Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2429512

EP2429512 - METHODS FOR TREATMENT OF METABOLIC DISORDERS USING EPIMETABOLIC SHIFTERS, MULTIDIMENSIONAL INTRACELLULAR MOLECULES, OR ENVIRONMENTAL INFLUENCERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.01.2016
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019New entry: Invitation to file observations in an appeal + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Berg LLC
1845 Elm Hill Pike
Nashville, TN 37210 / US
[2013/51]
Former [2012/49]For all designated states
Berg Pharma LLC
1845 Elm Hill Pike
Nashville, TN 37210 / US
Former [2012/12]For all designated states
Berg Biosystems, LLC
1845 Elm Hill Pike
Nashville, TN 37210 / US
Inventor(s)01 / NARAIN, Niven, Rajin
350 Third Street Suite 2005
Cambridge, MA 02142 / US
02 / MCCOOK, John, Patrick
4913 Southern Hills Drive
Frisco, TX 75034 / US
03 / SARANGARAJAN, Rangaprasad
21 Winifreds Way
Rutland, MA 01543 / US
 [2012/12]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/12]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date10775436.811.05.2010
WO2010US34447
Priority number, dateUS20090177243P11.05.2009         Original published format: US 177243 P
US20090177244P11.05.2009         Original published format: US 177244 P
US20090177245P11.05.2009         Original published format: US 177245 P
US20090177241P11.05.2009         Original published format: US 177241 P
US20090177246P11.05.2009         Original published format: US 177246 P
[2012/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2010132502
Date:18.11.2010
Language:EN
[2010/46]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2429512
Date:21.03.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.2010
[2012/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR21.04.2011
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/122, A61K31/12, A61K31/194, A61K31/19, A61P3/00
[2012/12]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/12]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON STOFFWECHSELERKRANKUNGEN MIT EPIMETABOLISCHEN SHIFTERN, MEHRDIMENSIONALEN INTRAZELLULAREN MOLEKÜLEN ODER UMGEBUNGSBEEINFLUSSERN[2012/12]
English:METHODS FOR TREATMENT OF METABOLIC DISORDERS USING EPIMETABOLIC SHIFTERS, MULTIDIMENSIONAL INTRACELLULAR MOLECULES, OR ENVIRONMENTAL INFLUENCERS[2012/12]
French:MÉTHODES DE TRAITEMENT DE TROUBLES MÉTABOLIQUES À L'AIDE DE DÉCALEURS ÉPIMÉTABOLIQUES, DE MOLÉCULES INTRACELLULAIRES MULTIDIMENSIONNELLES OU D'INFLUENCEURS ENVIRONNEMENTAUX[2012/12]
Entry into regional phase09.12.2011National basic fee paid 
09.12.2011Search fee paid 
09.12.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
09.12.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.12.2011Examination requested  [2012/12]
27.01.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.01.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.03.2017Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.03.2017
10.03.2017Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
24.04.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination26.06.2017Appeal received No.  T2355/17
02.09.2017Statement of grounds filed
15.10.2019Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M03) [2019/42]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.07.2015
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
21.01.2016Request for further processing filed
21.01.2016Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
15.02.2016Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
28.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
27.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
27.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
27.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
30.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
29.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201910   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1493437  (KANEKA CORP [JP]) [X] 1-30 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO2007131047  (UNIV MIAMI [US], et al) [X] 1-30 * examples 1-4 *;
 [XP]WO2009073843  (CYTOTECH LABS LLC [US], et al) [XP] 1-30 * claims 10,13 *;
 [XP]WO2009126764  (CYTOTECH LABS LLC [US], et al) [XP] 1-30 * paragraph [00130] - paragraph [00131] *
 [X]  - G.T. CHEW ET AL, "Coenzyme Q10 and diabetic endotheliopathy: oxidative stress and the 'recoupling hypothesis'", QJM, (20040801), vol. 97, no. 8, doi:10.1093/qjmed/hch089, ISSN 1460-2725, pages 537 - 548, XP055064142 [X] 1-30 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/qjmed/hch089
International search[X]WO2008156654  (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al);
 [X]US2003235812  (ANDERSON CHRISTEN M [US], et al);
 [X]US2004101874  (GHOSH SOUMITRA S [US], et al);
 [A]US2002049176  (ANDERSON CHRISTEN M [US], et al)