Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2482678

EP2482678 - CHEESE AND METHOD FOR ITS MANUFACTURING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.06.2013
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
12.11.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Valio Ltd.
Meijeritie 6
00370 Helsinki / FI
[2012/32]
Inventor(s)01 / MARTIKAINEN, Emmi
Ruotutie 3 I 18
FI-02610 Espoo / FI
02 / UUSI-RAUVA, Janne
Niipperinrinteentie 17D 2
02920 Espoo / FI
 [2012/32]
Representative(s)Kolster Oy Ab
(Salmisaarenaukio 1)
P.O. Box 204
00181 Helsinki / FI
[N/P]
Former [2013/43]Kolster Oy Ab
Iso Roobertinkatu 23
PO Box 148
00121 Helsinki / FI
Former [2012/32]Pitkänen, Kirsi-Marja
Kolster Oy Ab
Iso Roobertinkatu 23
P.O. Box 148
00121 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date10773642.328.09.2010
WO2010FI50746
Priority number, dateFI2009000600130.09.2009         Original published format: FI 20096001
[2012/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011039414
Date:07.04.2011
Language:EN
[2011/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2482678
Date:08.08.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2011
[2012/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2482678
Date:10.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.04.2011
ClassificationInternational:A23L1/304, A23C19/02, A23C19/05, A23C19/068, A23C19/09
[2012/32]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/32]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KÄSE UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG[2012/32]
English:CHEESE AND METHOD FOR ITS MANUFACTURING[2012/32]
French:FROMAGE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION[2012/32]
Entry into regional phase18.04.2012National basic fee paid 
18.04.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
18.04.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.04.2012Examination requested  [2012/32]
06.11.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.02.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.05.2013Fee for grant paid
30.05.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.02.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  10.04.2014  15.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Friesland Brands B.V.
Stationsplein 4
3818 LE Amersfoort / NL
Opponent's representative
van Deursen, Petrus Hubertus, et al
Friesland Brands B.V.
Bronland 20
6708 WH Wageningen / NL
 [2016/06]
Former [2015/47]
Opponent(s)01  10.04.2014  15.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Friesland Brands B.V.
Stationsplein 4
3818 LE Amersfoort / NL
Opponent's representative
V.O., et al
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
Former [2014/20]
Opponent(s)01  10.04.2014   
Friesland Brands B.V.
Stationsplein 4
3818 LE Amersfoort / NL
Opponent's representative
Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
27.05.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
21.11.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
26.05.2016Date of oral proceedings
14.06.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
14.06.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition11.08.2016Appeal received No.  T1877/16
13.10.2016Statement of grounds filed
13.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU28.09.2010
AL10.07.2013
BG10.07.2013
CY10.07.2013
CZ10.07.2013
EE10.07.2013
FI10.07.2013
HR10.07.2013
LT10.07.2013
LV10.07.2013
MC10.07.2013
MK10.07.2013
MT10.07.2013
PL10.07.2013
RO10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
SK10.07.2013
SM10.07.2013
TR10.07.2013
LU28.09.2013
GR11.10.2013
IS10.11.2013
PT11.11.2013
[2018/46]
Former [2015/34]HU28.09.2010
BG10.07.2013
CY10.07.2013
CZ10.07.2013
EE10.07.2013
FI10.07.2013
HR10.07.2013
LT10.07.2013
LV10.07.2013
MC10.07.2013
MK10.07.2013
MT10.07.2013
PL10.07.2013
RO10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
SK10.07.2013
SM10.07.2013
TR10.07.2013
LU28.09.2013
GR11.10.2013
IS10.11.2013
PT11.11.2013
Former [2015/32]CY10.07.2013
CZ10.07.2013
EE10.07.2013
FI10.07.2013
HR10.07.2013
LT10.07.2013
LV10.07.2013
MC10.07.2013
MK10.07.2013
MT10.07.2013
PL10.07.2013
RO10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
SK10.07.2013
SM10.07.2013
TR10.07.2013
GR11.10.2013
IS10.11.2013
PT11.11.2013
Former [2015/24]CY10.07.2013
CZ10.07.2013
EE10.07.2013
FI10.07.2013
HR10.07.2013
LT10.07.2013
LV10.07.2013
MC10.07.2013
PL10.07.2013
RO10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
SK10.07.2013
SM10.07.2013
GR11.10.2013
IS10.11.2013
PT11.11.2013
Former [2014/23]CY10.07.2013
CZ10.07.2013
EE10.07.2013
FI10.07.2013
HR10.07.2013
LT10.07.2013
LV10.07.2013
MC10.07.2013
PL10.07.2013
RO10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
SK10.07.2013
GR11.10.2013
IS10.11.2013
PT11.11.2013
Former [2014/22]CY10.07.2013
FI10.07.2013
HR10.07.2013
LT10.07.2013
LV10.07.2013
MC10.07.2013
PL10.07.2013
RO10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
GR11.10.2013
IS10.11.2013
PT11.11.2013
Former [2014/20]CY10.07.2013
FI10.07.2013
HR10.07.2013
LT10.07.2013
LV10.07.2013
MC10.07.2013
PL10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
GR11.10.2013
IS10.11.2013
PT11.11.2013
Former [2014/18]CY10.07.2013
FI10.07.2013
HR10.07.2013
LT10.07.2013
LV10.07.2013
PL10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
GR11.10.2013
IS10.11.2013
PT11.11.2013
Former [2014/12]FI10.07.2013
HR10.07.2013
LT10.07.2013
LV10.07.2013
PL10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
CY04.09.2013
GR11.10.2013
IS10.11.2013
PT11.11.2013
Former [2014/11]FI10.07.2013
HR10.07.2013
LT10.07.2013
PL10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
CY04.09.2013
IS10.11.2013
PT11.11.2013
Former [2014/10]HR10.07.2013
LT10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
CY04.09.2013
IS10.11.2013
PT11.11.2013
Former [2014/09]HR10.07.2013
LT10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
PT11.11.2013
Former [2014/08]LT10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
PT11.11.2013
Former [2013/49]SI10.07.2013
Cited inInternational search[X]US5225220  (GAMAY ALY [US]) [X] 10,11 * example 1; claim 1 *;
 [X]EP1884165  (KRAFT FOODS HOLDINGS INC [US]) [X] 10-12 * example 4 *;
 [I]WO9940798  (VALIO LTD [FI], et al) [I] 19 * claim 10 *;
 [A]US6090417  (MEHNERT DAVID W [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO02089592  (KRAFT FOODS HOLDINGS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2006087350  (DSM IP ASSETS BV [NL], et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *
by applicantWO9015541
 WO2004049828
 EP1061811