Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2431376

EP2431376 - NOVEL STABLE CRYSTAL OF 1-(2'-CYANO-2'-DEOXY-BETA -D-ARABINOFURANOSYL)CYTOSINE MONOHYDROCHLORIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.07.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.04.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
13.04.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Delta-Fly Pharma, Inc.
37-2, Nishikino, Miyajima Kawauchi-cho
Tokushima-shi, Tokushima 771-0116 / JP
[2012/12]
Inventor(s)01 / WATANABE, Shotaro
c/o Taiho Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd
200-22, Oaza Motohara
Kamikawa-machi
Kodama-gun Saitama 367-0241 / JP
02 / HATAKEYAMA, Takahiro
c/o Taiho Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd
200-22, Oaza Motohara
Kamikawa-machi
Kodama-gun Saitama 367-0241 / JP
 [2012/12]
Representative(s)Blodig, Wolfgang
Wächtershäuser & Hartz
Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Weinstrasse 8
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/33]Blodig, Wolfgang
Wächtershäuser & Hartz
Patentanwaltspartnerschaft
Ottostrasse 4
80333 München / DE
Former [2012/12]Blodig, Wolfgang
Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft Weinstraße 8
80333 München / DE
Application number, filing date10774734.714.05.2010
WO2010JP03261
Priority number, dateJP2009011872615.05.2009         Original published format: JP 2009118726
[2012/12]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010131475
Date:18.11.2010
Language:JA
[2010/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2431376
Date:21.03.2012
Language:EN
[2012/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2431376
Date:14.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP18.11.2010
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.07.2012
ClassificationInternational:C07H19/06, A61K31/7068, A61P35/00
[2012/12]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/12]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:NEUER STABILER KRISTALL AUS 1-(2'-CYAN-2'-DESOXY-BETA-D-ARABINOFURANOSYL)CYTOSIN-MONOHYDROCHLORID[2012/12]
English:NOVEL STABLE CRYSTAL OF 1-(2'-CYANO-2'-DEOXY-BETA -D-ARABINOFURANOSYL)CYTOSINE MONOHYDROCHLORIDE[2012/12]
French:NOUVEAU CRISTAL STABLE DE MONOCHLORHYDRATE DE 1-(2'-CYANO-2'-DESOXY-BETA -D-ARABINOFURANOSYL)CYTOSINE[2012/12]
Entry into regional phase12.10.2011Translation filed 
12.10.2011National basic fee paid 
12.10.2011Search fee paid 
12.10.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
12.10.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.10.2011Examination requested  [2012/12]
04.12.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.03.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.06.2013Fee for grant paid
28.06.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.03.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  13.05.2014  19.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
KELTIE LLP
No.1 London Bridge
London SE1 9BA / GB
Opponent's representative
Moore, Michael Richard
Keltie LLP
No.1 London Bridge
London SE1 9BA / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2014/25]
Opponent(s)01  13.05.2014   
KELTIE LLP
Fleet Place House
2 Fleet Place
London EC4M 7ET / GB
Opponent's representative
Moore, Michael Richard
Keltie LLP
Fleet Place House
2 Fleet Place
London EC4M 7ET / GB
23.06.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
20.10.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.12.2015Date of oral proceedings
21.12.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
21.12.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition04.02.2016Appeal received No.  T0325/16
20.04.2016Statement of grounds filed
23.04.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
08.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL14.08.2013
BG14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
MC14.08.2013
MK14.08.2013
MT14.08.2013
RO14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
SK14.08.2013
SM14.08.2013
IS14.12.2013
LU14.05.2014
[2018/46]
Former [2018/30]BG14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
MC14.08.2013
MK14.08.2013
MT14.08.2013
RO14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
SK14.08.2013
SM14.08.2013
IS14.12.2013
LU14.05.2014
Former [2016/28]BG14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
MC14.08.2013
MT14.08.2013
RO14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
SK14.08.2013
SM14.08.2013
IS14.12.2013
LU14.05.2014
Former [2016/22]CY14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
MC14.08.2013
MT14.08.2013
RO14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
SK14.08.2013
SM14.08.2013
IS14.12.2013
LU14.05.2014
Former [2016/16]CY14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
MC14.08.2013
MT14.08.2013
RO14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
SK14.08.2013
IS14.12.2013
LU14.05.2014
Former [2015/09]CY14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
MC14.08.2013
RO14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
SK14.08.2013
IS14.12.2013
LU14.05.2014
Former [2015/04]CY14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
RO14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
SK14.08.2013
IS14.12.2013
LU14.05.2014
Former [2014/23]CY14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
RO14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
SK14.08.2013
IS14.12.2013
Former [2014/22]CY14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
RO14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
IS14.12.2013
Former [2014/12]CY14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
IS14.12.2013
Former [2014/10]CY14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
IS14.12.2013
Former [2014/08]LT14.08.2013
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0535231  (SANKYO CO [JP]) [X] 1-6 * page 29; example 9 *
International search[Y]JPH04235182  (SANKYO CO [JP]);
 [Y]  - AZUMA, A ET AL., "Nucleosides and Nucleotides. 141.Chemical Stability of a New Antitumor Nucleoside, 2'-C-Cyano-2'-deoxy-1-beta-D-arabino-pentofuranosylcytosine (CNDAC) in Alkaline Medium: Formation of 2'-C-Cyano-2'-deoxy-1-beta-D-ribo-pentofuranosylcytosine (CNDC) and Its Antitumor Activity", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (1995), vol. 38, no. 17, pages 3391 - 3397, XP055103106

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00017a023
 [Y]  - AZUMA, A. ET AL., "Nucleosides and nucleotides. 122. 2'-C-Cyano-2'-deoxy-1-beta-D-arabinofuranosylcytosine and its derivatives. A new class of nucleoside with a broad antitumor spectrum", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (1993), vol. 36, no. 26, pages 4183 - 4189, XP002997578

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00078a006
 [Y]  - NORIAKI HIRAYAMA ET AL., NORIAKI HIRAYAMA ET AL., NORIAKI HIRAYAMA, ET AL., Kessho Sakusei Handbook -Genri to KnowHow, (20080725), pages 57-62 - 78-81
 [A]  - MATSUDA, A. ET AL., "Synthesis of a new potent antitumor nucleoside, 2'-C-cyano-2'-deoxy-1-beta-D-arabinofuranosylcytosine", NUCLEIC ACIDS SYMPOSIUM SERIES, (1990), vol. 22, pages 51 - 52, XP008111983
by applicantJP2559917B
 JPH04235182
    - JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (1991), vol. 34, pages 2917 - 2919
    - JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (1993), vol. 36, pages 4183 - 4189
    - INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS, (1990), vol. 60, pages 11 - 26
    - ORGANIC PROCESS RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT, (2000), vol. 4, pages 413 - 417
    - BUNRI GIJUTSU, SEPARATION TECHNOLOGY, (2003), vol. 33, pages 379 - 385
    - ORGANIC PROCESS RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT, (2005), vol. 9, pages 933 - 942