LT11.12.2013
NO11.03.2014
Former [2014/20]LT11.12.2013
NO11.03.2014
Cited inInternational search[XY]US5835379  (NAKANO RYO [JP]) [X] 1-5,9,10 * column 7, line 61 - column 8, line 34 * * figure 2 * * column 12, line 36 - line 52 * * column 13, line 1 - line 7 * [Y] 6-8;
 [X]US6816820  (FRIEDL CHRISTIAN [AU], et al) [X] 1 * figure 2 * * column 6, line 2 *;
 [X]JPH0724893  ;
 [X]JPH1044205  (RIKEN VINYL IND) [X] 1 * abstract *;
 [X]JP2001277323  (NIPPON HIKYUMEN LENS KK) [X] 1,9 * abstract *;
 [XA]JP2002137274  (SHARP KK) [X] 1 * abstract * * figure 4 * * paragraph [0026] * [A] 8;
 [A]US5427516  (BADER CHRISTOPHERUS [CH], et al) [A] 1,6 * claim 2 *;
 [AD]WO2009040077  (PRIAMUS SYSTEM TECHNOLOGIES AG [CH], et al) [AD] 3,4,10 * claim 2 *;
 [A]JP2003271678  (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [A] 1 * claim 3 *;
 [A]DE102005036198  (BATTENFELD GMBH [DE]) [A] 2,5 * paragraph [0003] * * abstract *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1995, no. 14, Database accession no. 1995-101466, XP002618675 & JPH0724893 A 19950127 (FANUC LTD) [X] 1,9,10 * abstract *
 [Y]  - KAZMER D, "THE FOUNDATIONS OF INTELLIGENT PROCESS CONTROL FOR INJECTION MOLDING", JOURNAL OF INJECTION MOLDING TECHNOLOGY, SOCIETY OF PLASTICS ENGINEERS, BROOKFIELD, CT, US, (19970301), vol. 1, no. 1, ISSN 1533-905X, page 44/45, XP000740778 [Y] 6-8 * page 45, column 1, paragraph 2 *
by applicantEP1377427
 EP1372934
 EP1761375